This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 10/26/2021 at 01:32:05 (UTC).

MOSS BROS TOYOTA vs PRICE

Case Summary

On 08/26/2021 MOSS BROS TOYOTA filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against PRICE. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Moreno Valley Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The Judge overseeing this case is David E. Gregory. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4718

  • Filing Date:

    08/26/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

Judge Details

Judge

David E. Gregory

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MOSS BROS TOYOTA

Defendant

DEDRICK PRICE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Michael Steven Geller

 

Court Documents

Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $10,000 does not exceed $25,000

08/26/2021: Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $10,000 does not exceed $25,000

Civil Case Cover Sheet

08/26/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Certificate of Counsel.

08/26/2021: Certificate of Counsel.

Summons Issued and Filed

08/26/2021: Summons Issued and Filed

Notice of Trial Setting Conference - Limited Civil on Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $10,000 does not exceed $25,000) of MOSS BROS TOYOTA

10/01/2021: Notice of Trial Setting Conference - Limited Civil on Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $10,000 does not exceed $25,000) of MOSS BROS TOYOTA

Notice of Department Assignment

10/01/2021: Notice of Department Assignment

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/04/2022
  • HearingType: Trial Setting Conference - Limited Civil; Judicial Officer: David E. Gregory; Location/Courtroom: Department MV1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Limited complaint or other first paper amount over $10,000 up to $25,000 (GC70613A); Amount: $395.00; Paid: $395.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 10/01/2021; Fine Description: eSubmit *1539 Receipt No.: 20211001-00011.1; Paid: $395.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Department Assignment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Trial Setting Conference - Limited Civil on Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $10,000 does not exceed $25,000) of MOSS BROS TOYOTA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • DocketDEADLINES & REMINDERS; Timestandard: Non-Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint; Expiration Date: 10/25/2021; Status: Active

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Summons Issued and Filed; Filed By: MOSS BROS TOYOTA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Certificate of Counsel.; Filed By: MOSS BROS TOYOTA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: MOSS BROS TOYOTA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $10,000 does not exceed $25,000; Filed By: MOSS BROS TOYOTA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • DocketFilings: Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $10,000 does not exceed $25,000) of MOSS BROS TOYOTA

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MOSS BROS, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GELLER MICHAEL STEVEN