This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 08/24/2023 at 10:05:48 (UTC).

MENDOZA vs CAMILO

Case Summary

On 12/09/2022 MENDOZA filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against CAMILO. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Riverside Historic Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Carol A. Greene. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5343

  • Filing Date:

    12/09/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

Judge Details

Judge

Carol A. Greene

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

OSCAR MENDOZA

Defendants

WILLIAM CAMILO

SAN DIEGO K9 SECURITY AND PROTECTIVE SERVICES

NATIONAL BUSINESS INVESTIGATIONS, INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ESTEBAN ESPINOSA-ULLOA

Defendant Attorneys

WILLIAM T. PASCOE

AARON J FLORES

 

Court Documents

Minute Order: Trial Setting Conference

08/22/2023: Minute Order: Trial Setting Conference

Certificate of Mailing

06/06/2023: Certificate of Mailing

Minute Order: Court on its Own Motion

06/06/2023: Minute Order: Court on its Own Motion

Minute Order: Case Management Conference

06/12/2023: Minute Order: Case Management Conference

Case Management Statement untimely pursuant to CRC 3.725 on Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of OSCAR MENDOZA

05/30/2023: Case Management Statement untimely pursuant to CRC 3.725 on Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of OSCAR MENDOZA

Case Management Statement untimely pursuant to CRC 3.725 on Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of OSCAR MENDOZA

05/30/2023: Case Management Statement untimely pursuant to CRC 3.725 on Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of OSCAR MENDOZA

Answer of National Business Investigations, INC. to Complaint of Oscar Mendoza on Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of OSCAR MENDOZA

05/05/2023: Answer of National Business Investigations, INC. to Complaint of Oscar Mendoza on Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of OSCAR MENDOZA

Answer, General Denial and Affirmative Defenses on Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of OSCAR MENDOZA

04/20/2023: Answer, General Denial and Affirmative Defenses on Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of OSCAR MENDOZA

Notice of Posting Jury Fees. on Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of OSCAR MENDOZA

04/20/2023: Notice of Posting Jury Fees. on Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of OSCAR MENDOZA

Declaration of Reasonable Diligence on Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of OSCAR MENDOZA

03/17/2023: Declaration of Reasonable Diligence on Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of OSCAR MENDOZA

Declaration of Reasonable Diligence on Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of OSCAR MENDOZA

03/17/2023: Declaration of Reasonable Diligence on Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of OSCAR MENDOZA

Declaration of Reasonable Diligence on Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of OSCAR MENDOZA

03/17/2023: Declaration of Reasonable Diligence on Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of OSCAR MENDOZA

Declaration of Reasonable Diligence on Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of OSCAR MENDOZA

03/17/2023: Declaration of Reasonable Diligence on Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of OSCAR MENDOZA

Proof of Service of Summons on Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of OSCAR MENDOZA

03/08/2023: Proof of Service of Summons on Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of OSCAR MENDOZA

Proof of Service on Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of OSCAR MENDOZA

03/08/2023: Proof of Service on Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of OSCAR MENDOZA

Notice of Document Return.

03/08/2023: Notice of Document Return.

Proof of Service on Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of OSCAR MENDOZA

02/02/2023: Proof of Service on Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of OSCAR MENDOZA

Notice of Department Assignment

12/12/2022: Notice of Department Assignment

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/16/2024
  • HearingType: Jury Trial; Judicial Officer: Carol A. Greene; Location/Courtroom: Department 2

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2024
  • HearingType: Trial Readiness Conference; Judicial Officer: Carol A. Greene; Location/Courtroom: Department 2

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2023
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Trial Setting Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/22/2023
  • HearingType: Trial Setting Conference; Judicial Officer: Carol A. Greene; Location/Courtroom: Department 2; Disposition: Held - Other pre-disposition hearing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Minute Order: Trial Setting Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/12/2023
  • HearingType: Case Management Conference; Judicial Officer: Carol A. Greene; Location/Courtroom: Department 2; Disposition: Vacated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Minute Order: Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/06/2023
  • HearingType: Court on its Own Motion; Judicial Officer: Carol A. Greene; Location/Courtroom: Department 2; Disposition: Completed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Certificate of Mailing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Minute Order: Court on its Own Motion

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
25 More Docket Entries
  • 02/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Proof of Service on Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of OSCAR MENDOZA; Filed By: OSCAR MENDOZA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2022
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Unlimited complaint or other first paper in unlimited civil case amount over $25,000 including UD over $25K, petition for writ of review, mandate, or prohibition; petition for a decree of change of name or gender (GC70611); Amount: $450.00; Paid: $450.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 12/12/2022; Fine Description: EFiling Payment Receipt No.: EFM20221212-01823.1; Paid: $450.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2022
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Fee for eFiling; Amount: $1.00; Paid: $1.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 12/12/2022; Fine Description: EFiling Payment Receipt No.: EFM20221212-01823.1; Paid: $1.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Department Assignment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Case Management Conference Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Complaint for Damages; Filed By: OSCAR MENDOZA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: OSCAR MENDOZA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Summons Issued and Filed; Filed By: OSCAR MENDOZA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Certificate of Counsel.; Filed By: OSCAR MENDOZA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2022
  • DocketFilings: Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of OSCAR MENDOZA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less