This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 08/04/2022 at 11:42:06 (UTC).

MORA vs TOMMY BAHAMA R&R HOLDINGS, INC

Case Summary

On 01/19/2022 MORA filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against TOMMY BAHAMA R R HOLDINGS, INC. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Palm Springs Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Manuel Bustamante. The case status is Not Yet Classified.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0331

  • Filing Date:

    01/19/2022

  • Case Status:

    Not Yet Classified

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

Judge Details

Judge

Manuel Bustamante

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GILBERT MORA, JR

Claimants

ALDERLAW PC

ADLERLAW PC

Defendants

TOMMY BAHAMA GROUP, INC, A CORPORATION

TOMMY BAHAMA R&R HOLDINGS, INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SCHUERING ZIMMERMAN & DOYLE LLP

Attorney at SCHUERING ZIMMERMAN & DOYLE LLP

Claimant Attorney

AlderLaw Viridiana Aceves

Defendant Attorney

TRACI WHALEY PATINO

 

Court Documents

Certificate of Mailing

07/22/2022: Certificate of Mailing

Minute Order: Court on its Own Motion

07/22/2022: Minute Order: Court on its Own Motion

Case Management Statement on Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of GILBERT MORA, JR.

07/11/2022: Case Management Statement on Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of GILBERT MORA, JR.

Case Management Statement on Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of GILBERT MORA, JR.

07/11/2022: Case Management Statement on Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of GILBERT MORA, JR.

Notice of Deposit of Jury Fees on Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of GILBERT MORA, JR.

07/11/2022: Notice of Deposit of Jury Fees on Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of GILBERT MORA, JR.

Notice of Attorney Lien on Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of GILBERT MORA, JR.

05/20/2022: Notice of Attorney Lien on Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of GILBERT MORA, JR.

Notice of Document Return.

05/20/2022: Notice of Document Return.

Substitution of Attorney

05/17/2022: Substitution of Attorney

Notice of Reassignment of Department for All Purposes on Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of GILBERT MORA, JR.

05/06/2022: Notice of Reassignment of Department for All Purposes on Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of GILBERT MORA, JR.

Notice of Case Management Conference Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000)

07/25/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000)

Notice of Court Ordered Mediation

07/25/2022: Notice of Court Ordered Mediation

Answer to Complaint on Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of GILBERT MORA, JR.

03/22/2022: Answer to Complaint on Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of GILBERT MORA, JR.

Proof of Service on Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of GILBERT MORA, JR.

02/14/2022: Proof of Service on Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of GILBERT MORA, JR.

Proof of Service on Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of GILBERT MORA, JR.

02/04/2022: Proof of Service on Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of GILBERT MORA, JR.

Notice of Department Assignment

01/27/2022: Notice of Department Assignment

Notice of Case Management Conference Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000)

01/27/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000)

Certificate of Counsel.

01/19/2022: Certificate of Counsel.

Summons Issued and Filed

01/19/2022: Summons Issued and Filed

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/23/2023
  • HearingType: Case Management Conference; Judicial Officer: Manuel Bustamante; Location/Courtroom: Department PS2

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • HearingType: Case Management Conference; Judicial Officer: Manuel Bustamante; Location/Courtroom: Department PS2; Disposition: Vacated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • DocketDEADLINES & REMINDERS; Timestandard: Response to Notice of Court Ordered Mediation Due; Expiration Date: 08/15/2022; Status: Active

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Case Management Conference Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Court Ordered Mediation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/22/2022
  • HearingType: Court on its Own Motion; Judicial Officer: Manuel Bustamante; Location/Courtroom: Department PS2; Disposition: Completed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/22/2022
  • DocketDEADLINES & REMINDERS; Timestandard: Mediation Statement of Agreement/Nonagreement Due; Expiration Date: 12/27/2022; Status: Active

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Certificate of Mailing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Minute Order: Court on its Own Motion

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2022
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Fee for eFiling; Amount: $1.00; Paid: $1.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 07/12/2022; Fine Description: EFiling Payment Receipt No.: EFM20220712-00066.1; Paid: $1.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
18 More Docket Entries
  • 02/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Proof of Service on Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of GILBERT MORA, JR.; Filed By: GILBERT MORA, JR.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2022
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Fee for eFiling; Amount: $1.00; Paid: $1.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 01/27/2022; Fine Description: EFiling Payment Receipt No.: EFM20220127-02056.1; Paid: $1.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2022
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Unlimited complaint or other first paper in unlimited civil case amount over $25,000 including UD over $25K, petition for writ of review, mandate, or prohibition; petition for a decree of change of name or gender (GC70611); Amount: $450.00; Paid: $450.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 01/27/2022; Fine Description: EFiling Payment Receipt No.: EFM20220127-02056.1; Paid: $450.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Department Assignment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Case Management Conference Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Certificate of Counsel.; Filed By: GILBERT MORA, JR.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Summons Issued and Filed; Filed By: GILBERT MORA, JR.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: GILBERT MORA, JR.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000); Filed By: GILBERT MORA, JR.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • DocketFilings: Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of GILBERT MORA, JR.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ALDERLAW PC is a litigant

Latest cases where Tommy Bahama Group, Inc. is a litigant