This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 09/08/2021 at 02:06:24 (UTC).

NOTARIANNI vs MATTRESS FIRM INC

Case Summary

On 05/20/2021 NOTARIANNI filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against MATTRESS FIRM INC. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Riverside Historic Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Irma Asberry. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2288

  • Filing Date:

    05/20/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Courthouse:

    Riverside Historic Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

Judge Details

Judge

Irma Asberry

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Minors

DANIEL S NOTARIANNI

DIOVANNI P NOTARIANNI

JENNIFER M NOTARIANNI

Defendant

MATTRESS FIRM INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Minor Attorney

Brian Jeffrey Virag

 

Court Documents

Notice of Document Return.

08/05/2021: Notice of Document Return.

1st Amended Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of JENNIFER M NOTARIANNI

07/30/2021: 1st Amended Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of JENNIFER M NOTARIANNI

Application and Order for Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem on Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of JENNIFER M NOTARIANNI

07/30/2021: Application and Order for Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem on Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of JENNIFER M NOTARIANNI

Application and Order for Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem on Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of JENNIFER M NOTARIANNI

06/03/2021: Application and Order for Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem on Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of JENNIFER M NOTARIANNI

Minute Order: Court Ruling re: Denial of Application for Order for Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem filed 6-1-21 DIOVANNI P NOTARIANNI

06/03/2021: Minute Order: Court Ruling re: Denial of Application for Order for Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem filed 6-1-21 DIOVANNI P NOTARIANNI

Certificate of Counsel.

05/20/2021: Certificate of Counsel.

Civil Case Cover Sheet

05/20/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000)

05/20/2021: Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000)

Notice of Case Management Conference

05/26/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Notice of Department Assignment

05/26/2021: Notice of Department Assignment

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/22/2021
  • HearingType: Case Management Conference; Judicial Officer: Irma Asberry; Location/Courtroom: Department 5

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Document Return.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Document Return.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: 1st Amended Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of JENNIFER M NOTARIANNI; Filed By: JENNIFER M NOTARIANNI; DIOVANNI P NOTARIANNI; DANIEL S NOTARIANNI

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Receive and Forward; Description: Application and Order for Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem on Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of JENNIFER M NOTARIANNI

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • DocketFilings: 1st Amended Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of JENNIFER M NOTARIANNI

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • HearingType: Court Ruling re: Denial of Application for Order for Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem filed 6-1-21 DIOVANNI P NOTARIANNI; Judicial Officer: Irma Asberry; Location/Courtroom: Department 5; Disposition: Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Minute Order: Court Ruling re: Denial of Application for Order for Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem filed 6-1-21 DIOVANNI P NOTARIANNI

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Application and Order for Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem on Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of JENNIFER M NOTARIANNI

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Unlimited complaint or other first paper in unlimited civil case amount over $25,000 including UD over $25K, petition for writ of review, mandate, or prohibition; petition for a decree of change of name or gender (GC70611); Amount: $450.00; Paid: $450.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 05/26/2021; Fine Description: Check #4014352 Receipt No.: 20210526-00703.1; Paid: $450.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Department Assignment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • DocketStatus: Receive and Forward; Description: Appl/Order GAL, Summons Rec'd 5/20/21; Filed By: JENNIFER M NOTARIANNI

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Certificate of Counsel.; Filed By: JENNIFER M NOTARIANNI; DIOVANNI P NOTARIANNI; DANIEL S NOTARIANNI

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: JENNIFER M NOTARIANNI; DIOVANNI P NOTARIANNI; DANIEL S NOTARIANNI

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000); Filed By: JENNIFER M NOTARIANNI; DIOVANNI P NOTARIANNI; DANIEL S NOTARIANNI

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Mattress Firm Inc is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer VIRAG BRIAN