This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 01/22/2023 at 09:10:05 (UTC).

PRETORIUS vs EIGHT4NINE RESTAURANT AND LOUNGE, INC.

Case Summary

On 08/17/2022 PRETORIUS filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against EIGHT4NINE RESTAURANT AND LOUNGE, INC. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Palm Springs Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Kira L. Klatchko. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3303

  • Filing Date:

    08/17/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

Judge Details

Judge

Kira L. Klatchko

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JAN PRETORIUS

Defendant

EIGHT4NINE RESTAURANT AND LOUNGE, INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

TOM G. ANTUNOVICH

Defendant Attorney

DANIELLE DUBE MITTSKUS

 

Court Documents

Complaint for Product Liability (Over $25,000)

08/17/2022: Complaint for Product Liability (Over $25,000)

Civil Case Cover Sheet

08/17/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Certificate of Counsel.

08/17/2022: Certificate of Counsel.

Summons Issued and Filed

08/17/2022: Summons Issued and Filed

Notice of Case Management Conference Complaint for Product Liability (Over $25,000)

08/24/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference Complaint for Product Liability (Over $25,000)

Notice of Department Assignment

08/24/2022: Notice of Department Assignment

Proof of Service on Complaint for Product Liability (Over $25,000) of JAN PRETORIUS

09/06/2022: Proof of Service on Complaint for Product Liability (Over $25,000) of JAN PRETORIUS

Answer to Complaint on Complaint for Product Liability (Over $25,000) of JAN PRETORIUS

10/06/2022: Answer to Complaint on Complaint for Product Liability (Over $25,000) of JAN PRETORIUS

Minute Order: Nunc Pro Tunc Hearing

10/24/2022: Minute Order: Nunc Pro Tunc Hearing

Corrected Nunc Pro Tunc Notice Of Posting Jury Fees

10/24/2022: Corrected Nunc Pro Tunc Notice Of Posting Jury Fees

Clerk's Certificate of Mailing on Complaint for Product Liability (Over $25,000) of JAN PRETORIUS

10/24/2022: Clerk's Certificate of Mailing on Complaint for Product Liability (Over $25,000) of JAN PRETORIUS

Notice of Settlement of Entire Case (CM-200) on Complaint for Product Liability (Over $25,000) of JAN PRETORIUS

11/04/2022: Notice of Settlement of Entire Case (CM-200) on Complaint for Product Liability (Over $25,000) of JAN PRETORIUS

Notice of Hearing (eFiling) on Notice of Settlement of Entire Case (CM-200) on Complaint for Product Liability (Over $25,000) of JAN PRETORIUS

11/04/2022: Notice of Hearing (eFiling) on Notice of Settlement of Entire Case (CM-200) on Complaint for Product Liability (Over $25,000) of JAN PRETORIUS

Request for Dismissal

11/14/2022: Request for Dismissal

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/21/2023
  • HearingType: Case Management Conference; Judicial Officer: Kira L. Klatchko; Location/Courtroom: Department PS1; Disposition: Vacated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • HearingType: Hearing on Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal After Unconditional Settlement Pursuant to CRC 3.1385(b); Judicial Officer: Kira L. Klatchko; Location/Courtroom: Department PS1; Disposition: Vacated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2022
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Fee for eFiling; Amount: $1.00; Paid: $1.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 11/16/2022; Fine Description: EFiling Payment Receipt No.: EFM20221116-00801.1; Paid: $1.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Request for Dismissal; Filed By: JAN PRETORIUS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2022
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Fee for eFiling; Amount: $1.00; Paid: $1.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 11/04/2022; Fine Description: EFiling Payment Receipt No.: EFM20221104-00837.1; Paid: $1.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Hearing (eFiling) on Notice of Settlement of Entire Case (CM-200) on Complaint for Product Liability (Over $25,000) of JAN PRETORIUS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Notice of Settlement of Entire Case (CM-200) on Complaint for Product Liability (Over $25,000) of JAN PRETORIUS; Filed By: JAN PRETORIUS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/24/2022
  • HearingType: Nunc Pro Tunc Hearing; Judicial Officer: Kira L. Klatchko; Location/Courtroom: Department PS1; Disposition: Completed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Minute Order: Nunc Pro Tunc Hearing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Clerk's Certificate of Mailing on Complaint for Product Liability (Over $25,000) of JAN PRETORIUS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 09/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Proof of Service on Complaint for Product Liability (Over $25,000) of JAN PRETORIUS; Filed By: JAN PRETORIUS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2022
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Fee for eFiling; Amount: $1.00; Paid: $1.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 08/24/2022; Fine Description: EFiling Payment Receipt No.: EFM20220824-01743.1; Paid: $1.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2022
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Unlimited complaint or other first paper in unlimited civil case amount over $25,000 including UD over $25K, petition for writ of review, mandate, or prohibition; petition for a decree of change of name or gender (GC70611); Amount: $450.00; Paid: $450.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 08/24/2022; Fine Description: EFiling Payment Receipt No.: EFM20220824-01743.1; Paid: $450.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Department Assignment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Case Management Conference Complaint for Product Liability (Over $25,000)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Summons Issued and Filed; Filed By: JAN PRETORIUS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Certificate of Counsel.; Filed By: JAN PRETORIUS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: JAN PRETORIUS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Complaint for Product Liability (Over $25,000); Filed By: JAN PRETORIUS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2022
  • DocketFilings: Complaint for Product Liability (Over $25,000) of JAN PRETORIUS; Disposition: Dismissal After Settlement Conference 11/14/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less