This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 10/29/2021 at 19:06:05 (UTC).

NISIM vs HARRISON

Case Summary

On 01/26/2021 NISIM filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against HARRISON. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Palm Springs Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The Judges overseeing this case are David M. Chapman and James Latting. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0457

  • Filing Date:

    01/26/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

Judge Details

Judges

David M. Chapman

James Latting

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DANIELLE NISIM

Defendants

BRETT C. HARRISON

JULIE D. HARRISON

TWISTED RIVER CAPITAL, LLC

BCH ENTERPRISES, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Robert Rodriguez Clayton

Taylor & Ring LLP

Attorney at Taylor & Ring LLP

Defendant Attorneys

Richard Duc Hoang

Resnick & Louis P.C.

Attorney at Resnick & Louis P.C.

 

Court Documents

Notice of Further Case Management Conference

10/14/2021: Notice of Further Case Management Conference

Minute Order: Case Management Conference

10/14/2021: Minute Order: Case Management Conference

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt of SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

06/09/2021: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt of SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

Case Management Statement on Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of DANIELLE NISIM

09/17/2021: Case Management Statement on Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of DANIELLE NISIM

Notice of Telephonic Appearance for Hearing on Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of DANIELLE NISIM

09/29/2021: Notice of Telephonic Appearance for Hearing on Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of DANIELLE NISIM

Minute Order: Case Management Conference

07/27/2021: Minute Order: Case Management Conference

Notice of Posting Jury Fees.

07/21/2021: Notice of Posting Jury Fees.

Case Management Statement on Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of DANIELLE NISIM

07/19/2021: Case Management Statement on Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of DANIELLE NISIM

Case Management Statement untimely pursuant to CRC 3.725

07/13/2021: Case Management Statement untimely pursuant to CRC 3.725

Notice of Telephonic Appearance for Hearing on Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of DANIELLE NISIM

07/13/2021: Notice of Telephonic Appearance for Hearing on Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of DANIELLE NISIM

Notice of Reassignment of Department for All Purposes on Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of DANIELLE NISIM

06/15/2021: Notice of Reassignment of Department for All Purposes on Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of DANIELLE NISIM

Notice of Telephonic Appearance for Hearing on Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of DANIELLE NISIM

06/14/2021: Notice of Telephonic Appearance for Hearing on Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of DANIELLE NISIM

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt of SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

06/09/2021: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt of SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt of Summons and Complaint

06/09/2021: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt of Summons and Complaint

Proof of Service on Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of DANIELLE NISIM

05/25/2021: Proof of Service on Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of DANIELLE NISIM

Notice of Document Return.

05/25/2021: Notice of Document Return.

Proof of Service on Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of DANIELLE NISIM

05/24/2021: Proof of Service on Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of DANIELLE NISIM

Notice of Hearing on Order to Show Cause why case should not be dismissed for failure to file Proof of Service

05/19/2021: Notice of Hearing on Order to Show Cause why case should not be dismissed for failure to file Proof of Service

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/03/2022
  • HearingType: Case Management Conference; Judicial Officer: Assigned Judge; Location/Courtroom: Department PS2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • HearingType: Case Management Conference; Judicial Officer: Assigned Judge; Location/Courtroom: Department PS2; Disposition: Continued - Other pre-disposition hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Notice of Further Case Management Conference; Filed By: DANIELLE NISIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Minute Order: Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Telephonic Appearance for Hearing on Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of DANIELLE NISIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Case Management Statement on Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of DANIELLE NISIM; Filed By: DANIELLE NISIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • HearingType: Hearing on Order to appear and show cause, if any, why sanctions not to exceed $1,500 or dismissal should not be imposed for failure to file Proof of Service as to Taylor & Ring LLP, DANIELLE NISIM; Judicial Officer: Assigned Judge; Location/Courtroom: Department PS2; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • HearingType: Case Management Conference; Judicial Officer: Assigned Judge; Location/Courtroom: Department PS2; Disposition: Continued - Other pre-disposition hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Minute Order: Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Jury Fee Deposit; Amount: $150.00; Paid: $150.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 07/21/2021; Fine Description: eSubmit *9981 Receipt No.: 20210721-00631.1; Paid: $150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
19 More Docket Entries
  • 04/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint on Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of DANIELLE NISIM; Filed By: BRETT C. HARRISON; JULIE D. HARRISON; TWISTED RIVER CAPITAL, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Proof of Service on Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of DANIELLE NISIM; Filed By: DANIELLE NISIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Unlimited complaint or other first paper in unlimited civil case amount over $25,000 including UD over $25K, petition for writ of review, mandate, or prohibition; petition for a decree of change of name or gender (GC70611); Amount: $450.00; Paid: $450.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 01/28/2021; Fine Description: Check #3812332 Receipt No.: 20210128-00195.1; Paid: $450.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Department Assignment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Summons Issued and Filed; Filed By: DANIELLE NISIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Certificate of Counsel.; Filed By: DANIELLE NISIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: DANIELLE NISIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000); Filed By: DANIELLE NISIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • DocketFilings: Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of DANIELLE NISIM

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BCH ENTERPRISES LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HOANG RICHARD D.