This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 05/02/2023 at 08:34:01 (UTC).

ORHORHAGHE vs 48FORTY SOLUTIONS, LLC

Case Summary

On 12/20/2022 ORHORHAGHE filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against 48FORTY SOLUTIONS, LLC. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Riverside Historic Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Harold W. Hopp. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5583

  • Filing Date:

    12/20/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

Judge Details

Judge

Harold W. Hopp

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FATAI ORHORHAGHE

Defendant

48FORTY SOLUTIONS, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JESSICA L. CAMPBELL

Defendant Attorney

AMY E. BEVERLIN

 

Court Documents

Class Action Complaint

12/20/2022: Class Action Complaint

Summons Issued and Filed

12/20/2022: Summons Issued and Filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet (Complex) (CM-010)

12/20/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet (Complex) (CM-010)

Certificate of Counsel.

12/20/2022: Certificate of Counsel.

Notice of Case Management Conference Complaint for Other Employment (Over $25,000)

12/30/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference Complaint for Other Employment (Over $25,000)

Notice of Department Assignment

12/30/2022: Notice of Department Assignment

Class Action Case Management Order #1 on Complaint for Other Employment (Over $25,000) of FATAI ORHORHAGHE

01/04/2023: Class Action Case Management Order #1 on Complaint for Other Employment (Over $25,000) of FATAI ORHORHAGHE

Clerk's Certificate of Mailing on Complaint for Other Employment (Over $25,000) of FATAI ORHORHAGHE

01/04/2023: Clerk's Certificate of Mailing on Complaint for Other Employment (Over $25,000) of FATAI ORHORHAGHE

Minute Order: Court Ruling re: Class Action Case Management Order #1

01/04/2023: Minute Order: Court Ruling re: Class Action Case Management Order #1

Proof of Service Summons on Complaint for Other Employment (Over $25,000) of FATAI ORHORHAGHE

01/13/2023: Proof of Service Summons on Complaint for Other Employment (Over $25,000) of FATAI ORHORHAGHE

NOTICE OF RULING on Complaint for Other Employment (Over $25,000) of FATAI ORHORHAGHE

02/09/2023: NOTICE OF RULING on Complaint for Other Employment (Over $25,000) of FATAI ORHORHAGHE

Defendant 48Forty Solutions, LLC's Answer on Complaint for Other Employment (Over $25,000) of FATAI ORHORHAGHE

02/21/2023: Defendant 48Forty Solutions, LLC's Answer on Complaint for Other Employment (Over $25,000) of FATAI ORHORHAGHE

Joint Case Management Statement on Complaint for Other Employment (Over $25,000) of FATAI ORHORHAGHE

02/21/2023: Joint Case Management Statement on Complaint for Other Employment (Over $25,000) of FATAI ORHORHAGHE

Minute Order: Court on its Own Motion

02/23/2023: Minute Order: Court on its Own Motion

Certificate of Mailing

02/24/2023: Certificate of Mailing

Joint Statement Re: Continued Case Management Conference on Complaint for Other Employment (Over $25,000) of FATAI ORHORHAGHE

04/11/2023: Joint Statement Re: Continued Case Management Conference on Complaint for Other Employment (Over $25,000) of FATAI ORHORHAGHE

Minute Order: Case Management Conference - Complex

04/20/2023: Minute Order: Case Management Conference - Complex

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/10/2023
  • HearingType: Case Management Conference - Complex; Judicial Officer: Harold W. Hopp; Location/Courtroom: Department 10

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/20/2023
  • HearingType: Case Management Conference - Complex; Judicial Officer: Harold W. Hopp; Location/Courtroom: Department 10; Disposition: Continued - Other pre-disposition hearing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Minute Order: Case Management Conference - Complex

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/11/2023
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Fee for eFiling; Amount: $1.00; Paid: $1.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 04/11/2023; Fine Description: EFiling Payment Receipt No.: EFM20230411-00908.1; Paid: $1.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Joint Statement Re: Continued Case Management Conference on Complaint for Other Employment (Over $25,000) of FATAI ORHORHAGHE; Filed By: FATAI ORHORHAGHE; 48FORTY SOLUTIONS, LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2023
  • HearingType: Case Management Conference - Complex; Judicial Officer: Harold W. Hopp; Location/Courtroom: Department 10; Disposition: Continued Hearing Not Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Certificate of Mailing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • HearingType: Court on its Own Motion; Judicial Officer: Harold W. Hopp; Location/Courtroom: Department 10; Disposition: Completed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Minute Order: Court on its Own Motion

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2023
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Unlimited response: answer or other first paper filed by each party other than plaintiff amount over $25,000 including UD; includes response by party to petition for relief in discovery dispute related to out-of-state case (GC70612); Amount: $450.00; Paid: $450.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 02/21/2023; Fine Description: EFiling Payment Receipt No.: EFM20230221-02414.1; Paid: $450.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 12/30/2022
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Unlimited complaint or other first paper in unlimited civil case amount over $25,000 including UD over $25K, petition for writ of review, mandate, or prohibition; petition for a decree of change of name or gender (GC70611); Amount: $450.00; Paid: $450.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 12/30/2022; Fine Description: EFiling Payment Receipt No.: EFM20221230-00148.1; Paid: $450.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2022
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Additional fee for case designated as complex - Plaintiff (GC70616A); Amount: $1,000.00; Paid: $1,000.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 12/30/2022; Fine Description: EFiling Payment Receipt No.: EFM20221230-00148.1; Paid: $1,000.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2022
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Fee for eFiling; Amount: $1.00; Paid: $1.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 12/30/2022; Fine Description: EFiling Payment Receipt No.: EFM20221230-00148.1; Paid: $1.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Department Assignment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Case Management Conference Complaint for Other Employment (Over $25,000)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Class Action Complaint; Filed By: FATAI ORHORHAGHE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Summons Issued and Filed; Filed By: FATAI ORHORHAGHE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Civil Case Cover Sheet (Complex) (CM-010); Filed By: FATAI ORHORHAGHE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Certificate of Counsel.; Filed By: FATAI ORHORHAGHE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2022
  • DocketFilings: Complaint for Other Employment (Over $25,000) of FATAI ORHORHAGHE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less