This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 10/24/2021 at 11:47:42 (UTC).

PEREZ RECONSTRUCTION CONTRACTORS INC vs RODRIGUEZ

Case Summary

On 01/13/2021 PEREZ RECONSTRUCTION CONTRACTORS INC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against RODRIGUEZ. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Moreno Valley Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Eric V. Isaac. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0012

  • Filing Date:

    01/13/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

Judge Details

Judge

Eric V. Isaac

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PEREZ RECONSTRUCTION CONTRACTORS INC

Defendants

ANGELICA RODRIGUEZ

VICTOR RUIZ

 

Court Documents

Notice of Telephonic Appearance for Hearing on Plaintiff's Claim - Over $1,500 up to $5,000 filed by PEREZ RECONSTRUCTION CONTRACTORS INC

01/21/2021: Notice of Telephonic Appearance for Hearing on Plaintiff's Claim - Over $1,500 up to $5,000 filed by PEREZ RECONSTRUCTION CONTRACTORS INC

Proof of Service (Small Claims) on Plaintiff's Claim - Over $1,500 up to $5,000 filed by PEREZ RECONSTRUCTION CONTRACTORS INC

02/08/2021: Proof of Service (Small Claims) on Plaintiff's Claim - Over $1,500 up to $5,000 filed by PEREZ RECONSTRUCTION CONTRACTORS INC

Notice of Telephonic Appearance on Plaintiff's Claim - Over $1,500 up to $5,000 filed by PEREZ RECONSTRUCTION CONTRACTORS INC

03/09/2021: Notice of Telephonic Appearance on Plaintiff's Claim - Over $1,500 up to $5,000 filed by PEREZ RECONSTRUCTION CONTRACTORS INC

Minute Order: Hearing on Small Claims

03/09/2021: Minute Order: Hearing on Small Claims

Certificate of Mailing

03/09/2021: Certificate of Mailing

Notice of Telephonic Appearance for Hearing on Plaintiff's Claim - Over $1,500 up to $5,000 filed by PEREZ RECONSTRUCTION CONTRACTORS INC

04/05/2021: Notice of Telephonic Appearance for Hearing on Plaintiff's Claim - Over $1,500 up to $5,000 filed by PEREZ RECONSTRUCTION CONTRACTORS INC

Minute Order: Court on its Own Motion

04/05/2021: Minute Order: Court on its Own Motion

Certificate of Mailing

04/05/2021: Certificate of Mailing

Authorization to Appear (SC-109). Authorized to appear: Irene Perez

05/12/2021: Authorization to Appear (SC-109). Authorized to appear: Irene Perez

Certificate of Mailing Small Claims Notice of Entry of Judgment on Plaintiff's Claim - Over $1,500 up to $5,000 filed by PEREZ RECONSTRUCTION CONTRACTORS INC

05/12/2021: Certificate of Mailing Small Claims Notice of Entry of Judgment on Plaintiff's Claim - Over $1,500 up to $5,000 filed by PEREZ RECONSTRUCTION CONTRACTORS INC

Minute Order: Hearing on Small Claims

05/12/2021: Minute Order: Hearing on Small Claims

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court (SC-100) Over $1,500 up to $5,000

01/13/2021: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court (SC-100) Over $1,500 up to $5,000

Proof of Service (Small Claims) on Plaintiff's Claim - Over $1,500 up to $5,000 filed by PEREZ RECONSTRUCTION CONTRACTORS INC

02/08/2021: Proof of Service (Small Claims) on Plaintiff's Claim - Over $1,500 up to $5,000 filed by PEREZ RECONSTRUCTION CONTRACTORS INC

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/12/2021
  • HearingType: Hearing on Small Claims; Judicial Officer: Eric V. Isaac; Location/Courtroom: Department MV2; Disposition: Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • JudgementStatus: Entered; Type: Money; Applies to: Plaintiff's Claim - Over $1,500 up to $5,000 filed by PEREZ RECONSTRUCTION CONTRACTORS INC; For/Against: For - PEREZ RECONSTRUCTION CONTRACTORS INC Against - ANGELICA RODRIGUEZ Against - VICTOR RUIZ; Details; Principal: $1,915.08; Costs: $163.50; Accrued Interest: $0.00; Offset(-): $0.00; Subtotal Judgment: $2,078.58; Total: $2,078.58

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • DocketDEADLINES & REMINDERS; Timestandard: 10-Year Judgment Expiration; Expiration Date: 05/12/2031; Status: Active

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Minute Order: Hearing on Small Claims

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Certificate of Mailing Small Claims Notice of Entry of Judgment on Plaintiff's Claim - Over $1,500 up to $5,000 filed by PEREZ RECONSTRUCTION CONTRACTORS INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Authorization to Appear (SC-109). Authorized to appear: Irene Perez

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • HearingType: Hearing on Small Claims; Judicial Officer: Eric V. Isaac; Location/Courtroom: Department MV2; Disposition: Continued Hearing Not Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • HearingType: Court on its Own Motion; Judicial Officer: Eric V. Isaac; Location/Courtroom: Department MV2; Disposition: Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Certificate of Mailing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Minute Order: Court on its Own Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 03/09/2021
  • HearingType: Hearing on Small Claims; Judicial Officer: Eric V. Isaac; Location/Courtroom: Department MV2; Disposition: Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Certificate of Mailing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Minute Order: Hearing on Small Claims

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Telephonic Appearance on Plaintiff's Claim - Over $1,500 up to $5,000 filed by PEREZ RECONSTRUCTION CONTRACTORS INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Proof of Service (Small Claims) on Plaintiff's Claim - Over $1,500 up to $5,000 filed by PEREZ RECONSTRUCTION CONTRACTORS INC; Filed By: PEREZ RECONSTRUCTION CONTRACTORS INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Proof of Service (Small Claims) on Plaintiff's Claim - Over $1,500 up to $5,000 filed by PEREZ RECONSTRUCTION CONTRACTORS INC; Filed By: PEREZ RECONSTRUCTION CONTRACTORS INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Small Claims filing claim for more than $1,500 but less than or equal to $5,000 (CCP116.230B2); Amount: $50.00; Paid: $50.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 01/21/2021; Fine Description: eSubmit *6131 Receipt No.: 20210121-00582.1; Paid: $50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Telephonic Appearance for Hearing on Plaintiff's Claim - Over $1,500 up to $5,000 filed by PEREZ RECONSTRUCTION CONTRACTORS INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court (SC-100) Over $1,500 up to $5,000; Filed By: PEREZ RECONSTRUCTION CONTRACTORS INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • DocketFilings: Plaintiff's Claim - Over $1,500 up to $5,000 filed by PEREZ RECONSTRUCTION CONTRACTORS INC; Disposition: Contested Judgment 05/12/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PEREZ RECONSTRUCTION CONTRACTORS INC. DBA PRC is a litigant