This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 10/23/2021 at 05:56:56 (UTC).

MOLINA & MOLINA

Case Summary

On 09/02/2021 MOLINA MOLINA was filed as a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Hemet Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3712

  • Filing Date:

    09/02/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

SARA MARIA MOLINA

Respondent

RONALD EDWARDO MOLINA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Kourosh Pourmorady

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/07/2021
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Fee for eSubmit (SAP 821157); Amount: $2.00; Paid: $2.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 09/07/2021; Fine Description: eSubmit *1654 Receipt No.: 20210907-00973.1; Paid: $2.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Petition or other first paper (including a joint petition) for dissolution of marriage or domestic partnership, legal separation, or nullity (GC70670B); Amount: $450.00; Paid: $450.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 09/07/2021; Fine Description: eSubmit *1654 Receipt No.: 20210907-00973.1; Paid: $450.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Family Law Case Management Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Department Assignment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • DocketDEADLINES & REMINDERS; Timestandard: Failure to Bring Case to Trial or Judgment; Expiration Date: 09/01/2026; Status: Active

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • DocketDEADLINES & REMINDERS; Timestandard: Non Proof of Service of Summons and Petition; Expiration Date: 09/01/2024; Status: Active

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • DocketDEADLINES & REMINDERS; Timestandard: Schedule a Case Status Conference; Expiration Date: 09/02/2022; Status: Active

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • DocketDEADLINES & REMINDERS; Timestandard: Case Management Date: Proof of Service; Expiration Date: 11/01/2021; Status: Active

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Summons Issued and Filed; Filed By: SARA MARIA MOLINA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Declaration of Residence (RI-FL036); Filed By: SARA MARIA MOLINA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Petition for Dissolution of Marriage FL-100; Filed By: SARA MARIA MOLINA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Property Declaration - Community and Quasi Community Property Declaration. (FL-160); Filed By: SARA MARIA MOLINA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • DocketFilings: Dissolution of Marriage Without Child(ren) filed by SARA MARIA MOLINA

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer POURMORADY KOUROSH M.