This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 10/13/2021 at 23:53:29 (UTC).

PENNYMAC LOAN SERVICES, LLC vs GREENWICH CAPITAL FINANCIAL, INC.

Case Summary

On 06/14/2021 PENNYMAC LOAN SERVICES, LLC filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against GREENWICH CAPITAL FINANCIAL, INC. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Riverside Historic Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Daniel Ottolia. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2996

  • Filing Date:

    06/14/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

Judge Details

Judge

Daniel Ottolia

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PENNYMAC LOAN SERVICES, LLC

Defendant

GREENWICH CAPITAL FINANCIAL, INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jillian A. Benbow

 

Court Documents

Complaint for Other Real Property (Over $25,000)

06/14/2021: Complaint for Other Real Property (Over $25,000)

Civil Case Cover Sheet

06/14/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Certificate of Counsel.

06/14/2021: Certificate of Counsel.

Summons Issued and Filed

06/14/2021: Summons Issued and Filed

Notice of Document Quality Assurance

07/08/2021: Notice of Document Quality Assurance

Notice of Department Assignment

07/08/2021: Notice of Department Assignment

Notice of Case Management Conference

07/08/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Proof of Service on Complaint for Other Real Property (Over $25,000) of PENNYMAC LOAN SERVICES, LLC

08/04/2021: Proof of Service on Complaint for Other Real Property (Over $25,000) of PENNYMAC LOAN SERVICES, LLC

Request for Entry of Default (CIV-100) on Complaint for Other Real Property (Over $25,000) of PENNYMAC LOAN SERVICES, LLC

08/16/2021: Request for Entry of Default (CIV-100) on Complaint for Other Real Property (Over $25,000) of PENNYMAC LOAN SERVICES, LLC

Notice of Hearing (eFiling) on Request for Entry of Default (CIV-100) on Complaint for Other Real Property (Over $25,000) of PENNYMAC LOAN SERVICES, LLC

08/19/2021: Notice of Hearing (eFiling) on Request for Entry of Default (CIV-100) on Complaint for Other Real Property (Over $25,000) of PENNYMAC LOAN SERVICES, LLC

Minute Order: Case Management Conference

01/04/2022: Minute Order: Case Management Conference

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/14/2022
  • HearingType: Order to appear and show cause, if any, why sanctions should not be imposed for failure to file default judgment (CRC 3.110) as to; Judicial Officer: Daniel Ottolia; Location/Courtroom: Department 4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2022
  • HearingType: Case Management Conference; Judicial Officer: Daniel Ottolia; Location/Courtroom: Department 4; Disposition: Hearing Off-Calendar

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Minute Order: Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Hearing (eFiling) on Request for Entry of Default (CIV-100) on Complaint for Other Real Property (Over $25,000) of PENNYMAC LOAN SERVICES, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Request for Entry of Default (CIV-100) on Complaint for Other Real Property (Over $25,000) of PENNYMAC LOAN SERVICES, LLC; Filed By: PENNYMAC LOAN SERVICES, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Proof of Service on Complaint for Other Real Property (Over $25,000) of PENNYMAC LOAN SERVICES, LLC; Filed By: PENNYMAC LOAN SERVICES, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Unlimited complaint or other first paper in unlimited civil case amount over $25,000 including UD over $25K, petition for writ of review, mandate, or prohibition; petition for a decree of change of name or gender (GC70611); Amount: $450.00; Paid: $450.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 07/08/2021; Fine Description: eSubmit *1391 Receipt No.: 20210708-00586.1; Paid: $450.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Department Assignment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Document Quality Assurance

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Summons Issued and Filed; Filed By: PENNYMAC LOAN SERVICES, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Certificate of Counsel.; Filed By: PENNYMAC LOAN SERVICES, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: PENNYMAC LOAN SERVICES, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Complaint for Other Real Property (Over $25,000); Filed By: PENNYMAC LOAN SERVICES, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • DocketFilings: Complaint for Other Real Property (Over $25,000) of PENNYMAC LOAN SERVICES, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PennyMac Loan Services LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Benbow, Jillian A