This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 11/01/2021 at 11:24:20 (UTC).

NICKSON vs SHEMRAN, INC.

Case Summary

On 09/10/2021 NICKSON filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against SHEMRAN, INC. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Murrieta Southwest Justice Center located in Riverside, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Angel M. Bermudez. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7735

  • Filing Date:

    09/10/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

Judge Details

Judge

Angel M. Bermudez

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BLAINE NICKSON

Defendants

SHEMRAN, INC

BARONS MARKET

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

EDWIN AIWAZIAN

 

Court Documents

Complaint for Other Employment (Over $25,000)

09/10/2021: Complaint for Other Employment (Over $25,000)

Summons Issued and Filed

09/10/2021: Summons Issued and Filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet

09/10/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Certificate of Counsel.

09/10/2021: Certificate of Counsel.

Notice of Case Management Conference Complaint for Other Employment (Over $25,000)

09/13/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference Complaint for Other Employment (Over $25,000)

Notice of Department Assignment

09/13/2021: Notice of Department Assignment

Proof of Service on Complaint for Other Employment (Over $25,000) of BLAINE NICKSON

10/25/2021: Proof of Service on Complaint for Other Employment (Over $25,000) of BLAINE NICKSON

Notice of Document Return.

10/26/2021: Notice of Document Return.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/14/2022
  • HearingType: Case Management Conference; Judicial Officer: Angel M. Bermudez; Location/Courtroom: Department S302

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Document Return.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Proof of Service on Complaint for Other Employment (Over $25,000) of BLAINE NICKSON; Filed By: BLAINE NICKSON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Unlimited complaint or other first paper in unlimited civil case amount over $25,000 including UD over $25K, petition for writ of review, mandate, or prohibition; petition for a decree of change of name or gender (GC70611); Amount: $450.00; Paid: $450.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 09/13/2021; Fine Description: EFiling Payment Receipt No.: EFM20210913-00456.1; Paid: $450.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Department Assignment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Case Management Conference Complaint for Other Employment (Over $25,000)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • DocketDEADLINES & REMINDERS; Timestandard: Non-Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint; Expiration Date: 11/09/2021; Status: Active

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Certificate of Counsel.; Filed By: BLAINE NICKSON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: BLAINE NICKSON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Summons Issued and Filed; Filed By: BLAINE NICKSON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Complaint for Other Employment (Over $25,000); Filed By: BLAINE NICKSON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • DocketFilings: Complaint for Other Employment (Over $25,000) of BLAINE NICKSON

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SHEMRAN INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer AIWAZIAN EDWIN