This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 11/02/2021 at 01:25:01 (UTC).

OCCHIPINTI vs ALLEN

Case Summary

On 06/04/2021 OCCHIPINTI filed an Other - Sister State Judgment lawsuit against ALLEN. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Murrieta Southwest Justice Center located in Riverside, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4845

  • Filing Date:

    06/04/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Sister State Judgment

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JUSTINE THEDE OCCHIPINTI

Defendants

JOHNNY DAVID ALLEN

CYNTHIA ALLEN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jeremy D Stone

 

Court Documents

Application for Entry of Judgment on Sister State Judgment (Over $25,000)

06/04/2021: Application for Entry of Judgment on Sister State Judgment (Over $25,000)

Civil Case Cover Sheet

06/04/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Entry of Judgment on Sister State Judgment

06/04/2021: Notice of Entry of Judgment on Sister State Judgment

Notice of Document Quality Assurance

06/07/2021: Notice of Document Quality Assurance

Notice of Department Assignment

06/07/2021: Notice of Department Assignment

Notice of Document Return.

06/07/2021: Notice of Document Return.

Certificate of Counsel.

06/08/2021: Certificate of Counsel.

Notice of Document Return.

06/08/2021: Notice of Document Return.

Proof of Service re: Notice of Entry of Judgment

08/12/2021: Proof of Service re: Notice of Entry of Judgment

Proof of Service by Mail re: Notice of Entry of Judgment on Sister-State

08/26/2021: Proof of Service by Mail re: Notice of Entry of Judgment on Sister-State

Abstract of Judgment Issued on Application for Sister State Judgment (Over $25,000) of JUSTINE THEDE OCCHIPINTI

10/06/2021: Abstract of Judgment Issued on Application for Sister State Judgment (Over $25,000) of JUSTINE THEDE OCCHIPINTI

Notice of Document Return.

10/05/2021: Notice of Document Return.

Writ of Execution Issued

10/28/2021: Writ of Execution Issued

Notice of Document Return.

10/27/2021: Notice of Document Return.

Notice of Document Return.

10/27/2021: Notice of Document Return.

Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest (MC-012) on Application for Sister State Judgment (Over $25,000) of JUSTINE THEDE OCCHIPINTI

10/19/2021: Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest (MC-012) on Application for Sister State Judgment (Over $25,000) of JUSTINE THEDE OCCHIPINTI

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/29/2021
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Issuing writ for enforcement of order of judgment, writ of execution; abstract of judgment; certificate of satisfaction of judgment; certifying copy of paper, record, or proceeding on file; taking affidavit; etc. (GC 70626A1-8); Amount: $40.00; Paid: $40.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 10/29/2021; Fine Description: EFiling Payment Receipt No.: EFM20211029-00683.1; Paid: $40.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Document Return.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Document Return.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest (MC-012) on Application for Sister State Judgment (Over $25,000) of JUSTINE THEDE OCCHIPINTI; Filed By: JUSTINE THEDE OCCHIPINTI

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Issuing writ for enforcement of order of judgment, writ of execution; abstract of judgment; certificate of satisfaction of judgment; certifying copy of paper, record, or proceeding on file; taking affidavit; etc. (GC 70626A1-8); Amount: $40.00; Paid: $40.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 10/06/2021; Fine Description: EFiling Payment Receipt No.: EFM20211006-00473.1; Paid: $40.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Document Return.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Proof of Service by Mail re: Notice of Entry of Judgment on Sister-State

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Proof of Service re: Notice of Entry of Judgment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Document Return.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Certificate of Counsel.; Filed By: JUSTINE THEDE OCCHIPINTI

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Unlimited complaint or other first paper in unlimited civil case amount over $25,000 including UD over $25K, petition for writ of review, mandate, or prohibition; petition for a decree of change of name or gender (GC70611); Amount: $450.00; Paid: $450.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 06/07/2021; Fine Description: eSubmit *6496 Receipt No.: 20210607-00263.1; Paid: $450.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Document Return.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Department Assignment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Document Quality Assurance

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • JudgementStatus: Entered; Type: Money; Applies to: Case; For/Against: For - JUSTINE THEDE OCCHIPINTI Against - JOHNNY DAVID ALLEN Against - CYNTHIA ALLEN; Details; Principal: $325,000.00; Accrued Interest: $5,429.24; Filing Fee: $450.00; Subtotal Judgment: $330,879.24; Interest After Judgment: $2,438.60; Costs After Judgment: $40.00; Writ Fee: $40.00; Total: $333,397.84; Abstract of Judgment Issued on 10/06/2021; Writ of Execution Issued for County: Riverside on 10/29/2021 - expires on 04/27/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Notice of Entry of Judgment on Sister State Judgment; Filed By: JUSTINE THEDE OCCHIPINTI

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: JUSTINE THEDE OCCHIPINTI

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Application for Entry of Judgment on Sister State Judgment (Over $25,000); Filed By: JUSTINE THEDE OCCHIPINTI

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • DocketFilings: Application for Sister State Judgment (Over $25,000) of JUSTINE THEDE OCCHIPINTI; Disposition: Other Clerk's Judgment 06/04/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer STONE JEREMY DAVID