This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 10/14/2022 at 22:47:53 (UTC).

PALM CANYON VILLAS HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION vs BASKIN

Case Summary

On 10/04/2022 PALM CANYON VILLAS HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION filed an Other lawsuit against BASKIN. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Palm Springs Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Arthur Hester. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3958

  • Filing Date:

    10/04/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

Judge Details

Judge

Arthur Hester

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PALM CANYON VILLAS HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION

Defendant

TAMARA CELESTE BASKIN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DANIEL MEDIONI

 

Court Documents

Complaint for Other Complaint (Under $10,000)

10/04/2022: Complaint for Other Complaint (Under $10,000)

Summons Issued and Filed

10/04/2022: Summons Issued and Filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/04/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Certificate of Counsel.

10/04/2022: Certificate of Counsel.

Notice of Department Assignment

10/13/2022: Notice of Department Assignment

Notice of Trial Setting Conference - Limited Civil Complaint for Other Complaint (Under $10,000) on Complaint for Other Complaint (Under $10,000) of PALM CANYON VILLAS HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION

10/13/2022: Notice of Trial Setting Conference - Limited Civil Complaint for Other Complaint (Under $10,000) on Complaint for Other Complaint (Under $10,000) of PALM CANYON VILLAS HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/05/2023
  • HearingType: Trial Setting Conference - Limited Civil; Judicial Officer: Arthur Hester; Location/Courtroom: Department PS4

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2022
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Fee for eFiling; Amount: $1.00; Paid: $1.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 10/13/2022; Fine Description: EFiling Payment Receipt No.: EFM20221013-00773.1; Paid: $1.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2022
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Limited complaint or other first paper amount up to $10,000 (GC70613B); Amount: $255.00; Paid: $255.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 10/13/2022; Fine Description: EFiling Payment Receipt No.: EFM20221013-00773.1; Paid: $255.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Trial Setting Conference - Limited Civil Complaint for Other Complaint (Under $10,000) on Complaint for Other Complaint (Under $10,000) of PALM CANYON VILLAS HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Department Assignment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2022
  • DocketDEADLINES & REMINDERS; Timestandard: Non-Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint; Expiration Date: 12/03/2022; Status: Active

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Certificate of Counsel.; Filed By: PALM CANYON VILLAS HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: PALM CANYON VILLAS HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Summons Issued and Filed; Filed By: PALM CANYON VILLAS HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Complaint for Other Complaint (Under $10,000); Filed By: PALM CANYON VILLAS HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2022
  • DocketFilings: Complaint for Other Complaint (Under $10,000) of PALM CANYON VILLAS HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less