This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 11/04/2021 at 13:31:34 (UTC).

MERITAGE HOMES OF CALIFORNIA, INC. vs A AND J GRADING CONTRACTORS, INC.

Case Summary

On 02/18/2021 MERITAGE HOMES OF CALIFORNIA, INC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against A AND J GRADING CONTRACTORS, INC. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Riverside Historic Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Sunshine Sykes. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1070

  • Filing Date:

    02/18/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

Judge Details

Judge

Sunshine Sykes

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MERITAGE HOMES OF CALIFORNIA, INC

Defendants

TIMBERLAKE CABINETRY

AMERICAN WOODMARK CORPORATION

SCHAMBER ELECTRIC, INC

ULTRA WALL, INC

SECURITY-GARAGE DOOR

LARRY METHVIN INSTALLATIONS, INC

TOTAL COMFORT, INC

VP CONCRETE, INC

MATRIX SURFACES, INC

MONTGOMERY KEITH COMPANY

VINTAGE ROOFING AND SOLAR CO

PACIFIC PRODUCTION PLUMBING

WALTERS WHOLESALE ELECTRIC, INC

VINTAGE DESIGN, INC

JOSEPH HOLT PLASTERING, INC

SECURITY-GARAGE DOOR, INC

Cross Plaintiff

CVC CONSTRUCTION CORP

Cross Defendant

ZOES 1 THROUGH 50

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Edward Russell Huguenin Jessica Lynn Moran Tyler W Wood

Cross Plaintiff Attorney

Cheryl A. Kirkpatrick

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service on Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000) of MERITAGE HOMES OF CALIFORNIA, INC.

04/05/2021: Proof of Service on Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000) of MERITAGE HOMES OF CALIFORNIA, INC.

Proof of Service on Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000) of MERITAGE HOMES OF CALIFORNIA, INC.

04/05/2021: Proof of Service on Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000) of MERITAGE HOMES OF CALIFORNIA, INC.

Proof of Service on Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000) of MERITAGE HOMES OF CALIFORNIA, INC.

04/05/2021: Proof of Service on Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000) of MERITAGE HOMES OF CALIFORNIA, INC.

Proof of Service on Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000) of MERITAGE HOMES OF CALIFORNIA, INC.

04/05/2021: Proof of Service on Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000) of MERITAGE HOMES OF CALIFORNIA, INC.

Proof of Service on Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000) of MERITAGE HOMES OF CALIFORNIA, INC.

04/05/2021: Proof of Service on Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000) of MERITAGE HOMES OF CALIFORNIA, INC.

Proof of Service on Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000) of MERITAGE HOMES OF CALIFORNIA, INC.

04/05/2021: Proof of Service on Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000) of MERITAGE HOMES OF CALIFORNIA, INC.

Proof of Service on Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000) of MERITAGE HOMES OF CALIFORNIA, INC.

04/05/2021: Proof of Service on Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000) of MERITAGE HOMES OF CALIFORNIA, INC.

Proof of Service on Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000) of MERITAGE HOMES OF CALIFORNIA, INC.

04/05/2021: Proof of Service on Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000) of MERITAGE HOMES OF CALIFORNIA, INC.

Proof of Service on Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000) of MERITAGE HOMES OF CALIFORNIA, INC.

04/05/2021: Proof of Service on Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000) of MERITAGE HOMES OF CALIFORNIA, INC.

Proof of Service on Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000) of MERITAGE HOMES OF CALIFORNIA, INC.

04/05/2021: Proof of Service on Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000) of MERITAGE HOMES OF CALIFORNIA, INC.

Proof of Service on Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000) of MERITAGE HOMES OF CALIFORNIA, INC.

04/05/2021: Proof of Service on Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000) of MERITAGE HOMES OF CALIFORNIA, INC.

Proof of Service on Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000) of MERITAGE HOMES OF CALIFORNIA, INC.

04/05/2021: Proof of Service on Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000) of MERITAGE HOMES OF CALIFORNIA, INC.

Proof of Service on Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000) of MERITAGE HOMES OF CALIFORNIA, INC.

