This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 09/16/2021 at 01:47:53 (UTC).

NOBLE vs NISSAN NORTH AMERICA, INC

Case Summary

On 07/07/2021 NOBLE filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against NISSAN NORTH AMERICA, INC. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Palm Springs Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The Judge overseeing this case is James Latting. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3342

  • Filing Date:

    07/07/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

Judge Details

Judge

James Latting

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AJLA NOBLE

Defendant

NISSAN NORTH AMERICA, INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Larry R. Hoddick

Defendant Attorney

MICHAEL P. SWEENEY

 

Court Documents

Answer to Complaint on Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000) of AJLA NOBLE

08/17/2021: Answer to Complaint on Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000) of AJLA NOBLE

Proof of Service on Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000) of AJLA NOBLE

07/21/2021: Proof of Service on Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000) of AJLA NOBLE

Notice of Case Management Conference

07/09/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Notice of Department Assignment

07/09/2021: Notice of Department Assignment

Summons Issued and Filed

07/07/2021: Summons Issued and Filed

Certificate of Counsel.

07/07/2021: Certificate of Counsel.

Civil Case Cover Sheet

07/07/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000)

07/07/2021: Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/05/2022
  • HearingType: Case Management Conference; Judicial Officer: James Latting; Location/Courtroom: Department PS2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Unlimited response: answer or other first paper filed by each party other than plaintiff amount over $25,000 including UD; includes response by party to petition for relief in discovery dispute related to out-of-state case (GC70612); Amount: $450.00; Paid: $450.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 08/18/2021; Fine Description: EFiling Payment Receipt No.: EFM20210818-00161.1; Paid: $450.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Answer to Complaint on Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000) of AJLA NOBLE; Filed By: NISSAN NORTH AMERICA, INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Proof of Service on Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000) of AJLA NOBLE; Filed By: AJLA NOBLE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Unlimited complaint or other first paper in unlimited civil case amount over $25,000 including UD over $25K, petition for writ of review, mandate, or prohibition; petition for a decree of change of name or gender (GC70611); Amount: $450.00; Paid: $450.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 07/09/2021; Fine Description: eSubmit *4050 Receipt No.: 20210709-00574.1; Paid: $450.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Department Assignment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Summons Issued and Filed; Filed By: AJLA NOBLE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Certificate of Counsel.; Filed By: AJLA NOBLE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: AJLA NOBLE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000); Filed By: AJLA NOBLE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • DocketFilings: Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000) of AJLA NOBLE

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Nissan North America Inc is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SWEENEY MICHAEL P