This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 12/30/2022 at 17:23:03 (UTC).

MISSION RANCH MASTER ASSOCIATION vs BENNETT

Case Summary

On 11/22/2022 MISSION RANCH MASTER ASSOCIATION filed an Other lawsuit against BENNETT. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Moreno Valley Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The Judge overseeing this case is David E. Gregory. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5621

  • Filing Date:

    11/22/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

Judge Details

Judge

David E. Gregory

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MISSION RANCH MASTER ASSOCIATION

Defendant

JOHN BENNETT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DANIEL MEDIONI

 

Court Documents

Complaint for 1. To Foreclose Lien; 2. for Breach of Covenants 3. Quantum Meruit ; and 4. Account Stated

11/22/2022: Complaint for 1. To Foreclose Lien; 2. for Breach of Covenants 3. Quantum Meruit ; and 4. Account Stated

Summons Issued and Filed

11/22/2022: Summons Issued and Filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/22/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Certificate of Counsel.

11/22/2022: Certificate of Counsel.

Notice of Department Assignment

12/29/2022: Notice of Department Assignment

Notice of Trial Setting Conference - Limited Civil Complaint for Other Complaint (Under $10,000) on Complaint for Other Complaint (Under $10,000) of MISSION RANCH MASTER ASSOCIATION

12/29/2022: Notice of Trial Setting Conference - Limited Civil Complaint for Other Complaint (Under $10,000) on Complaint for Other Complaint (Under $10,000) of MISSION RANCH MASTER ASSOCIATION

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/22/2023
  • HearingType: Trial Setting Conference - Limited Civil; Judicial Officer: David E. Gregory; Location/Courtroom: Department MV1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2022
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Limited complaint or other first paper amount up to $10,000 (GC70613B); Amount: $255.00; Paid: $255.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 12/29/2022; Fine Description: EFiling Payment Receipt No.: EFM20221229-01696.1; Paid: $255.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2022
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Fee for eFiling; Amount: $1.00; Paid: $1.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 12/29/2022; Fine Description: EFiling Payment Receipt No.: EFM20221229-01696.1; Paid: $1.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Trial Setting Conference - Limited Civil Complaint for Other Complaint (Under $10,000) on Complaint for Other Complaint (Under $10,000) of MISSION RANCH MASTER ASSOCIATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Department Assignment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • DocketDEADLINES & REMINDERS; Timestandard: Non-Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint; Expiration Date: 01/21/2023; Status: Active

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Certificate of Counsel.; Filed By: MISSION RANCH MASTER ASSOCIATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: MISSION RANCH MASTER ASSOCIATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Summons Issued and Filed; Filed By: MISSION RANCH MASTER ASSOCIATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Complaint for 1. To Foreclose Lien; 2. for Breach of Covenants 3. Quantum Meruit ; and 4. Account Stated; Filed By: MISSION RANCH MASTER ASSOCIATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • DocketFilings: Complaint for Other Complaint (Under $10,000) of MISSION RANCH MASTER ASSOCIATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less