This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 10/20/2021 at 19:50:08 (UTC).

O'QUIN vs MAYBERRY COLONY, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED PARTNERSHIP

Case Summary

On 03/17/2021 O'QUIN filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against MAYBERRY COLONY, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED PARTNERSHIP. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Murrieta Southwest Justice Center located in Riverside, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Jeffrey M. Zimel. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0244

  • Filing Date:

    03/17/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

Judge Details

Judge

Jeffrey M. Zimel

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MA'NYJH O'QUIN

Defendants

ANZA MANAGEMENT COMPANY

MAYBERRY COLONY, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED PARTNERSHIP

J.K PROPERTIES INC

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service (Small Claims) on Plaintiff's Claim - Over $5,000 up to $10,000 (Natural Person) filed by MA'NYJH O'QUIN

04/19/2021: Proof of Service (Small Claims) on Plaintiff's Claim - Over $5,000 up to $10,000 (Natural Person) filed by MA'NYJH O'QUIN

Proof of Service

04/27/2021: Proof of Service

Authorization to Appear (SC-109). Authorized to appear: Rebecca Padilla-Arias on 1st Amended Plaintiff's Claim - Over $5,000 up to $10,000 (Natural Person) filed by MA'NYJH O'QUIN

06/30/2021: Authorization to Appear (SC-109). Authorized to appear: Rebecca Padilla-Arias on 1st Amended Plaintiff's Claim - Over $5,000 up to $10,000 (Natural Person) filed by MA'NYJH O'QUIN

Certificate of Mailing Small Claims Notice of Entry of Judgment on 1st Amended Plaintiff's Claim - Over $5,000 up to $10,000 (Natural Person) filed by MA'NYJH O'QUIN

07/14/2021: Certificate of Mailing Small Claims Notice of Entry of Judgment on 1st Amended Plaintiff's Claim - Over $5,000 up to $10,000 (Natural Person) filed by MA'NYJH O'QUIN

Minute Order: Ruling on Matter Submitted

07/13/2021: Minute Order: Ruling on Matter Submitted

Minute Order: Hearing on Small Claims

06/30/2021: Minute Order: Hearing on Small Claims

Authorization to Appear (SC-109). Authorized to appear: Rebecca Padilla-Arias on 1st Amended Plaintiff's Claim - Over $5,000 up to $10,000 (Natural Person) filed by MA'NYJH O'QUIN

06/30/2021: Authorization to Appear (SC-109). Authorized to appear: Rebecca Padilla-Arias on 1st Amended Plaintiff's Claim - Over $5,000 up to $10,000 (Natural Person) filed by MA'NYJH O'QUIN

Proof of Service (Small Claims) on 1st Amended Plaintiff's Claim - Over $5,000 up to $10,000 (Natural Person) filed by MA'NYJH O'QUIN

06/25/2021: Proof of Service (Small Claims) on 1st Amended Plaintiff's Claim - Over $5,000 up to $10,000 (Natural Person) filed by MA'NYJH O'QUIN

Notice of Document Quality Assurance

06/18/2021: Notice of Document Quality Assurance

1st Amended Plaintiff's Claim - Over $5,000 up to $10,000 (Natural Person)

06/16/2021: 1st Amended Plaintiff's Claim - Over $5,000 up to $10,000 (Natural Person)

Order on Request to Postpone Small Claims Hearing

06/15/2021: Order on Request to Postpone Small Claims Hearing

Notice of Document Return.

06/16/2021: Notice of Document Return.

