This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 10/20/2021 at 13:24:09 (UTC).

PLAZA INVESTMENT COMPANY, INC vs COE

Case Summary

On 01/20/2021 PLAZA INVESTMENT COMPANY, INC filed a Property - Other Eviction lawsuit against COE. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Palm Springs Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0028

  • Filing Date:

    01/20/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Eviction

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PLAZA INVESTMENT COMPANY, INC

Defendants

LIOR EMUNA

ROBERT COE

CLG DISTRIBUTION, LLC

GIL EYTAN EYTAN

CHEN DAVID

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Howard Jay Ettinger

Defendant Attorney

Itai Klein

 

Court Documents

Plaintiff's Mandatory Cover Sheet and Supplemental Allegations (Unlawful Detainer) on Complaint for Unlawful Detainer - Commercial (Over $25,000) of PLAZA INVESTMENT COMPANY, INC

01/20/2021: Plaintiff's Mandatory Cover Sheet and Supplemental Allegations (Unlawful Detainer) on Complaint for Unlawful Detainer - Commercial (Over $25,000) of PLAZA INVESTMENT COMPANY, INC

Summons - Unlawful Detainer - Eviction Issued and Filed (SUM-130)

01/20/2021: Summons - Unlawful Detainer - Eviction Issued and Filed (SUM-130)

Certificate of Counsel.

01/20/2021: Certificate of Counsel.

Civil Case Cover Sheet

01/20/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint for Unlawful Detainer - Commercial (Over $25,000)

01/20/2021: Complaint for Unlawful Detainer - Commercial (Over $25,000)

Clerks Notice of Unlawful Detainer Complaint on Complaint for Unlawful Detainer - Commercial (Over $25,000) of PLAZA INVESTMENT COMPANY, INC

01/26/2021: Clerks Notice of Unlawful Detainer Complaint on Complaint for Unlawful Detainer - Commercial (Over $25,000) of PLAZA INVESTMENT COMPANY, INC

Notice of Department Assignment

01/26/2021: Notice of Department Assignment

Answer to Complaint on Complaint for Unlawful Detainer - Commercial (Over $25,000) of PLAZA INVESTMENT COMPANY, INC

01/27/2021: Answer to Complaint on Complaint for Unlawful Detainer - Commercial (Over $25,000) of PLAZA INVESTMENT COMPANY, INC

Stipulation for Entry of Judgment (Unlawful Detainer)

02/18/2021: Stipulation for Entry of Judgment (Unlawful Detainer)

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/18/2021
  • JudgementStatus: Entered; Type: Possession and Money; Applies to: Complaint for Unlawful Detainer - Commercial (Over $25,000) of PLAZA INVESTMENT COMPANY, INC; For/Against: For - PLAZA INVESTMENT COMPANY, INC Against - CLG DISTRIBUTION, LLC Against - ROBERT COE Against - CHEN DAVID Against - LIOR EMUNA Against - GIL EYTAN EYTAN; Details; Past Due Rent: $9,100.00; Subtotal Judgment: $9,100.00; Total: $9,100.00; Property: 188 North Palm Canyon DrivePalm Springs, CA 92262; Premises Address: 188 North Palm Canyon Drive PALM SPRINGS, CA, 92262 No lock out prior to 02/28/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • DocketDEADLINES & REMINDERS; Timestandard: 10 Year Judgment Expiration; Expiration Date: 02/18/2031; Status: Active

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Stipulation for Entry of Judgment (Unlawful Detainer); Filed By: PLAZA INVESTMENT COMPANY, INC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketStatus: Receive and Forward; Description: Proposed Stipulation for Judgment on Complaint for Unlawful Detainer - Commercial (Over $25,000) of PLAZA INVESTMENT COMPANY, INC; Filed By: PLAZA INVESTMENT COMPANY, INC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Continuance of Hearing or Case Management-Stipulation and Order-Service by Posting or Publication; Amount: $20.00; Paid: $20.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 02/16/2021; Fine Description: Check #6090 Receipt No.: 20210216-00476.1; Paid: $20.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Unlimited response: answer or other first paper filed by each party other than plaintiff amount over $25,000 including UD; includes response by party to petition for relief in discovery dispute related to out-of-state case (GC70612); Amount: $450.00; Paid: $450.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 01/27/2021; Fine Description: eSubmit *5007 Receipt No.: 20210127-00569.1; Paid: $450.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Unlimited response: answer or other first paper filed by each party other than plaintiff amount over $25,000 including UD; includes response by party to petition for relief in discovery dispute related to out-of-state case (GC70612); Amount: $450.00; Paid: $450.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 01/27/2021; Fine Description: eSubmit *5007 Receipt No.: 20210127-00569.1; Paid: $450.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Unlimited response: answer or other first paper filed by each party other than plaintiff amount over $25,000 including UD; includes response by party to petition for relief in discovery dispute related to out-of-state case (GC70612); Amount: $450.00; Paid: $450.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 01/27/2021; Fine Description: eSubmit *5007 Receipt No.: 20210127-00569.1; Paid: $450.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Unlimited response: answer or other first paper filed by each party other than plaintiff amount over $25,000 including UD; includes response by party to petition for relief in discovery dispute related to out-of-state case (GC70612); Amount: $450.00; Paid: $450.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 01/27/2021; Fine Description: eSubmit *5007 Receipt No.: 20210127-00569.1; Paid: $450.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Unlimited response: answer or other first paper filed by each party other than plaintiff amount over $25,000 including UD; includes response by party to petition for relief in discovery dispute related to out-of-state case (GC70612); Amount: $450.00; Paid: $450.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 01/27/2021; Fine Description: eSubmit *5007 Receipt No.: 20210127-00569.1; Paid: $450.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Answer to Complaint on Complaint for Unlawful Detainer - Commercial (Over $25,000) of PLAZA INVESTMENT COMPANY, INC; Filed By: ROBERT COE; CLG DISTRIBUTION, LLC; GIL EYTAN EYTAN; LIOR EMUNA; CHEN DAVID

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Unlimited complaint or other first paper in unlimited civil case amount over $25,000 including UD over $25K, petition for writ of review, mandate, or prohibition; petition for a decree of change of name or gender (GC70611); Amount: $450.00; Paid: $450.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 01/26/2021; Fine Description: eSubmit *5007 Receipt No.: 20210126-00059.1; Paid: $450.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Clerks Notice of Unlawful Detainer Complaint on Complaint for Unlawful Detainer - Commercial (Over $25,000) of PLAZA INVESTMENT COMPANY, INC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Department Assignment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Plaintiff's Mandatory Cover Sheet and Supplemental Allegations (Unlawful Detainer)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Summons - Unlawful Detainer - Eviction Issued and Filed (SUM-130); Filed By: PLAZA INVESTMENT COMPANY, INC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Certificate of Counsel.; Filed By: PLAZA INVESTMENT COMPANY, INC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: PLAZA INVESTMENT COMPANY, INC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Complaint for Unlawful Detainer - Commercial (Over $25,000); Filed By: PLAZA INVESTMENT COMPANY, INC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • DocketFilings: Complaint for Unlawful Detainer - Commercial (Over $25,000) of PLAZA INVESTMENT COMPANY, INC; Disposition: Stipulated Judgment 02/18/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less