This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 02/12/2022 at 04:54:31 (UTC).

NELSON & NELSON

Case Summary

On 12/28/2021 NELSON NELSON was filed as a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Riverside Historic Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Samra Furbush. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8355

  • Filing Date:

    12/28/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

Judge Details

Judge

Samra Furbush

 

Party Details

Petitioner

OTILA DESPER NELSON

Respondent

JEFFERY RYAN NELSON

Not Classified By Court

JAMESON RYAN NELSON

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Jonathon Andrew Zitney

Respondent Attorney

Amanda Beth Naples

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/01/2022
  • HearingType: Hearing re: Request for Order re: Attorney Fees and Cost, Child Custody, Child Support, Spousal or Partner Support, Visitation filed on 12/28/2021; Judicial Officer: Samra Furbush; Location/Courtroom: Department F201

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Proof of Service re: Responsive Declaration to Request for Order; Filed By: JEFFERY RYAN NELSON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Declaration of Danika Fleming; Filed By: JEFFERY RYAN NELSON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Income and Expense Declaration (FL-150); Filed By: JEFFERY RYAN NELSON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Responsive Declaration to Request for Order (FL-320); Filed By: JEFFERY RYAN NELSON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Fee for eSubmit (SAP 821157); Amount: $2.00; Paid: $2.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 01/24/2022; Fine Description: eSubmit *7341 Receipt No.: 20220124-00446.1; Paid: $2.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Response or other first paper filed in response to petition for dissolution of marriage or domestic partnership, legal separation, or nullity (GC70670D); Amount: $450.00; Paid: $450.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 01/24/2022; Fine Description: Check #8423 Receipt No.: 20220124-00124.1; Paid: $450.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Proof of Service re: Response and Request for Dissolution of Marriage; Filed By: JEFFERY RYAN NELSON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Response to Petition for Dissolution, Legal Separation, or Nullity. (FL-120) on Dissolution of Marriage With Child(ren) filed by OTILA DESPER NELSON; Filed By: JEFFERY RYAN NELSON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Declaration of Residence (RI-FL036); Filed By: JEFFERY RYAN NELSON

    Read MoreRead Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 12/28/2021
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Order to Attend Child Custody Recommending Counseling Appointment on Dissolution of Marriage With Child(ren) filed by OTILA DESPER NELSON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2021
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Request for Order re: Attorney Fees and Cost, Child Custody, Child Support, Spousal or Partner Support, Visitation filed on 12/28/2021; Filed By: OTILA DESPER NELSON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2021
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Summons Issued and Filed; Filed By: OTILA DESPER NELSON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2021
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Declaration of Residence (RI-FL036); Filed By: OTILA DESPER NELSON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2021
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Declaration Under Uniform Child Custody Jurisdiction and Enforcement Act (UCCJEA) (FL-105/GC-120); Filed By: OTILA DESPER NELSON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2021
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Petition for Dissolution of Marriage FL-100; Filed By: OTILA DESPER NELSON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2021
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Order on Court Fee Waiver (FW-003) - Granted by Clerk on Dissolution of Marriage With Child(ren) filed by OTILA DESPER NELSON; Filed By: OTILA DESPER NELSON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2021
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Request to Waive Court Fees (FW-001) on Dissolution of Marriage With Child(ren) filed by OTILA DESPER NELSON; Filed By: OTILA DESPER NELSON; Confidential: YES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2021
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Income and Expense Declaration (FL-150); Filed By: OTILA DESPER NELSON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2021
  • DocketFilings: Dissolution of Marriage With Child(ren) filed by OTILA DESPER NELSON

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer NAPLES AMANDA BETH