This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 01/21/2023 at 08:01:54 (UTC).

Petition of PATRICK WILLIAM WHALEN

Case Summary

On 12/02/2022 Petition of PATRICK WILLIAM WHALEN was filed as an Other - Name Change lawsuit. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Murrieta Southwest Justice Center located in Riverside, California. The Judge overseeing this case is James Hodgkins. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7836

  • Filing Date:

    12/02/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Name Change

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

Judge Details

Judge

James Hodgkins

 

Party Details

Petitioner

PATRICK WILLIAM WHALEN

 

Court Documents

Notice of Department Assignment

12/02/2022: Notice of Department Assignment

Petition for Change of Name (NC–100)

12/02/2022: Petition for Change of Name (NC–100)

Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/02/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Certificate of Counsel.

12/02/2022: Certificate of Counsel.

Order to Show Cause for Change of Name (NC-120)

12/02/2022: Order to Show Cause for Change of Name (NC-120)

Proof of Publication; Final Date of Publication is 12/29/2022 on Petition for Change of Name PATRICK WILLIAM WHALEN

01/03/2023: Proof of Publication; Final Date of Publication is 12/29/2022 on Petition for Change of Name PATRICK WILLIAM WHALEN

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/19/2023
  • HearingType: Order to Show Cause re: Change of Name; Judicial Officer: James Hodgkins; Location/Courtroom: Department S101

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Proof of Publication; Final Date of Publication is 12/29/2022 on Petition for Change of Name PATRICK WILLIAM WHALEN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Unlimited complaint or other first paper in unlimited civil case amount over $25,000 including UD over $25K, petition for writ of review, mandate, or prohibition; petition for a decree of change of name or gender (GC70611); Amount: $450.00; Paid: $450.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 12/02/2022; Fine Description: Visa *3878 Receipt No.: 20221202-00532.1; Paid: $450.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Department Assignment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • DocketStatus: Proposed; Description: Proposed Decree Changing Name (NC-130); Filed By: PATRICK WILLIAM WHALEN; Confidential: YES Confidential

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Order to Show Cause for Change of Name (NC-120); Filed By: PATRICK WILLIAM WHALEN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Certificate of Counsel.; Filed By: PATRICK WILLIAM WHALEN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: PATRICK WILLIAM WHALEN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Petition for Change of Name (NC100); Filed By: PATRICK WILLIAM WHALEN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • DocketFilings: Petition for Change of Name PATRICK WILLIAM WHALEN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less