This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 10/30/2021 at 04:51:54 (UTC).

MELCHOR-BOTELLO vs LOVE 'S COUNTRY STORES OF CALIFORNIA

Case Summary

On 08/20/2021 MELCHOR-BOTELLO filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against LOVE 'S COUNTRY STORES OF CALIFORNIA. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Palm Springs Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4349

  • Filing Date:

    08/20/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MIGUEL MELCHOR-BOTELLO

Defendants

RUBEN EDUARDO URIAS

LOVE 'S COUNTRY STORES OF CALIFORNIA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Arturo Nunez Fierro

Defendant Attorney

RICHARD DUC HOANG

 

Court Documents

Complaint for Auto (Over $25,000)

08/20/2021: Complaint for Auto (Over $25,000)

Civil Case Cover Sheet

08/20/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Certificate of Counsel.

08/20/2021: Certificate of Counsel.

Summons Issued and Filed

08/20/2021: Summons Issued and Filed

Notice of Department Assignment

08/25/2021: Notice of Department Assignment

Notice of Case Management Conference

08/25/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Proof of Service on Complaint for Auto (Over $25,000) of MIGUEL MELCHOR-BOTELLO

09/02/2021: Proof of Service on Complaint for Auto (Over $25,000) of MIGUEL MELCHOR-BOTELLO

Proof of Service on Complaint for Auto (Over $25,000) of MIGUEL MELCHOR-BOTELLO

09/08/2021: Proof of Service on Complaint for Auto (Over $25,000) of MIGUEL MELCHOR-BOTELLO

Answer to Complaint and Demand for Jury Trial on Complaint for Auto (Over $25,000) of MIGUEL MELCHOR-BOTELLO

10/13/2021: Answer to Complaint and Demand for Jury Trial on Complaint for Auto (Over $25,000) of MIGUEL MELCHOR-BOTELLO

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/22/2022
  • HearingType: Case Management Conference; Judicial Officer: Assigned Judge; Location/Courtroom: Department PS2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Unlimited response: answer or other first paper filed by each party other than plaintiff amount over $25,000 including UD; includes response by party to petition for relief in discovery dispute related to out-of-state case (GC70612); Amount: $450.00; Paid: $450.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 10/14/2021; Fine Description: EFiling Payment Receipt No.: EFM20211014-00164.1; Paid: $450.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Unlimited response: answer or other first paper filed by each party other than plaintiff amount over $25,000 including UD; includes response by party to petition for relief in discovery dispute related to out-of-state case (GC70612); Amount: $450.00; Paid: $450.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 10/14/2021; Fine Description: EFiling Payment Receipt No.: EFM20211014-00164.1; Paid: $450.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Answer to Complaint and Demand for Jury Trial on Complaint for Auto (Over $25,000) of MIGUEL MELCHOR-BOTELLO; Filed By: LOVE 'S COUNTRY STORES OF CALIFORNIA; RUBEN EDUARDO URIAS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Fee for eSubmit (SAP 821157); Amount: $2.00; Paid: $2.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 09/16/2021; Fine Description: eSubmit *9090 Receipt No.: 20210916-00602.1; Paid: $2.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Proof of Service on Complaint for Auto (Over $25,000) of MIGUEL MELCHOR-BOTELLO; Filed By: MIGUEL MELCHOR-BOTELLO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Fee for eSubmit (SAP 821157); Amount: $2.00; Paid: $2.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 09/13/2021; Fine Description: eSubmit *9090 Receipt No.: 20210913-00703.1; Paid: $2.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Proof of Service on Complaint for Auto (Over $25,000) of MIGUEL MELCHOR-BOTELLO; Filed By: MIGUEL MELCHOR-BOTELLO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Unlimited complaint or other first paper in unlimited civil case amount over $25,000 including UD over $25K, petition for writ of review, mandate, or prohibition; petition for a decree of change of name or gender (GC70611); Amount: $450.00; Paid: $450.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 08/25/2021; Fine Description: eSubmit *9090 Receipt No.: 20210825-00390.1; Paid: $450.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Department Assignment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Summons Issued and Filed; Filed By: MIGUEL MELCHOR-BOTELLO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Certificate of Counsel.; Filed By: MIGUEL MELCHOR-BOTELLO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: MIGUEL MELCHOR-BOTELLO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Complaint for Auto (Over $25,000); Filed By: MIGUEL MELCHOR-BOTELLO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • DocketFilings: Complaint for Auto (Over $25,000) of MIGUEL MELCHOR-BOTELLO

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LOVE'S COUNTRY STORES OF CALIFONRIA, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HOANG RICHARD D.