Notice of Telephonic Appearance on Plaintiff's Claim - Over $5,000 up to $10,000 (Natural Person) filed by MA'NYJH O'QUIN

06/15/2021: Notice of Telephonic Appearance on Plaintiff's Claim - Over $5,000 up to $10,000 (Natural Person) filed by MA'NYJH O'QUIN

Request to Postpone Small Claims Hearing

06/07/2021: Request to Postpone Small Claims Hearing

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court (SC-100) Over $5,000 up to $10,000 (Natural Person)

03/17/2021: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court (SC-100) Over $5,000 up to $10,000 (Natural Person)

Order on Request to Postpone Small Claims Hearing on Plaintiff's Claim - Over $5,000 up to $10,000 (Natural Person) filed by MA'NYJH O'QUIN

04/29/2021: Order on Request to Postpone Small Claims Hearing on Plaintiff's Claim - Over $5,000 up to $10,000 (Natural Person) filed by MA'NYJH O'QUIN

Certificate of Mailing

04/30/2021: Certificate of Mailing

Minute Order: Hearing on Small Claims

04/30/2021: Minute Order: Hearing on Small Claims

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/14/2021
  • DocketDEADLINES & REMINDERS; Timestandard: 10-Year Judgment Expiration; Expiration Date: 07/13/2031; Status: Active

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Certificate of Mailing Small Claims Notice of Entry of Judgment on 1st Amended Plaintiff's Claim - Over $5,000 up to $10,000 (Natural Person) filed by MA'NYJH O'QUIN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • HearingType: Ruling on Matter Submitted; Judicial Officer: Jeffrey M. Zimel; Location/Courtroom: Department S101; Disposition: Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • JudgementStatus: Entered; Type: Nothing Awarded; Applies to: 1st Amended Plaintiff's Claim - Over $5,000 up to $10,000 (Natural Person) filed by MA'NYJH O'QUIN; For/Against: For - ANZA MANAGEMENT COMPANY For - J.K PROPERTIES INC. Against - MA'NYJH O'QUIN; Details; No money owed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Minute Order: Ruling on Matter Submitted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • HearingType: Hearing on Small Claims; Judicial Officer: Jeffrey M. Zimel; Location/Courtroom: Department S101; Disposition: Held - Small Claims Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Minute Order: Hearing on Small Claims

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Authorization to Appear (SC-109). Authorized to appear: Rebecca Padilla-Arias on 1st Amended Plaintiff's Claim - Over $5,000 up to $10,000 (Natural Person) filed by MA'NYJH O'QUIN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Authorization to Appear (SC-109). Authorized to appear: Rebecca Padilla-Arias on 1st Amended Plaintiff's Claim - Over $5,000 up to $10,000 (Natural Person) filed by MA'NYJH O'QUIN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Proof of Service (Small Claims) on 1st Amended Plaintiff's Claim - Over $5,000 up to $10,000 (Natural Person) filed by MA'NYJH O'QUIN; Filed By: MA'NYJH O'QUIN

    Read MoreRead Less
22 More Docket Entries
  • 04/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Proof of Service (Small Claims) on Plaintiff's Claim - Over $5,000 up to $10,000 (Natural Person) filed by MA'NYJH O'QUIN; Filed By: MA'NYJH O'QUIN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • HearingType: Nunc Pro Tunc Hearing; Judicial Officer: Jeffrey M. Zimel; Location/Courtroom: Department S101; Disposition: Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Minute Order: Nunc Pro Tunc Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Corrected Nunc Pro Tunc Order on Court Fee Waiver

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Small Claims filing claim for more than $5,000 but less than or equal to $10,000 (CCP116.230B3); Amount: $75.00; Paid: $75.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 03/22/2021; Fine Description: Fee waiver Receipt No.: 20210322-00407.1; Paid: $75.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Department Assignment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Telephonic Appearance on Plaintiff's Claim - Over $5,000 up to $10,000 (Natural Person) filed by MA'NYJH O'QUIN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Order on Court Fee Waiver (FW-003) - Granted by Clerk; Filed By: MA'NYJH O'QUIN; Confidential: YES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Request to Waive Court Fees (FW-001); Filed By: MA'NYJH O'QUIN; Confidential: YES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court (SC-100) Over $5,000 up to $10,000 (Natural Person); Filed By: MA'NYJH O'QUIN

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where J.K. PROPERTIES INC A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where ANZA MANAGEMENT COMPANY A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant