This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 12/04/2021 at 00:42:35 (UTC).

MORA vs SUPERIOR LOAN SERVICING

Case Summary

On 09/07/2021 MORA filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against SUPERIOR LOAN SERVICING. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Riverside Historic Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4058

  • Filing Date:

    09/07/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GONZALO MORA

Defendants

SUPERIOR LOAN SERVICING

ASSET DEFAULT MANAGEMENT, INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

TONY CARA

 

Court Documents

Plaintiff's Complaint

09/07/2021: Plaintiff's Complaint

Certificate of Counsel.

09/07/2021: Certificate of Counsel.

Summons Issued and Filed

09/07/2021: Summons Issued and Filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet

09/07/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Management Conference Complaint for Other Real Property (Over $25,000)

09/07/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference Complaint for Other Real Property (Over $25,000)

Notice of Department Assignment

09/07/2021: Notice of Department Assignment

Proof of Service on Complaint for Other Real Property (Over $25,000) of GONZALO MORA

09/14/2021: Proof of Service on Complaint for Other Real Property (Over $25,000) of GONZALO MORA

Proof of Service on Complaint for Other Real Property (Over $25,000) of GONZALO MORA

09/14/2021: Proof of Service on Complaint for Other Real Property (Over $25,000) of GONZALO MORA

1st Amended Complaint for Other Real Property (Over $25,000) of GONZALO MORA

11/18/2021: 1st Amended Complaint for Other Real Property (Over $25,000) of GONZALO MORA

Motion for Consolidation of Cases on Complaint for Other Real Property (Over $25,000) of GONZALO MORA

11/18/2021: Motion for Consolidation of Cases on Complaint for Other Real Property (Over $25,000) of GONZALO MORA

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/07/2022
  • HearingType: Case Management Conference; Location/Courtroom: Department 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • HearingType: Hearing re: Motion to Consolidate on Complaint for Other Real Property (Over $25,000) of GONZALO MORA by GONZALO MORA; Location/Courtroom: Department 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Motion, application (including ex parte) or any other paper requiring a hearing subsequent to the first paper filing (70617A); Amount: $60.00; Paid: $60.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 11/18/2021; Fine Description: EFiling Payment Receipt No.: EFM20211118-00270.1; Paid: $60.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: 1st Amended Complaint for Other Real Property (Over $25,000) of GONZALO MORA; Filed By: GONZALO MORA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Motion for Consolidation of Cases on Complaint for Other Real Property (Over $25,000) of GONZALO MORA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • DocketFilings: 1st Amended Complaint for Other Real Property (Over $25,000) of GONZALO MORA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Proof of Service on Complaint for Other Real Property (Over $25,000) of GONZALO MORA; Filed By: GONZALO MORA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Proof of Service on Complaint for Other Real Property (Over $25,000) of GONZALO MORA; Filed By: GONZALO MORA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Unlimited complaint or other first paper in unlimited civil case amount over $25,000 including UD over $25K, petition for writ of review, mandate, or prohibition; petition for a decree of change of name or gender (GC70611); Amount: $450.00; Paid: $450.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 09/07/2021; Fine Description: EFiling Payment Receipt No.: EFM20210907-00420.1; Paid: $450.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Department Assignment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Case Management Conference Complaint for Other Real Property (Over $25,000)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: GONZALO MORA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Summons Issued and Filed; Filed By: GONZALO MORA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Certificate of Counsel.; Filed By: GONZALO MORA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Plaintiff's Complaint; Filed By: GONZALO MORA

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ASSET DEFAULT MANAGEMENT, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where SUPERIOR LOAN SERVICING INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer TONY CARA