This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 06/30/2023 at 09:06:27 (UTC).

PHILLIPS vs LAKE ELSINORE UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT

Case Summary

On 12/27/2022 PHILLIPS filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against LAKE ELSINORE UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Riverside Historic Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The Judge overseeing this case is O.G. Magno. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5607

  • Filing Date:

    12/27/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

Judge Details

Judge

O.G. Magno

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

KIMBERLY PHILLIPS

Defendants

LAKE ELSINORE UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT

NICK POWERS

TRACY SEPULVEDA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DENNIS BRADY

Defendant Attorney

NICHOLAS STREET

 

Court Documents

Certificate of Mailing

06/26/2023: Certificate of Mailing

Minute Order: Court on its Own Motion

06/26/2023: Minute Order: Court on its Own Motion

Proof of Service by Electronic Service (non-complaint) of Notice of Jury Fee Deposit on Complaint for Other Employment (Over $25,000) of KIMBERLY PHILLIPS

06/15/2023: Proof of Service by Electronic Service (non-complaint) of Notice of Jury Fee Deposit on Complaint for Other Employment (Over $25,000) of KIMBERLY PHILLIPS

Proof of Service by Electronic Service (non-complaint) of Case Management Statement on Complaint for Other Employment (Over $25,000) of KIMBERLY PHILLIPS

06/15/2023: Proof of Service by Electronic Service (non-complaint) of Case Management Statement on Complaint for Other Employment (Over $25,000) of KIMBERLY PHILLIPS

Notice of Jury Fee Deposit on Complaint for Other Employment (Over $25,000) of KIMBERLY PHILLIPS

06/14/2023: Notice of Jury Fee Deposit on Complaint for Other Employment (Over $25,000) of KIMBERLY PHILLIPS

Case Management Statement untimely pursuant to CRC 3.725 on Complaint for Other Employment (Over $25,000) of KIMBERLY PHILLIPS

06/14/2023: Case Management Statement untimely pursuant to CRC 3.725 on Complaint for Other Employment (Over $25,000) of KIMBERLY PHILLIPS

Notice of Document Return.

06/14/2023: Notice of Document Return.

Notice of Document Return.

06/14/2023: Notice of Document Return.

Notice of Posting Jury Fees. on Complaint for Other Employment (Over $25,000) of KIMBERLY PHILLIPS

06/13/2023: Notice of Posting Jury Fees. on Complaint for Other Employment (Over $25,000) of KIMBERLY PHILLIPS

Case Management Statement on Complaint for Other Employment (Over $25,000) of KIMBERLY PHILLIPS

06/13/2023: Case Management Statement on Complaint for Other Employment (Over $25,000) of KIMBERLY PHILLIPS

Answer to Complaint on Complaint for Other Employment (Over $25,000) of KIMBERLY PHILLIPS

02/27/2023: Answer to Complaint on Complaint for Other Employment (Over $25,000) of KIMBERLY PHILLIPS

Proof of Service of Summons on Complaint for Other Employment (Over $25,000) of KIMBERLY PHILLIPS

01/30/2023: Proof of Service of Summons on Complaint for Other Employment (Over $25,000) of KIMBERLY PHILLIPS

Proof of Service of Summons on Complaint for Other Employment (Over $25,000) of KIMBERLY PHILLIPS

01/30/2023: Proof of Service of Summons on Complaint for Other Employment (Over $25,000) of KIMBERLY PHILLIPS

Proof of Service of Summons on Complaint for Other Employment (Over $25,000) of KIMBERLY PHILLIPS

01/30/2023: Proof of Service of Summons on Complaint for Other Employment (Over $25,000) of KIMBERLY PHILLIPS

Notice of Department Assignment

12/30/2022: Notice of Department Assignment

Notice of Case Management Conference Complaint for Other Employment (Over $25,000)

12/30/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference Complaint for Other Employment (Over $25,000)

Summons Issued and Filed

12/27/2022: Summons Issued and Filed

Certificate of Counsel.

12/27/2022: Certificate of Counsel.

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/03/2024
  • HearingType: Trial Setting Conference; Judicial Officer: O.G. Magno; Location/Courtroom: Department 7

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2023
  • HearingType: Case Management Conference; Judicial Officer: O.G. Magno; Location/Courtroom: Department 7; Disposition: Vacated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/26/2023
  • HearingType: Court on its Own Motion; Judicial Officer: O.G. Magno; Location/Courtroom: Department 7; Disposition: Completed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Certificate of Mailing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Minute Order: Court on its Own Motion

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/16/2023
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Fee for eFiling; Amount: $1.00; Paid: $1.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 06/16/2023; Fine Description: EFiling Payment Receipt No.: EFM20230616-01337.1; Paid: $1.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/15/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Proof of Service by Electronic Service (non-complaint) of Case Management Statement on Complaint for Other Employment (Over $25,000) of KIMBERLY PHILLIPS; Filed By: KIMBERLY PHILLIPS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/15/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Proof of Service by Electronic Service (non-complaint) of Notice of Jury Fee Deposit on Complaint for Other Employment (Over $25,000) of KIMBERLY PHILLIPS; Filed By: KIMBERLY PHILLIPS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/14/2023
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Jury Fee Deposit; Amount: $150.00; Paid: $150.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 06/14/2023; Fine Description: EFiling Payment Receipt No.: EFM20230614-01053.1; Paid: $150.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/14/2023
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Fee for eFiling; Amount: $1.00; Paid: $1.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 06/14/2023; Fine Description: EFiling Payment Receipt No.: EFM20230614-01053.1; Paid: $1.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
16 More Docket Entries
  • 01/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Proof of Service of Summons on Complaint for Other Employment (Over $25,000) of KIMBERLY PHILLIPS; Filed By: KIMBERLY PHILLIPS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2022
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Unlimited complaint or other first paper in unlimited civil case amount over $25,000 including UD over $25K, petition for writ of review, mandate, or prohibition; petition for a decree of change of name or gender (GC70611); Amount: $450.00; Paid: $450.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 12/30/2022; Fine Description: EFiling Payment Receipt No.: EFM20221230-00806.1; Paid: $450.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2022
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Fee for eFiling; Amount: $1.00; Paid: $1.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 12/30/2022; Fine Description: EFiling Payment Receipt No.: EFM20221230-00806.1; Paid: $1.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Department Assignment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Case Management Conference Complaint for Other Employment (Over $25,000)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Complaint for Medical Condition Discrimination; Filed By: KIMBERLY PHILLIPS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: KIMBERLY PHILLIPS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Certificate of Counsel.; Filed By: KIMBERLY PHILLIPS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Summons Issued and Filed; Filed By: KIMBERLY PHILLIPS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2022
  • DocketFilings: Complaint for Other Employment (Over $25,000) of KIMBERLY PHILLIPS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less