This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 02/18/2022 at 00:34:15 (UTC).

NPG, INC. vs CONTRERAS

Case Summary

On 02/14/2022 NPG, INC filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against CONTRERAS. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Riverside Historic Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0637

  • Filing Date:

    02/14/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

NPG, INC.

GOLDSTAR ASPHALT PRODUCTS

Defendants

JOHNY NOEL CONTRERAS

PENSKE TRUCK LEASING CORPORATION

GOODWILL INDUSTRIES OF SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GREGORY SNARR

 

Court Documents

Complaint for Negligence

02/14/2022: Complaint for Negligence

Summons Issued and Filed

02/14/2022: Summons Issued and Filed

Certificate of Counsel.

02/14/2022: Certificate of Counsel.

Civil Case Cover Sheet

02/14/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Document Quality Assurance

02/17/2022: Notice of Document Quality Assurance

Notice of Case Management Conference Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000)

02/17/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000)

Notice of Department Assignment

02/17/2022: Notice of Department Assignment

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/16/2022
  • HearingType: Case Management Conference; Location/Courtroom: Department 2

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2022
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Fee for eFiling; Amount: $1.00; Paid: $1.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 02/17/2022; Fine Description: EFiling Payment Receipt No.: EFM20220217-00963.1; Paid: $1.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2022
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Unlimited complaint or other first paper in unlimited civil case amount over $25,000 including UD over $25K, petition for writ of review, mandate, or prohibition; petition for a decree of change of name or gender (GC70611); Amount: $450.00; Paid: $450.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 02/17/2022; Fine Description: EFiling Payment Receipt No.: EFM20220217-00963.1; Paid: $450.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Department Assignment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Case Management Conference Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Document Quality Assurance

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • DocketDEADLINES & REMINDERS; Timestandard: Non-Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint; Expiration Date: 04/15/2022; Status: Active

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: NPG, INC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Certificate of Counsel.; Filed By: NPG, INC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Summons Issued and Filed; Filed By: NPG, INC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Complaint for Negligence; Filed By: NPG, INC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • DocketFilings: Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of JOHNY NOEL CONTRERAS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where N-P-G is a litigant

Latest cases where GOODWILL INDUSTRIES OF SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA is a litigant

Latest cases where PENSKE TRUCK LEASING CO. LP is a litigant