This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 09/09/2021 at 00:54:16 (UTC).

OLIVER vs RALPHS GROCERY COMPANY

Case Summary

On 06/04/2021 OLIVER filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against RALPHS GROCERY COMPANY. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Riverside Historic Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Chad Firetag. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2528

  • Filing Date:

    06/04/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Courthouse:

    Riverside Historic Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

Judge Details

Judge

Chad Firetag

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CHERYL OLIVER

Defendants

FOOD 4 LESS OF CALIFORNIA INC

FOOD 4 LESS

RALPHS GROCERY COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

David Azizi

Defendant Attorney

Russell S. Fuerst

 

Court Documents

Declaration of Service

08/04/2021: Declaration of Service

Answer to Complaint on Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of CHERYL OLIVER

08/04/2021: Answer to Complaint on Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of CHERYL OLIVER

Notice of Case Management Conference

06/11/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Notice of Department Assignment

06/11/2021: Notice of Department Assignment

Summons Issued and Filed

06/04/2021: Summons Issued and Filed

Certificate of Counsel.

06/04/2021: Certificate of Counsel.

Civil Case Cover Sheet

06/04/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint for Damages

06/04/2021: Complaint for Damages

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/08/2021
  • HearingType: Case Management Conference; Judicial Officer: Chad Firetag; Location/Courtroom: Department 3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Unlimited response: answer or other first paper filed by each party other than plaintiff amount over $25,000 including UD; includes response by party to petition for relief in discovery dispute related to out-of-state case (GC70612); Amount: $450.00; Paid: $450.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 08/11/2021; Fine Description: eSubmit *1792 Receipt No.: 20210811-00493.1; Paid: $450.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Declaration of Service; Filed By: RALPHS GROCERY COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Answer to Complaint on Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of CHERYL OLIVER; Filed By: RALPHS GROCERY COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Unlimited complaint or other first paper in unlimited civil case amount over $25,000 including UD over $25K, petition for writ of review, mandate, or prohibition; petition for a decree of change of name or gender (GC70611); Amount: $450.00; Paid: $450.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 06/11/2021; Fine Description: Check #D4011602 Receipt No.: 20210611-00551.1; Paid: $450.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Department Assignment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Summons Issued and Filed; Filed By: CHERYL OLIVER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Certificate of Counsel.; Filed By: CHERYL OLIVER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: CHERYL OLIVER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Complaint for Damages; Filed By: CHERYL OLIVER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • DocketFilings: Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of CHERYL OLIVER

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FOOD 4 LESS OF CALIFORNIA, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where RALPHS GROCERY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Fuerst, Russell S