This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 12/25/2022 at 09:09:55 (UTC).

POTTER vs JP MORGAN CHASE NATIONAL CORPORATE SERVICE INC

Case Summary

On 10/21/2022 POTTER filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against JP MORGAN CHASE NATIONAL CORPORATE SERVICE INC. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Palm Springs Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Arthur Hester. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0920

  • Filing Date:

    10/21/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

Judge Details

Judge

Arthur Hester

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DEONTAY POTTER

Defendant

JP MORGAN CHASE NATIONAL CORPORATE SERVICE INC

 

Court Documents

Notice of Department Assignment (Commissioner)

10/21/2022: Notice of Department Assignment (Commissioner)

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court (SC-100) – Over $5,000 up to $10,000 (Natural Person)

10/21/2022: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court (SC-100) – Over $5,000 up to $10,000 (Natural Person)

Proof of Service (Small Claims) on Plaintiff's Claim - Over $5,000 up to $10,000 (Natural Person) filed by DEONTAY POTTER

10/26/2022: Proof of Service (Small Claims) on Plaintiff's Claim - Over $5,000 up to $10,000 (Natural Person) filed by DEONTAY POTTER

Request to Postpone Small Claims Hearing on Plaintiff's Claim - Over $5,000 up to $10,000 (Natural Person) filed by DEONTAY POTTER

11/03/2022: Request to Postpone Small Claims Hearing on Plaintiff's Claim - Over $5,000 up to $10,000 (Natural Person) filed by DEONTAY POTTER

Order on Request to Postpone Small Claims Hearing

11/09/2022: Order on Request to Postpone Small Claims Hearing

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/24/2023
  • HearingType: Hearing on Small Claims; Judicial Officer: Arthur Hester; Location/Courtroom: Department PS4

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • HearingType: Hearing on Small Claims; Judicial Officer: Arthur Hester; Location/Courtroom: Department PS4; Disposition: Vacated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Order on Request to Postpone Small Claims Hearing; Filed By: JP MORGAN CHASE NATIONAL CORPORATE SERVICE INC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2022
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Fee for eFiling; Amount: $1.00; Paid: $1.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 11/03/2022; Fine Description: EFiling Payment Receipt No.: EFM20221103-01522.1; Paid: $1.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2022
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Request to Postpone Small Claims Hearing; Amount: $10.00; Paid: $10.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 11/03/2022; Fine Description: EFiling Payment Receipt No.: EFM20221103-01522.1; Paid: $10.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Request to Postpone Small Claims Hearing on Plaintiff's Claim - Over $5,000 up to $10,000 (Natural Person) filed by DEONTAY POTTER; Filed By: JP MORGAN CHASE NATIONAL CORPORATE SERVICE INC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Proof of Service (Small Claims) on Plaintiff's Claim - Over $5,000 up to $10,000 (Natural Person) filed by DEONTAY POTTER; Filed By: DEONTAY POTTER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2022
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Small Claims filing claim for more than $5,000 but less than or equal to $10,000 (CCP116.230B3); Amount: $75.00; Paid: $75.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 10/21/2022; Fine Description: Visa *8688 Receipt No.: 20221021-00277.1; Paid: $75.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Department Assignment (Commissioner)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court (SC-100) Over $5,000 up to $10,000 (Natural Person); Filed By: DEONTAY POTTER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2022
  • DocketFilings: Plaintiff's Claim - Over $5,000 up to $10,000 (Natural Person) filed by DEONTAY POTTER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where JP MORGAN CHASE NATIONAL CORPORATE SERVICES INC. is a litigant