This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 12/15/2021 at 11:15:49 (UTC).

RANCHO MIRAGE OSF, LLC vs COUNTY OF RIVERSIDE

Case Summary

On 04/09/2021 RANCHO MIRAGE OSF, LLC filed an Other lawsuit against COUNTY OF RIVERSIDE. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Riverside Historic Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Craig Riemer. The case status is Other - Stayed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1979

  • Filing Date:

    04/09/2021

  • Case Status:

    Other - Stayed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

Judge Details

Judge

Craig Riemer

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

OSF INTERNATIONAL, INC.

RANCHO MIRAGE OSF, LLC

OLD SPAGHETTI FACTORY

Defendants

COUNTY OF RIVERSIDE

CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF ALCOHOLIC BEVERAGE CONTROL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Brian Stephen Kabateck

Defendant Attorneys

Gregory Peter Priamos

Kenneth C. Jones

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service on Complaint for Other Complaint (Over $25,000) of RANCHO MIRAGE OSF, LLC

06/08/2021: Proof of Service on Complaint for Other Complaint (Over $25,000) of RANCHO MIRAGE OSF, LLC

Notice of Document Return.

10/06/2021: Notice of Document Return.

Notice of Ruling on Petition for Coordination

10/06/2021: Notice of Ruling on Petition for Coordination

Order Assigning Coordination Trial Judge

11/15/2021: Order Assigning Coordination Trial Judge

Certificate of Mailing

09/07/2021: Certificate of Mailing

Minute Order: Court on its Own Motion

09/07/2021: Minute Order: Court on its Own Motion

Notice of Ruling Staying Action on Complaint for Other Complaint (Over $25,000) of RANCHO MIRAGE OSF, LLC

09/03/2021: Notice of Ruling Staying Action on Complaint for Other Complaint (Over $25,000) of RANCHO MIRAGE OSF, LLC

Notice of Telephonic Appearance for Hearing on Complaint for Other Complaint (Over $25,000) of RANCHO MIRAGE OSF, LLC

08/25/2021: Notice of Telephonic Appearance for Hearing on Complaint for Other Complaint (Over $25,000) of RANCHO MIRAGE OSF, LLC

Notice of Order Assigning Coordination Motion Judge and Setting Date for Hearing

08/23/2021: Notice of Order Assigning Coordination Motion Judge and Setting Date for Hearing

Notice of Document Return.

08/20/2021: Notice of Document Return.

Answer to Class Action Complaint by Department of Alcoholic Beverage Control on Complaint for Other Complaint (Over $25,000) of RANCHO MIRAGE OSF, LLC

07/26/2021: Answer to Class Action Complaint by Department of Alcoholic Beverage Control on Complaint for Other Complaint (Over $25,000) of RANCHO MIRAGE OSF, LLC

Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to timely request entry of default of all defendants who have been served but have not filed a response.

08/06/2021: Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to timely request entry of default of all defendants who have been served but have not filed a response.

Certificate of Mailing

08/06/2021: Certificate of Mailing

Minute Order: Court on its Own Motion

08/06/2021: Minute Order: Court on its Own Motion

Joint Case Management Statement on Complaint for Other Complaint (Over $25,000) of RANCHO MIRAGE OSF, LLC

08/04/2021: Joint Case Management Statement on Complaint for Other Complaint (Over $25,000) of RANCHO MIRAGE OSF, LLC

Notice of Demurrer and Demurrer by Defendant County of Riverside to Plaintiffs Class Action Complaint; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in support thereof; Declaration of Ronak N. Patel on Complaint for Other Complaint (Over $25,000) of RANCHO MI

07/28/2021: Notice of Demurrer and Demurrer by Defendant County of Riverside to Plaintiffs Class Action Complaint; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in support thereof; Declaration of Ronak N. Patel on Complaint for Other Complaint (Over $25,000) of RANCHO MIRAGE OSF, LLC

Plaintiff's Notice of Posting Jury Fees

06/28/2021: Plaintiff's Notice of Posting Jury Fees

Minute Order: Case Management Conference - Complex

06/28/2021: Minute Order: Case Management Conference - Complex

24 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Order Assigning Coordination Trial Judge; Filed By: RANCHO MIRAGE OSF, LLC; OSF INTERNATIONAL, INC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Notice of Ruling on Petition for Coordination; Filed By: RANCHO MIRAGE OSF, LLC; OSF INTERNATIONAL, INC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Document Return.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • HearingType: Order to Show Cause as to why sanctions not to exceed $1,500.00 or dismissal should not be imposed for Failure to timely request entry of default of all defendants who have been served but have not filed a response. as to Brian Stephen Kabateck, RANCHO MIRAGE OSF, LLC, OSF INTERNATIONAL, INC.; Judicial Officer: Craig Riemer; Location/Courtroom: Department 1; Disposition: Vacated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • HearingType: Case Management Conference - Complex; Judicial Officer: Craig Riemer; Location/Courtroom: Department 1; Disposition: Vacated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • HearingType: Hearing re: Demurrer on; Judicial Officer: Craig Riemer; Location/Courtroom: Department 1; Disposition: Vacated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • HearingType: Court on its Own Motion; Judicial Officer: Craig Riemer; Location/Courtroom: Department 1; Disposition: Complete

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Certificate of Mailing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Minute Order: Court on its Own Motion

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Notice of Ruling Staying Action on Complaint for Other Complaint (Over $25,000) of RANCHO MIRAGE OSF, LLC; Filed By: RANCHO MIRAGE OSF, LLC; OSF INTERNATIONAL, INC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
37 More Docket Entries
  • 05/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Notice of Acknowledgment of Receipt on Complaint for Other Complaint (Over $25,000) of RANCHO MIRAGE OSF, LLC; Filed By: RANCHO MIRAGE OSF, LLC; OSF INTERNATIONAL, INC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Additional fee for case designated as complex - Plaintiff (GC70616A); Amount: $1,000.00; Paid: $1,000.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 04/29/2021; Fine Description: eSubmit *2003 Receipt No.: 20210429-00104.1; Paid: $1,000.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Unlimited complaint or other first paper in unlimited civil case amount over $25,000 including UD over $25K, petition for writ of review, mandate, or prohibition; petition for a decree of change of name or gender (GC70611); Amount: $450.00; Paid: $450.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 04/29/2021; Fine Description: eSubmit *2003 Receipt No.: 20210429-00104.1; Paid: $450.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Department Assignment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Summons Issued and Filed; Filed By: RANCHO MIRAGE OSF, LLC; OSF INTERNATIONAL, INC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Certificate of Counsel.; Filed By: RANCHO MIRAGE OSF, LLC; OSF INTERNATIONAL, INC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Civil Case Cover Sheet (Complex) (CM-010); Filed By: RANCHO MIRAGE OSF, LLC; OSF INTERNATIONAL, INC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Complaint for Other Complaint (Over $25,000); Filed By: RANCHO MIRAGE OSF, LLC; OSF INTERNATIONAL, INC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketFilings: Complaint for Other Complaint (Over $25,000) of RANCHO MIRAGE OSF, LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less