This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 12/24/2021 at 07:15:11 (UTC).

MEHRDAD KEVIN ARIANI, M.D. INC. vs BMW OF NORTH AMERICA, LLC

Case Summary

On 12/17/2021 MEHRDAD KEVIN ARIANI, M D INC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against BMW OF NORTH AMERICA, LLC. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Riverside Historic Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5735

  • Filing Date:

    12/17/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

MEHRDAD KEVIN ARIANI, M.D. INC

MEHRDAD KEVIN ARIANI, M.D

Defendants

BMW OF NORTH AMERICA, LLC

BMW FINANCIAL SERVICES NA, LLC

BMW OF RIVERSIDE

BEVERLY HILLS BMW

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ALI MIRHOSSEINI

 

Court Documents

Notice of Department Assignment

12/21/2021: Notice of Department Assignment

Notice of Case Management Conference Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000)

12/21/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000)

Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/17/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons Issued and Filed

12/17/2021: Summons Issued and Filed

Certificate of Counsel.

12/17/2021: Certificate of Counsel.

Plaintiff's Complaint for Damages and Equitable Relief:

12/17/2021: Plaintiff's Complaint for Damages and Equitable Relief:

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/20/2022
  • HearingType: Case Management Conference; Location/Courtroom: Department 10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Unlimited complaint or other first paper in unlimited civil case amount over $25,000 including UD over $25K, petition for writ of review, mandate, or prohibition; petition for a decree of change of name or gender (GC70611); Amount: $450.00; Paid: $450.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 12/21/2021; Fine Description: EFiling Payment Receipt No.: EFM20211221-00727.1; Paid: $450.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Department Assignment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Case Management Conference Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • DocketDEADLINES & REMINDERS; Timestandard: Non-Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint; Expiration Date: 02/15/2022; Status: Active

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: MEHRDAD KEVIN ARIANI, M.D. INC.; MEHRDAD KEVIN ARIANI, M.D.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Summons Issued and Filed; Filed By: MEHRDAD KEVIN ARIANI, M.D. INC.; MEHRDAD KEVIN ARIANI, M.D.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Certificate of Counsel.; Filed By: MEHRDAD KEVIN ARIANI, M.D. INC.; MEHRDAD KEVIN ARIANI, M.D.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Plaintiff's Complaint for Damages and Equitable Relief:; Filed By: MEHRDAD KEVIN ARIANI, M.D. INC.; MEHRDAD KEVIN ARIANI, M.D.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • DocketFilings: Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000) of MEHRDAD KEVIN ARIANI, M.D. INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BMW OF RIVERSIDE is a litigant

Latest cases where BMW FINANCIAL SERVICES NA INC. A DELAWARE CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where BMW OF NORTH AMERICA, LLC is a litigant