Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 05/24/2021 at 02:27:37 (UTC).

PAULEK vs CALIFORNIA FISH AND GAME COMMISSION

Case Summary

On 01/19/2021 PAULEK filed an Other - Writ Of Mandamus lawsuit against CALIFORNIA FISH AND GAME COMMISSION. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Riverside Historic Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The Judges overseeing this case are John W. Vineyard and Sunshine Sykes. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0084

  • Filing Date:

    01/19/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Writ Of Mandamus

  • Court:

    Riverside County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Riverside Historic Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

Judge Details

Judges

John W. Vineyard

Sunshine Sykes

 

Party Details

Petitioner

ALBERT THOMAS PAULEK

Respondent

CALIFORNIA FISH AND GAME COMMISSION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Law Office of Susan Nash

 

Court Documents

Case Management Order - CEQA Cases

04/21/2021: Case Management Order - CEQA Cases

Minute Order: Status Hearing re: Writ of Mandate (CEQA)

03/23/2021: Minute Order: Status Hearing re: Writ of Mandate (CEQA)

Notice of Telephonic Appearance for Hearing on Petition for Writ of Mandate (CEQA) of ALBERT THOMAS PAULEK

03/23/2021: Notice of Telephonic Appearance for Hearing on Petition for Writ of Mandate (CEQA) of ALBERT THOMAS PAULEK

Case Management Statement untimely pursuant to CRC 3.725

03/12/2021: Case Management Statement untimely pursuant to CRC 3.725

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt of Summons, Civil Case Cover Sheet, Verified Writ Petition and Complaint, Notice of Election to Prepare Administrative Record, Request for Hearing with signature date of 3/1/21 on Petition for Writ of Mandate (CEQA) of ALBERT THOMAS PAULEK

03/11/2021: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt of Summons, Civil Case Cover Sheet, Verified Writ Petition and Complaint, Notice of Election to Prepare Administrative Record, Request for Hearing with signature date of 3/1/21 on Petition for Writ of Mandate (CEQA) of ALBERT THOMAS PAULEK

Notice of Telephonic Appearance for Hearing

03/03/2021: Notice of Telephonic Appearance for Hearing

Notice of related case

02/08/2021: Notice of related case

170.6 CCP against

02/08/2021: 170.6 CCP against

Notice of Case Reassignment to Department

02/08/2021: Notice of Case Reassignment to Department

Notice of Document Return.

01/21/2021: Notice of Document Return.

Notice of Status Hearing on Petition for Writ of Mandate (CEQA) of ALBERT THOMAS PAULEK

01/21/2021: Notice of Status Hearing on Petition for Writ of Mandate (CEQA) of ALBERT THOMAS PAULEK

Proof of Service of Summons on Petition for Writ of Mandate (CEQA) of ALBERT THOMAS PAULEK

01/21/2021: Proof of Service of Summons on Petition for Writ of Mandate (CEQA) of ALBERT THOMAS PAULEK

Request for Hearing

01/19/2021: Request for Hearing

Notice of election to prepare administrative record

01/19/2021: Notice of election to prepare administrative record

Verified Petition for Writ of Mandate and Complaint for declaratory and injunctive relief

01/19/2021: Verified Petition for Writ of Mandate and Complaint for declaratory and injunctive relief

Civil Case Cover Sheet

01/19/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Certificate of Counsel.

01/19/2021: Certificate of Counsel.

Summons Issued and Filed

01/19/2021: Summons Issued and Filed

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/21/2021
  • HearingType: Status Hearing re: Writ of Mandate (CEQA); Judicial Officer: Sunshine Sykes; Location/Courtroom: Department 6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Case Management Order - CEQA Cases

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Notice of CEQA Settlement Meeting; Filed By: CALIFORNIA FISH AND GAME COMMISSION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • HearingType: Status Hearing re: Writ of Mandate (CEQA); Judicial Officer: John W. Vineyard; Location/Courtroom: Department 7; Disposition: Continued - Other pre-disposition hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Minute Order: Status Hearing re: Writ of Mandate (CEQA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Telephonic Appearance for Hearing on Petition for Writ of Mandate (CEQA) of ALBERT THOMAS PAULEK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Document Quality Assurance

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Case Management Statement untimely pursuant to CRC 3.725; Filed By: ALBERT THOMAS PAULEK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt of Summons, Civil Case Cover Sheet, Verified Writ Petition and Complaint, Notice of Election to Prepare Administrative Record, Request for Hearing with signature date of 3/1/21 on Petition for Writ of Mandate (CEQA) of ALBERT THOMAS PAULEK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Telephonic Appearance for Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 01/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Document Quality Assurance

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Document Quality Assurance

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Proof of Service of Summons on Petition for Writ of Mandate (CEQA) of ALBERT THOMAS PAULEK; Filed By: ALBERT THOMAS PAULEK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Summons Issued and Filed; Filed By: ALBERT THOMAS PAULEK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Certificate of Counsel.; Filed By: ALBERT THOMAS PAULEK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: ALBERT THOMAS PAULEK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Verified Petition for Writ of Mandate and Complaint for declaratory and injunctive relief; Filed By: ALBERT THOMAS PAULEK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Notice of election to prepare administrative record; Filed By: ALBERT THOMAS PAULEK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Request for Hearing; Filed By: ALBERT THOMAS PAULEK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • DocketFilings: Petition for Writ of Mandate (CEQA) of ALBERT THOMAS PAULEK

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CALIFORNIA FISH AND GAME COMMISSION is a litigant