This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 11/02/2021 at 20:13:53 (UTC).

OLD REPUBLIC SURETY COMPANY, A CORPORATION vs ZUPPARDO

Case Summary

On 09/09/2021 OLD REPUBLIC SURETY COMPANY, A CORPORATION filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against ZUPPARDO. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Murrieta Southwest Justice Center located in Riverside, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Marie E. Wood. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7712

  • Filing Date:

    09/09/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

Judge Details

Judge

Marie E. Wood

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

OLD REPUBLIC SURETY COMPANY, A CORPORATION

Defendants

JAY ANTHONY ZUPPARDO

MORENO VALLEY CONSTRUCTION

FOUNDATION FOR FAIR CONTRACTING, A CORPORATION

CONCRETE PLACEMENT, A CORPORATION

C5 EQUIPMENT RENTALS, LLC

GROUND PENETRATING RADAR SYSTEMS, A CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JOHN PAGAN

 

Court Documents

Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Under $10,000)

09/09/2021: Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Under $10,000)

Certificate of Counsel.

09/09/2021: Certificate of Counsel.

Civil Case Cover Sheet

09/09/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons Issued and Filed

09/09/2021: Summons Issued and Filed

Notice of Department Assignment

09/13/2021: Notice of Department Assignment

Notice of Trial Setting Conference - Limited Civil Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Under $10,000) on Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Under $10,000) of OLD REPUBLIC SURETY COMPANY, A CORPORATION

09/13/2021: Notice of Trial Setting Conference - Limited Civil Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Under $10,000) on Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Under $10,000) of OLD REPUBLIC SURETY COMPANY, A CORPORATION

Amendment to Complaint/Cross Complaint (Fictitious Name) (RI-CI035) on Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Under $10,000) of OLD REPUBLIC SURETY COMPANY, A CORPORATION

09/17/2021: Amendment to Complaint/Cross Complaint (Fictitious Name) (RI-CI035) on Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Under $10,000) of OLD REPUBLIC SURETY COMPANY, A CORPORATION

Request for Dismissal on Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Under $10,000) of OLD REPUBLIC SURETY COMPANY, A CORPORATION

09/17/2021: Request for Dismissal on Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Under $10,000) of OLD REPUBLIC SURETY COMPANY, A CORPORATION

Request for Dismissal on Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Under $10,000) of OLD REPUBLIC SURETY COMPANY, A CORPORATION

09/30/2021: Request for Dismissal on Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Under $10,000) of OLD REPUBLIC SURETY COMPANY, A CORPORATION

Proof of Service on Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Under $10,000) of OLD REPUBLIC SURETY COMPANY, A CORPORATION

10/29/2021: Proof of Service on Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Under $10,000) of OLD REPUBLIC SURETY COMPANY, A CORPORATION

Proof of Service on Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Under $10,000) of OLD REPUBLIC SURETY COMPANY, A CORPORATION

10/29/2021: Proof of Service on Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Under $10,000) of OLD REPUBLIC SURETY COMPANY, A CORPORATION

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/08/2022
  • HearingType: Trial Setting Conference - Limited Civil; Judicial Officer: Marie E. Wood; Location/Courtroom: Department S102

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Proof of Service on Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Under $10,000) of OLD REPUBLIC SURETY COMPANY, A CORPORATION; Filed By: OLD REPUBLIC SURETY COMPANY, A CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Proof of Service on Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Under $10,000) of OLD REPUBLIC SURETY COMPANY, A CORPORATION; Filed By: OLD REPUBLIC SURETY COMPANY, A CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Request for Dismissal on Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Under $10,000) of OLD REPUBLIC SURETY COMPANY, A CORPORATION; Filed By: OLD REPUBLIC SURETY COMPANY, A CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Request for Dismissal on Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Under $10,000) of OLD REPUBLIC SURETY COMPANY, A CORPORATION; Filed By: OLD REPUBLIC SURETY COMPANY, A CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Amendment to Complaint/Cross Complaint (Fictitious Name) (RI-CI035) on Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Under $10,000) of OLD REPUBLIC SURETY COMPANY, A CORPORATION; Filed By: OLD REPUBLIC SURETY COMPANY, A CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Limited complaint or other first paper amount up to $10,000 (GC70613B); Amount: $255.00; Paid: $255.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 09/13/2021; Fine Description: EFiling Payment Receipt No.: EFM20210913-00054.1; Paid: $255.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Trial Setting Conference - Limited Civil Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Under $10,000) on Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Under $10,000) of OLD REPUBLIC SURETY COMPANY, A CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Department Assignment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • DocketDEADLINES & REMINDERS; Timestandard: Non-Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint; Expiration Date: 11/08/2021; Status: Active

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Summons Issued and Filed; Filed By: OLD REPUBLIC SURETY COMPANY, A CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: OLD REPUBLIC SURETY COMPANY, A CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Certificate of Counsel.; Filed By: OLD REPUBLIC SURETY COMPANY, A CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Under $10,000); Filed By: OLD REPUBLIC SURETY COMPANY, A CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • DocketFilings: Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Under $10,000) of OLD REPUBLIC SURETY COMPANY, A CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MORENO VALLEY CONSTRUCTION is a litigant

Latest cases where GROUND PENETRATINGRADAR SYSTEMS INC is a litigant

Latest cases where CONCRETE PLACEMENT INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where OLD REPUBLIC SURETY COMPANY, INC. is a litigant