This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 02/03/2023 at 00:45:11 (UTC).

MORENO SALAZAR vs VOLKSWAGEN GROUP OF AMERICA, INC.

Case Summary

On 01/31/2023 MORENO SALAZAR filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against VOLKSWAGEN GROUP OF AMERICA, INC. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Riverside Historic Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Irma Asberry. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0503

  • Filing Date:

    01/31/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

Judge Details

Judge

Irma Asberry

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ALEXIS GABRIEL MORENO SALAZAR

Defendant

VOLKSWAGEN GROUP OF AMERICA, INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KEVIN JACOBSON SARAH PFEFFER

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT

01/31/2023: COMPLAINT

Certificate of Counsel.

01/31/2023: Certificate of Counsel.

Civil Case Cover Sheet

01/31/2023: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons Issued and Filed

01/31/2023: Summons Issued and Filed

Notice of Case Management Conference Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000)

02/02/2023: Notice of Case Management Conference Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000)

Notice of Department Assignment

02/02/2023: Notice of Department Assignment

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/01/2023
  • HearingType: Case Management Conference; Judicial Officer: Irma Asberry; Location/Courtroom: Department 5

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Unlimited complaint or other first paper in unlimited civil case amount over $25,000 including UD over $25K, petition for writ of review, mandate, or prohibition; petition for a decree of change of name or gender (GC70611); Amount: $450.00; Paid: $450.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 02/02/2023; Fine Description: EFiling Payment Receipt No.: EFM20230202-00807.1; Paid: $450.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Fee for eFiling; Amount: $1.00; Paid: $1.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 02/02/2023; Fine Description: EFiling Payment Receipt No.: EFM20230202-00807.1; Paid: $1.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Department Assignment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Case Management Conference Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • DocketDEADLINES & REMINDERS; Timestandard: Non-Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint; Expiration Date: 04/01/2023; Status: Active

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Summons Issued and Filed; Filed By: ALEXIS GABRIEL MORENO SALAZAR

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: ALEXIS GABRIEL MORENO SALAZAR

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Certificate of Counsel.; Filed By: ALEXIS GABRIEL MORENO SALAZAR

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: COMPLAINT; Filed By: ALEXIS GABRIEL MORENO SALAZAR

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • DocketFilings: Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000) of ALEXIS GABRIEL MORENO SALAZAR

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less