This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 11/03/2021 at 19:25:44 (UTC).

PHELPS-HEATH vs RALPHS GROCERY COMPANY

Case Summary

On 07/30/2021 PHELPS-HEATH filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against RALPHS GROCERY COMPANY. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Palm Springs Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4024

  • Filing Date:

    07/30/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DEBORAH PHELPS-HEATH

Defendants

RALPHS GROCERY COMPANY

THE KROGER CO

M703 KROGER WEST/RALPHS

RALPHS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WERNER MEISSNER

Defendant Attorney

Russell Sterling Fuerst

 

Court Documents

Complaint for Personal Injuries and Damages

07/30/2021: Complaint for Personal Injuries and Damages

Summons Issued and Filed

07/30/2021: Summons Issued and Filed

Certificate of Counsel.

07/30/2021: Certificate of Counsel.

Civil Case Cover Sheet

07/30/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Management Conference Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000)

08/03/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000)

Notice of Department Assignment

08/03/2021: Notice of Department Assignment

Notice of Document Return.

08/04/2021: Notice of Document Return.

Demand for Jury Trial on Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of DEBORAH PHELPS-HEATH

08/04/2021: Demand for Jury Trial on Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of DEBORAH PHELPS-HEATH

Notice of Telephonic Appearance for Hearing on Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of DEBORAH PHELPS-HEATH

09/30/2021: Notice of Telephonic Appearance for Hearing on Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of DEBORAH PHELPS-HEATH

Proof of Service on Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of DEBORAH PHELPS-HEATH

09/29/2021: Proof of Service on Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of DEBORAH PHELPS-HEATH

Proof of Service on Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of DEBORAH PHELPS-HEATH

09/29/2021: Proof of Service on Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of DEBORAH PHELPS-HEATH

Notice of Document Return.

09/29/2021: Notice of Document Return.

Answer to Complaint on Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of DEBORAH PHELPS-HEATH

10/13/2021: Answer to Complaint on Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of DEBORAH PHELPS-HEATH

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/31/2022
  • HearingType: Case Management Conference; Judicial Officer: Assigned Judge; Location/Courtroom: Department PS2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Unlimited response: answer or other first paper filed by each party other than plaintiff amount over $25,000 including UD; includes response by party to petition for relief in discovery dispute related to out-of-state case (GC70612); Amount: $450.00; Paid: $450.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 10/29/2021; Fine Description: eSubmit *1792 Receipt No.: 20211029-00473.1; Paid: $450.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Fee for eSubmit (SAP 821157); Amount: $2.00; Paid: $2.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 10/29/2021; Fine Description: eSubmit *1792 Receipt No.: 20211029-00473.1; Paid: $2.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Answer to Complaint on Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of DEBORAH PHELPS-HEATH; Filed By: RALPHS GROCERY COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Telephonic Appearance for Hearing on Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of DEBORAH PHELPS-HEATH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Proof of Service on Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of DEBORAH PHELPS-HEATH; Filed By: DEBORAH PHELPS-HEATH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Proof of Service on Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of DEBORAH PHELPS-HEATH; Filed By: DEBORAH PHELPS-HEATH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Document Return.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Demand for Jury Trial on Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of DEBORAH PHELPS-HEATH; Filed By: DEBORAH PHELPS-HEATH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Document Return.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Unlimited complaint or other first paper in unlimited civil case amount over $25,000 including UD over $25K, petition for writ of review, mandate, or prohibition; petition for a decree of change of name or gender (GC70611); Amount: $450.00; Paid: $450.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 08/03/2021; Fine Description: EFiling Payment Receipt No.: EFM20210803-00549.1; Paid: $450.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Department Assignment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Case Management Conference Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: DEBORAH PHELPS-HEATH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Certificate of Counsel.; Filed By: DEBORAH PHELPS-HEATH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Summons Issued and Filed; Filed By: DEBORAH PHELPS-HEATH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Complaint for Personal Injuries and Damages; Filed By: DEBORAH PHELPS-HEATH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • DocketFilings: Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of DEBORAH PHELPS-HEATH

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where RALPHS is a litigant

Latest cases where RALPHS GROCERY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where The Kroger Co is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Fuerst, Russell S