This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 10/21/2021 at 10:51:16 (UTC).

OLD REPUBLIC SURETY COMPANY, A CORPORATION vs KOPPES ENTERPRISES, A CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 08/30/2021 OLD REPUBLIC SURETY COMPANY, A CORPORATION filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against KOPPES ENTERPRISES, A CORPORATION. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Murrieta Southwest Justice Center located in Riverside, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Marie E. Wood. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7470

  • Filing Date:

    08/30/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

Judge Details

Judge

Marie E. Wood

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

OLD REPUBLIC SURETY COMPANY, A CORPORATION

Defendants

KOPPES ENTERPRISES, A CORPORATION

DAVID HARRISON

JACQUELINE HARRISON

AMANDA GALLIANO

ARIC GALLIANO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CARLOS SOSA

 

Court Documents

Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $10,000 does not exceed $25,000

08/30/2021: Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $10,000 does not exceed $25,000

Summons Issued and Filed

08/30/2021: Summons Issued and Filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet

08/30/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Certificate of Counsel.

08/30/2021: Certificate of Counsel.

Notice of Department Assignment

09/02/2021: Notice of Department Assignment

Notice of Trial Setting Conference - Limited Civil Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $10,000 does not exceed $25,000 on Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $10,000 does not exceed $25,000) of OLD REPUBLIC SURETY COMPANY, A C

09/02/2021: Notice of Trial Setting Conference - Limited Civil Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $10,000 does not exceed $25,000 on Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $10,000 does not exceed $25,000) of OLD REPUBLIC SURETY COMPANY, A CORPORATION

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/28/2022
  • HearingType: Trial Setting Conference - Limited Civil; Judicial Officer: Marie E. Wood; Location/Courtroom: Department S102

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Limited complaint or other first paper amount over $10,000 up to $25,000 (GC70613A); Amount: $395.00; Paid: $395.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 09/02/2021; Fine Description: EFiling Payment Receipt No.: EFM20210902-00055.1; Paid: $395.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Trial Setting Conference - Limited Civil Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $10,000 does not exceed $25,000 on Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $10,000 does not exceed $25,000) of OLD REPUBLIC SURETY COMPANY, A CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Department Assignment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • DocketDEADLINES & REMINDERS; Timestandard: Non-Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint; Expiration Date: 10/29/2021; Status: Active

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Certificate of Counsel.; Filed By: OLD REPUBLIC SURETY COMPANY, A CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: OLD REPUBLIC SURETY COMPANY, A CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Summons Issued and Filed; Filed By: OLD REPUBLIC SURETY COMPANY, A CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $10,000 does not exceed $25,000; Filed By: OLD REPUBLIC SURETY COMPANY, A CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • DocketFilings: Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $10,000 does not exceed $25,000) of OLD REPUBLIC SURETY COMPANY, A CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where OLD REPUBLIC SURETY COMPANY, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SOSA, CARLOS E