04/05/2021: Proof of Service on Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000) of MERITAGE HOMES OF CALIFORNIA, INC.

Proof of Service on Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000) of MERITAGE HOMES OF CALIFORNIA, INC.

04/05/2021: Proof of Service on Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000) of MERITAGE HOMES OF CALIFORNIA, INC.

Proof of Service on Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000) of MERITAGE HOMES OF CALIFORNIA, INC.

04/05/2021: Proof of Service on Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000) of MERITAGE HOMES OF CALIFORNIA, INC.

Proof of Service on Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000) of MERITAGE HOMES OF CALIFORNIA, INC.

04/05/2021: Proof of Service on Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000) of MERITAGE HOMES OF CALIFORNIA, INC.

Proof of Service on Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000) of MERITAGE HOMES OF CALIFORNIA, INC.

04/05/2021: Proof of Service on Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000) of MERITAGE HOMES OF CALIFORNIA, INC.

Proof of Service on Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000) of MERITAGE HOMES OF CALIFORNIA, INC.

04/05/2021: Proof of Service on Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000) of MERITAGE HOMES OF CALIFORNIA, INC.

51 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/20/2021
  • HearingType: Case Management Conference - Complex; Judicial Officer: Sunshine Sykes; Location/Courtroom: Department 6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • HearingType: Order to Show Cause as to why sanctions not to exceed $1,500.00 or dismissal should not be imposed for Failure to File Joint Report as to Edward Russell Huguenin, MERITAGE HOMES OF CALIFORNIA, INC.; Judicial Officer: Sunshine Sykes; Location/Courtroom: Department 6; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • HearingType: Case Management Conference - Complex; Judicial Officer: Sunshine Sykes; Location/Courtroom: Department 6; Disposition: Continued Hearing Not Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • HearingType: Court on its Own Motion; Judicial Officer: Sunshine Sykes; Location/Courtroom: Department 6; Disposition: Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Minute Order: Court on its Own Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Fee for eSubmit (SAP 821157); Amount: $2.00; Paid: $2.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 09/15/2021; Fine Description: eSubmit *3011 Receipt No.: 20210915-00102.1; Paid: $2.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Case management statement; Filed By: MERITAGE HOMES OF CALIFORNIA, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Declaration of Jessica L. Moran RE: order to show cause for failure to file joint status report; Filed By: MERITAGE HOMES OF CALIFORNIA, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Request for Dismissal; Filed By: MERITAGE HOMES OF CALIFORNIA, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Request for Dismissal; Filed By: MERITAGE HOMES OF CALIFORNIA, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
61 More Docket Entries
  • 03/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Answer to Complaint on Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000) of MERITAGE HOMES OF CALIFORNIA, INC.; Filed By: FIRE SPRINKLER SYSTEMS, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Additional fee for case designated as complex - Plaintiff (GC70616A); Amount: $1,000.00; Paid: $1,000.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 03/08/2021; Fine Description: eSubmit *3011 Receipt No.: 20210308-00129.1; Paid: $1,000.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Unlimited complaint or other first paper in unlimited civil case amount over $25,000 including UD over $25K, petition for writ of review, mandate, or prohibition; petition for a decree of change of name or gender (GC70611); Amount: $450.00; Paid: $450.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 03/08/2021; Fine Description: eSubmit *3011 Receipt No.: 20210308-00129.1; Paid: $450.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Department Assignment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Summons Issued and Filed; Filed By: MERITAGE HOMES OF CALIFORNIA, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Certificate of Counsel.; Filed By: MERITAGE HOMES OF CALIFORNIA, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Civil Case Cover Sheet (Complex) (CM-010); Filed By: MERITAGE HOMES OF CALIFORNIA, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000); Filed By: MERITAGE HOMES OF CALIFORNIA, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • DocketFilings: Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000) of MERITAGE HOMES OF CALIFORNIA, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TOTAL COMFORT, INC is a litigant

Latest cases where MONTGOMERY KEITH COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where JOSEPH HOLT PLASTERING, INC is a litigant

Latest cases where VINTAGE ROOFING AND SOLAR CO is a litigant