This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 01/11/2023 at 01:02:07 (UTC).

PHH MORTGAGE CORPORATION vs RIVERSIDE HOUSING DEVELOPMENT CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 01/04/2023 PHH MORTGAGE CORPORATION filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against RIVERSIDE HOUSING DEVELOPMENT CORPORATION. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Riverside Historic Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Craig Riemer. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0046

  • Filing Date:

    01/04/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

Judge Details

Judge

Craig Riemer

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PHH MORTGAGE CORPORATION

Defendants

RIVERSIDE HOUSING DEVELOPMENT CORPORATION

FIRST AMERICAN TITLE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JAMES F. LEWIN

 

Court Documents

Complaint for Cancellation of Instrument

01/04/2023: Complaint for Cancellation of Instrument

Civil Case Cover Sheet

01/04/2023: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Certificate of Counsel.

01/04/2023: Certificate of Counsel.

Notice of Document Quality Assurance

01/06/2023: Notice of Document Quality Assurance

Notice of Document Quality Assurance

01/06/2023: Notice of Document Quality Assurance

Notice of Department Assignment

01/06/2023: Notice of Department Assignment

Notice of Case Management Conference Complaint for Other Real Property (Over $25,000)

01/06/2023: Notice of Case Management Conference Complaint for Other Real Property (Over $25,000)

Notice of Document Return.

01/06/2023: Notice of Document Return.

Notice of Document Return.

01/09/2023: Notice of Document Return.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/05/2023
  • HearingType: Case Management Conference; Judicial Officer: Craig Riemer; Location/Courtroom: Department 1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Document Return.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Unlimited complaint or other first paper in unlimited civil case amount over $25,000 including UD over $25K, petition for writ of review, mandate, or prohibition; petition for a decree of change of name or gender (GC70611); Amount: $450.00; Paid: $450.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 01/06/2023; Fine Description: EFiling Payment Receipt No.: EFM20230106-00263.1; Paid: $450.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Fee for eFiling; Amount: $1.00; Paid: $1.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 01/06/2023; Fine Description: EFiling Payment Receipt No.: EFM20230106-00263.1; Paid: $1.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Document Return.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Case Management Conference Complaint for Other Real Property (Over $25,000)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Department Assignment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Document Quality Assurance

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Document Quality Assurance

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2023
  • DocketDEADLINES & REMINDERS; Timestandard: Non-Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint; Expiration Date: 03/05/2023; Status: Active

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Certificate of Counsel.; Filed By: PHH MORTGAGE CORPORATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: PHH MORTGAGE CORPORATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Complaint for Cancellation of Instrument; Filed By: PHH MORTGAGE CORPORATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2023
  • DocketFilings: Complaint for Other Real Property (Over $25,000) of PHH MORTGAGE CORPORATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less