This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 05/16/2021 at 02:26:21 (UTC).

MORALES vs INNOVATIVE REFRIGERATION SYSTEMS, INC.

Case Summary

On 03/03/2021 MORALES filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against INNOVATIVE REFRIGERATION SYSTEMS, INC. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Riverside Historic Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Craig Riemer. The case status is Other - Stayed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1322

  • Filing Date:

    03/03/2021

  • Case Status:

    Other - Stayed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

Judge Details

Judge

Craig Riemer

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ROBERTO MORALES

Defendants

VIRGINIA INNOVATIVE REFRIGERATION SYSTEMS, INC

INNOVATIVE REFRIGERATION SYSTEMS, INC

INNOVATIVE REFRIGERATION SYSTEMS, INC.

VIRGINIA INNOVATIVE REFRIGERATION SYSTEMS, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Farris Elias Ain

Defendant Attorney

Peter J. Woo

 

Court Documents

Summons Issued and Filed

03/03/2021: Summons Issued and Filed

Certificate of Counsel.

03/03/2021: Certificate of Counsel.

Civil Case Cover Sheet

03/03/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint for Wrongful Termination (Over $25,000)

03/03/2021: Complaint for Wrongful Termination (Over $25,000)

Notice of Department Assignment

03/17/2021: Notice of Department Assignment

Notice of Case Management Conference

03/17/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Defendant Innovative Refrigeration Systems, Inc.'s Answer to Complaint on Complaint for Wrongful Termination (Over $25,000) of ROBERTO MORALES

04/15/2021: Defendant Innovative Refrigeration Systems, Inc.'s Answer to Complaint on Complaint for Wrongful Termination (Over $25,000) of ROBERTO MORALES

Notice to State Court of Removal to Federal Court on Complaint for Wrongful Termination (Over $25,000) of ROBERTO MORALES

04/29/2021: Notice to State Court of Removal to Federal Court on Complaint for Wrongful Termination (Over $25,000) of ROBERTO MORALES

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/13/2021
  • HearingType: Case Management Conference; Judicial Officer: Craig Riemer; Location/Courtroom: Department 1; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Notice to State Court of Removal to Federal Court on Complaint for Wrongful Termination (Over $25,000) of ROBERTO MORALES; Filed By: INNOVATIVE REFRIGERATION SYSTEMS, INC.; VIRGINIA INNOVATIVE REFRIGERATION SYSTEMS, INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Unlimited response: answer or other first paper filed by each party other than plaintiff amount over $25,000 including UD; includes response by party to petition for relief in discovery dispute related to out-of-state case (GC70612); Amount: $450.00; Paid: $450.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 04/22/2021; Fine Description: eSubmit *8858 Receipt No.: 20210422-00607.1; Paid: $450.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Defendant Innovative Refrigeration Systems, Inc.'s Answer to Complaint on Complaint for Wrongful Termination (Over $25,000) of ROBERTO MORALES; Filed By: INNOVATIVE REFRIGERATION SYSTEMS, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Unlimited complaint or other first paper in unlimited civil case amount over $25,000 including UD over $25K, petition for writ of review, mandate, or prohibition; petition for a decree of change of name or gender (GC70611); Amount: $450.00; Paid: $450.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 03/17/2021; Fine Description: eSubmit *1000 Receipt No.: 20210317-00542.1; Paid: $450.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Department Assignment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Summons Issued and Filed; Filed By: ROBERTO MORALES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Certificate of Counsel.; Filed By: ROBERTO MORALES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: ROBERTO MORALES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Complaint for Wrongful Termination (Over $25,000); Filed By: ROBERTO MORALES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketFilings: Complaint for Wrongful Termination (Over $25,000) of ROBERTO MORALES

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer WOO PETER J.