This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 02/04/2023 at 09:12:32 (UTC).

PUSKAR vs DRIVETIME CAR SALES COMPANY, LLC

Case Summary

On 09/07/2022 PUSKAR filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against DRIVETIME CAR SALES COMPANY, LLC. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Riverside Historic Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Chad Firetag. The case status is Other - Stayed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3818

  • Filing Date:

    09/07/2022

  • Case Status:

    Other - Stayed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

Judge Details

Judge

Chad Firetag

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SHERRY PUSKAR

Defendants

DRIVETIME CAR SALES COMPANY, LLC

BRIDGECREST ACCEPTANCE CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DAVID ALAN COOPER

Defendant Attorney

Benjamin J Howard

 

Court Documents

Plaintiff's Complaint for: 1. Violation of Song-Beverly Consumer Warranty Act, Civ.C 1790 et seq.

09/07/2022: Plaintiff's Complaint for: 1. Violation of Song-Beverly Consumer Warranty Act, Civ.C 1790 et seq.

Civil Case Cover Sheet

09/07/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Certificate of Counsel.

09/07/2022: Certificate of Counsel.

Summons Issued and Filed

09/07/2022: Summons Issued and Filed

Notice of Case Management Conference Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000)

09/07/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000)

Notice of Department Assignment

09/07/2022: Notice of Department Assignment

Proof of Service Summons on Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000) of SHERRY PUSKAR

09/13/2022: Proof of Service Summons on Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000) of SHERRY PUSKAR

Proof of Service Summons on Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000) of SHERRY PUSKAR

09/13/2022: Proof of Service Summons on Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000) of SHERRY PUSKAR

Notice of Document Return.

11/04/2022: Notice of Document Return.

JOINT STIPULATION TO ARBITRATE CLAIMS AND STAY MATTER PENDING ARBITRATION;ORDER on Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000) of SHERRY PUSKAR

11/08/2022: JOINT STIPULATION TO ARBITRATE CLAIMS AND STAY MATTER PENDING ARBITRATION;ORDER on Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000) of SHERRY PUSKAR

PROOF OF SERVICE VIA ELECTRONIC MEANS ON JOINT STIPULATION on Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000) of SHERRY PUSKAR

11/04/2022: PROOF OF SERVICE VIA ELECTRONIC MEANS ON JOINT STIPULATION on Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000) of SHERRY PUSKAR

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/06/2023
  • HearingType: Case Management Conference; Judicial Officer: Chad Firetag; Location/Courtroom: Department 3; Disposition: Vacated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: JOINT STIPULATION TO ARBITRATE CLAIMS AND STAY MATTER PENDING ARBITRATION;ORDER on Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000) of SHERRY PUSKAR; Filed By: DRIVETIME CAR SALES COMPANY, LLC; BRIDGECREST ACCEPTANCE CORPORATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2022
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Unlimited response: answer or other first paper filed by each party other than plaintiff amount over $25,000 including UD; includes response by party to petition for relief in discovery dispute related to out-of-state case (GC70612); Amount: $450.00; Paid: $450.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 11/07/2022; Fine Description: EFiling Payment Receipt No.: EFM20221107-00580.1; Paid: $450.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2022
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Unlimited response: answer or other first paper filed by each party other than plaintiff amount over $25,000 including UD; includes response by party to petition for relief in discovery dispute related to out-of-state case (GC70612); Amount: $450.00; Paid: $450.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 11/07/2022; Fine Description: EFiling Payment Receipt No.: EFM20221107-00580.1; Paid: $450.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2022
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Fee for eFiling; Amount: $1.00; Paid: $1.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 11/07/2022; Fine Description: EFiling Payment Receipt No.: EFM20221107-00580.1; Paid: $1.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Document Return.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: PROOF OF SERVICE VIA ELECTRONIC MEANS ON JOINT STIPULATION on Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000) of SHERRY PUSKAR; Filed By: DRIVETIME CAR SALES COMPANY, LLC; BRIDGECREST ACCEPTANCE CORPORATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2022
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Fee for eFiling; Amount: $1.00; Paid: $1.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 09/14/2022; Fine Description: EFiling Payment Receipt No.: EFM20220914-01765.1; Paid: $1.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Proof of Service Summons on Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000) of SHERRY PUSKAR; Filed By: SHERRY PUSKAR

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Proof of Service Summons on Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000) of SHERRY PUSKAR; Filed By: SHERRY PUSKAR

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2022
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Unlimited complaint or other first paper in unlimited civil case amount over $25,000 including UD over $25K, petition for writ of review, mandate, or prohibition; petition for a decree of change of name or gender (GC70611); Amount: $450.00; Paid: $450.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 09/07/2022; Fine Description: EFiling Payment Receipt No.: EFM20220907-02201.1; Paid: $450.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2022
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Fee for eFiling; Amount: $1.00; Paid: $1.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 09/07/2022; Fine Description: EFiling Payment Receipt No.: EFM20220907-02201.1; Paid: $1.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Department Assignment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Case Management Conference Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Summons Issued and Filed; Filed By: SHERRY PUSKAR

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Certificate of Counsel.; Filed By: SHERRY PUSKAR

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: SHERRY PUSKAR

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Plaintiff's Complaint for: 1. Violation of Song-Beverly Consumer Warranty Act, Civ.C 1790 et seq.; Filed By: SHERRY PUSKAR

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2022
  • DocketFilings: Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000) of SHERRY PUSKAR

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less