This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 11/03/2021 at 14:07:15 (UTC).

MOSS BROS. TOY., INC vs S SANTILLAN

Case Summary

On 07/26/2021 MOSS BROS TOY , INC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against S SANTILLAN. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Moreno Valley Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Belinda A. Handy. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0525

  • Filing Date:

    07/26/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

Judge Details

Judge

Belinda A. Handy

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

MOSS BROS. TOY., INC

MOSS BROS. TOYOTA

Defendant

LUIS ALBERTO S SANTILLAN

 

Court Documents

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court (SC-100) $1,500 or Less

07/26/2021: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court (SC-100) $1,500 or Less

Notice of In-Person Appearance on Plaintiff's Claim - $1,500 or less filed by MOSS BROS. TOY., INC

09/08/2021: Notice of In-Person Appearance on Plaintiff's Claim - $1,500 or less filed by MOSS BROS. TOY., INC

Notice of Department Assignment

09/08/2021: Notice of Department Assignment

Proof of Service (Small Claims) on Plaintiff's Claim - $1,500 or less filed by MOSS BROS. TOY., INC

10/08/2021: Proof of Service (Small Claims) on Plaintiff's Claim - $1,500 or less filed by MOSS BROS. TOY., INC

Certificate of Mailing Small Claims Notice of Entry of Judgment on Plaintiff's Claim - $1,500 or less filed by MOSS BROS. TOY., INC

10/28/2021: Certificate of Mailing Small Claims Notice of Entry of Judgment on Plaintiff's Claim - $1,500 or less filed by MOSS BROS. TOY., INC

Minute Order: Hearing on Small Claims

10/28/2021: Minute Order: Hearing on Small Claims

Authorization to Appear (SC-109). Authorized to appear: Christina Gutierrez

10/28/2021: Authorization to Appear (SC-109). Authorized to appear: Christina Gutierrez

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/28/2021
  • HearingType: Hearing on Small Claims; Judicial Officer: Belinda A. Handy; Location/Courtroom: Department MV2; Disposition: Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • JudgementStatus: Entered; Type: Money; Applies to: Plaintiff's Claim - $1,500 or less filed by MOSS BROS. TOY., INC; For/Against: For - MOSS BROS. TOY., INC Against - LUIS ALBERTO S SANTILLAN; Details; Principal: $1,500.00; Costs: $190.00; Accrued Interest: $0.00; Offset(-): $0.00; Subtotal Judgment: $1,690.00; Total: $1,690.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • DocketDEADLINES & REMINDERS; Timestandard: 10-Year Judgment Expiration; Expiration Date: 10/28/2031; Status: Active

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Minute Order: Hearing on Small Claims

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Certificate of Mailing Small Claims Notice of Entry of Judgment on Plaintiff's Claim - $1,500 or less filed by MOSS BROS. TOY., INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Authorization to Appear (SC-109). Authorized to appear: Christina Gutierrez

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Proof of Service (Small Claims) on Plaintiff's Claim - $1,500 or less filed by MOSS BROS. TOY., INC; Filed By: MOSS BROS. TOY., INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Small Claims filing claim for $1,500 or less (CCP116.230B1); Amount: $30.00; Paid: $30.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 09/08/2021; Fine Description: eSubmit *1016 Receipt No.: 20210908-00447.1; Paid: $30.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Department Assignment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of In-Person Appearance on Plaintiff's Claim - $1,500 or less filed by MOSS BROS. TOY., INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court (SC-100) $1,500 or Less; Filed By: MOSS BROS. TOY., INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • DocketFilings: Plaintiff's Claim - $1,500 or less filed by MOSS BROS. TOY., INC; Disposition: Uncontested Judgment 10/28/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Moss Bros. Toy, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where MOSS BROS, INC. is a litigant