This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 09/28/2021 at 03:40:52 (UTC).

MIDDLESEX INSURANCE COMPANY vs AUBERT

Case Summary

On 05/11/2021 MIDDLESEX INSURANCE COMPANY filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against AUBERT. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Moreno Valley Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The Judge overseeing this case is David E. Gregory. The case status is Other - Stayed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3040

  • Filing Date:

    05/11/2021

  • Case Status:

    Other - Stayed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

Judge Details

Judge

David E. Gregory

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MIDDLESEX INSURANCE COMPANY

Defendant

TAETNC BLUEBOY AUBERT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Todd Frederick Haines

 

Court Documents

Notice of Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal After Conditional Settlement (CRC 3.1385(c))

09/21/2021: Notice of Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal After Conditional Settlement (CRC 3.1385(c))

Notice of Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal After Conditional Settlement (CRC 3.1385(c)) Notice of Settlement of Entire Case (CM-200) on Complaint for Collections CRC 3.740 (Under $10,000) of MIDDLESEX INSURANCE COMPANY

09/21/2021: Notice of Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal After Conditional Settlement (CRC 3.1385(c)) Notice of Settlement of Entire Case (CM-200) on Complaint for Collections CRC 3.740 (Under $10,000) of MIDDLESEX INSURANCE COMPANY

Notice of Settlement of Entire Case (CM-200) on Complaint for Collections CRC 3.740 (Under $10,000) of MIDDLESEX INSURANCE COMPANY

08/12/2021: Notice of Settlement of Entire Case (CM-200) on Complaint for Collections CRC 3.740 (Under $10,000) of MIDDLESEX INSURANCE COMPANY

Notice of Document Return.

08/11/2021: Notice of Document Return.

Summons Issued and Filed

05/11/2021: Summons Issued and Filed

Certificate of Counsel.

05/11/2021: Certificate of Counsel.

Civil Case Cover Sheet

05/11/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint for Collections CRC 3.740 (under $10,000)

05/11/2021: Complaint for Collections CRC 3.740 (under $10,000)

Notice of Department Assignment

07/15/2021: Notice of Department Assignment

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/01/2027
  • HearingType: Hearing on Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal After Conditional Settlement Pursuant to CRC 3.1385(c); Judicial Officer: David E. Gregory; Location/Courtroom: Department MV1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • HearingType: Hearing on Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal After Conditional Settlement Pursuant to CRC 3.1385(c); Judicial Officer: David E. Gregory; Location/Courtroom: Department MV1; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal After Conditional Settlement (CRC 3.1385(c))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal After Conditional Settlement (CRC 3.1385(c)) Notice of Settlement of Entire Case (CM-200) on Complaint for Collections CRC 3.740 (Under $10,000) of MIDDLESEX INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Notice of Settlement of Entire Case (CM-200) on Complaint for Collections CRC 3.740 (Under $10,000) of MIDDLESEX INSURANCE COMPANY; Filed By: MIDDLESEX INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Document Return.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Limited complaint or other first paper amount up to $10,000 (GC70613B); Amount: $255.00; Paid: $255.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 07/15/2021; Fine Description: Check #61918 Receipt No.: 20210715-00629.1; Paid: $255.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Department Assignment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • DocketDEADLINES & REMINDERS; Timestandard: Civil - Failure to file Default Judgment within 360 days as to MIDDLESEX INSURANCE COMPANY; Expiration Date: 05/06/2022; Status: Active

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Summons Issued and Filed; Filed By: MIDDLESEX INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Certificate of Counsel.; Filed By: MIDDLESEX INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: MIDDLESEX INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Complaint for Collections CRC 3.740 (under $10,000); Filed By: MIDDLESEX INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • DocketFilings: Complaint for Collections CRC 3.740 (Under $10,000) of MIDDLESEX INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MIDDLESEX INSURANCE is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HAINES TODD FREDERICK