This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 09/24/2021 at 18:20:23 (UTC).

MARTIN vs GET AIR OF TEMECULA LLC

Case Summary

On 01/28/2021 MARTIN filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against GET AIR OF TEMECULA LLC. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Murrieta Southwest Justice Center located in Riverside, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Raquel A. Marquez. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0536

  • Filing Date:

    01/28/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

Judge Details

Judge

Raquel A. Marquez

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MARY MARTIN

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

BRE 26201 YNEZ OWNER LLC

GET AIR OF TEMECULA LLC

Defendant and Cross Defendant

GET AIR OF TEMECULA LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Clay Robert Sides

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

MARK D SHIELDS

SCOTT W MONROE

Defendant and Cross Defendant Attorney

SCOTT W MONROE

 

Court Documents

Notice of Change of Address

08/20/2021: Notice of Change of Address

Answer to Complaint on Cross-Complaint of BRE 26201 YNEZ OWNER LLC

08/03/2021: Answer to Complaint on Cross-Complaint of BRE 26201 YNEZ OWNER LLC

Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Responsive Pleading / Request for Entry of Default

07/14/2021: Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Responsive Pleading / Request for Entry of Default

Minute Order: Court on its Own Motion Continues the 7/28/2021 Case Management Conference

07/14/2021: Minute Order: Court on its Own Motion Continues the 7/28/2021 Case Management Conference

Clerk's Certificate of Mailing re: Minute Order dated 7/14/2021

07/14/2021: Clerk's Certificate of Mailing re: Minute Order dated 7/14/2021

Notice of Posting Jury Fees. on Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of MARY MARTIN

07/12/2021: Notice of Posting Jury Fees. on Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of MARY MARTIN

Case Management Statement on Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of MARY MARTIN

07/12/2021: Case Management Statement on Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of MARY MARTIN

Proof of Service on Cross-Complaint of BRE 26201 YNEZ OWNER LLC

06/25/2021: Proof of Service on Cross-Complaint of BRE 26201 YNEZ OWNER LLC

Summons Issued and Filed

06/18/2021: Summons Issued and Filed

Cross-Complaint

06/18/2021: Cross-Complaint

Demand for Jury Trial

06/18/2021: Demand for Jury Trial

Answer to Complaint on Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of MARY MARTIN

06/18/2021: Answer to Complaint on Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of MARY MARTIN

Proof of Service on Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of MARY MARTIN

05/19/2021: Proof of Service on Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of MARY MARTIN

Proof of Service on Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of MARY MARTIN

05/18/2021: Proof of Service on Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of MARY MARTIN

Amendment to Complaint/Cross Complaint Incorrect Name of GET AIR TRAMPOLINE PARKS on Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of MARY MARTIN

02/23/2021: Amendment to Complaint/Cross Complaint Incorrect Name of GET AIR TRAMPOLINE PARKS on Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of MARY MARTIN

Notice of Case Management Conference

01/28/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Notice of Department Assignment

01/28/2021: Notice of Department Assignment

Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000)

01/28/2021: Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000)

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/03/2022
  • HearingType: Order to Show Cause as to why sanctions not to exceed $1,500.00 or dismissal should not be imposed for Failure to File Responsive Pleading / Request for Entry of Default as to BRE 26201 YNEZ OWNER LLC, MARK D SHIELDS; Judicial Officer: Raquel A. Marquez; Location/Courtroom: Department S303

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2022
  • HearingType: Case Management Conference; Judicial Officer: Raquel A. Marquez; Location/Courtroom: Department S303

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Notice of Change of Address; Filed By: GET AIR OF TEMECULA LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Answer to Complaint on Cross-Complaint of BRE 26201 YNEZ OWNER LLC; Filed By: GET AIR OF TEMECULA LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • HearingType: Case Management Conference; Judicial Officer: Raquel A. Marquez; Location/Courtroom: Department S303; Disposition: Continued Hearing Not Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • HearingType: Court on its Own Motion Continues the 7/28/2021 Case Management Conference; Judicial Officer: Raquel A. Marquez; Location/Courtroom: Department S303; Disposition: Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Responsive Pleading / Request for Entry of Default

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Minute Order: Court on its Own Motion Continues the 7/28/2021 Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Clerk's Certificate of Mailing re: Minute Order dated 7/14/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Jury Fee Deposit; Amount: $150.00; Paid: $150.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 07/12/2021; Fine Description: EFiling Payment Receipt No.: EFM20210712-00582.1; Paid: $150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
16 More Docket Entries
  • 02/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Amendment to Complaint/Cross Complaint Incorrect Name of GET AIR TRAMPOLINE PARKS on Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of MARY MARTIN; Filed By: MARY MARTIN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketStatus: Receive and Forward; Description: Amendment; Filed By: MARY MARTIN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Unlimited complaint or other first paper in unlimited civil case amount over $25,000 including UD over $25K, petition for writ of review, mandate, or prohibition; petition for a decree of change of name or gender (GC70611); Amount: $450.00; Paid: $450.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 01/28/2021; Fine Description: eSubmit *7517 Receipt No.: 20210128-00755.1; Paid: $450.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Department Assignment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Summons Issued and Filed; Filed By: MARY MARTIN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Certificate of Counsel.; Filed By: MARY MARTIN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: MARY MARTIN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000); Filed By: MARY MARTIN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • DocketFilings: Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of MARY MARTIN

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer SIDES CLAY R. ESQ.