This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 10/31/2021 at 08:17:08 (UTC).

RAMIREZ vs SOMERSET LP

Case Summary

On 07/16/2021 RAMIREZ filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against SOMERSET LP. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Murrieta Southwest Justice Center located in Riverside, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Jeffrey M. Zimel. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0608

  • Filing Date:

    07/16/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

Judge Details

Judge

Jeffrey M. Zimel

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ELVIRA RAMIREZ

Defendants

SOMERSET LP

STONEWOOD APRATMENT HOMES

 

Court Documents

Order on Court Fee Waiver (FW-003) - Granted by Clerk on Plaintiff's Claim - Over $5,000 up to $10,000 (Natural Person) filed by ELVIRA RAMIREZ

07/16/2021: Order on Court Fee Waiver (FW-003) - Granted by Clerk on Plaintiff's Claim - Over $5,000 up to $10,000 (Natural Person) filed by ELVIRA RAMIREZ

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court (SC-100) Over $5,000 up to $10,000 (Natural Person)

07/16/2021: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court (SC-100) Over $5,000 up to $10,000 (Natural Person)

Notice of Department Assignment

07/19/2021: Notice of Department Assignment

Minute Order: Hearing on Small Claims

09/13/2021: Minute Order: Hearing on Small Claims

Certificate of Mailing

09/13/2021: Certificate of Mailing

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/13/2021
  • HearingType: Hearing on Small Claims; Judicial Officer: Jeffrey M. Zimel; Location/Courtroom: Department S101; Disposition: Dismissed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • DocketDEADLINES & REMINDERS; Timestandard: Expire Fee Waivers; Expiration Date: 11/12/2021; Status: Active

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • DocketDEADLINES & REMINDERS; Timestandard: Expire Fee Waivers; Expiration Date: 11/12/2021; Status: Active

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Certificate of Mailing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Minute Order: Hearing on Small Claims

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Small Claims filing claim for more than $5,000 but less than or equal to $10,000 (CCP116.230B3); Amount: $75.00; Paid: $75.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 07/19/2021; Fine Description: Fee waiver Receipt No.: 20210719-00228.1; Paid: $75.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Department Assignment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court (SC-100) Over $5,000 up to $10,000 (Natural Person); Filed By: ELVIRA RAMIREZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Order on Court Fee Waiver (FW-003) - Granted by Clerk on Plaintiff's Claim - Over $5,000 up to $10,000 (Natural Person) filed by ELVIRA RAMIREZ; Filed By: ELVIRA RAMIREZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Request to Waive Court Fees (FW-001) on Plaintiff's Claim - Over $5,000 up to $10,000 (Natural Person) filed by ELVIRA RAMIREZ; Filed By: ELVIRA RAMIREZ; Confidential: YES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • DocketFilings: Plaintiff's Claim - Over $5,000 up to $10,000 (Natural Person) filed by ELVIRA RAMIREZ; Disposition: Dismissal - Lack of Prosecution 09/13/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SOMERSET LP is a litigant