This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 10/31/2021 at 16:46:48 (UTC).

PECHANGA BAND OF LUISENO INDIANS vs LEXINGTON INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 07/30/2021 PECHANGA BAND OF LUISENO INDIANS filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against LEXINGTON INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Murrieta Southwest Justice Center located in Riverside, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Angel M. Bermudez. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6522

  • Filing Date:

    07/30/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

Judge Details

Judge

Angel M. Bermudez

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PECHANGA BAND OF LUISENO INDIANS

Defendants

LEXINGTON INSURANCE COMPANY

UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYD'S LONDON, INCLUDING SYNDICATE NUMBERS AGR 3268,APL 1969,ASC 1414,ATL 1861,AUL 1274,AUW 0609, BRT2987

ASPEN SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

HOMELAND INSURANCE COMPANY OF NEW YORK

ENDURANCE WORLDWIDE INSURANCE LTD

ARCH SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

EVANSTON INSURANCE COMPANY

XL INSURANCE AMERICA, INC

ALLIED WORLD NATINOAL ASSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Matthew Benjamin O'Hanlon

 

Court Documents

Notice of Department Assignment

08/02/2021: Notice of Department Assignment

Notice of Case Management Conference

08/02/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Complaint for Insurance Coverage (Over $25,000)

07/30/2021: Complaint for Insurance Coverage (Over $25,000)

Civil Case Cover Sheet

07/30/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Certificate of Counsel.

07/30/2021: Certificate of Counsel.

Summons Issued and Filed

07/30/2021: Summons Issued and Filed

Request for Dismissal

09/23/2021: Request for Dismissal

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/31/2022
  • HearingType: Case Management Conference; Judicial Officer: Angel M. Bermudez; Location/Courtroom: Department S302; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Request for Dismissal; Filed By: PECHANGA BAND OF LUISENO INDIANS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Unlimited complaint or other first paper in unlimited civil case amount over $25,000 including UD over $25K, petition for writ of review, mandate, or prohibition; petition for a decree of change of name or gender (GC70611); Amount: $450.00; Paid: $450.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 08/02/2021; Fine Description: Check #3973 Receipt No.: 20210802-00348.1; Paid: $450.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Department Assignment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Summons Issued and Filed; Filed By: PECHANGA BAND OF LUISENO INDIANS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Certificate of Counsel.; Filed By: PECHANGA BAND OF LUISENO INDIANS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: PECHANGA BAND OF LUISENO INDIANS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Complaint for Insurance Coverage (Over $25,000); Filed By: PECHANGA BAND OF LUISENO INDIANS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • DocketFilings: Complaint for Insurance Coverage (Over $25,000) of PECHANGA BAND OF LUISENO INDIANS; Disposition: Dismissal No ADR 09/23/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PECHANGA BAND OF LUISENO INDIANS is a litigant

Latest cases where HOMELAND INSURANCE COMPANY OF NEW YORK is a litigant

Latest cases where ARCH SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY A MISSOURI CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where XL INSURANCE AMERICA INC. is a litigant