This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 08/20/2023 at 11:03:07 (UTC).

MARROQUIN vs NUNEZ MORA

Case Summary

On 03/23/2023 MARROQUIN filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against NUNEZ MORA. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Riverside Historic Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Christopher B. Harmon. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1476

  • Filing Date:

    03/23/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

Judge Details

Judge

Christopher B. Harmon

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

PAOLA MARROQUIN

SANDRA MARROQUIN

Defendants

GI TRUCKING

ESTES EXPRESS LINES

MATHEW NUNEZ MORA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DARLENE TREVINO

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT - Personal Injury, Property Damage, Wrongful Death

03/23/2023: COMPLAINT - Personal Injury, Property Damage, Wrongful Death

Summons Issued and Filed

03/23/2023: Summons Issued and Filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet

03/23/2023: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Certificate of Counsel.

03/23/2023: Certificate of Counsel.

Notice of Case Management Conference Complaint for Auto (Over $25,000)

03/23/2023: Notice of Case Management Conference Complaint for Auto (Over $25,000)

Notice of Department Assignment

03/23/2023: Notice of Department Assignment

Notice of Reassignment of Department for All Purposes on Complaint for Auto (Over $25,000) of SANDRA MARROQUIN

05/17/2023: Notice of Reassignment of Department for All Purposes on Complaint for Auto (Over $25,000) of SANDRA MARROQUIN

Amended Notice of Case Reassignment for All Purposes (Department 10)

06/08/2023: Amended Notice of Case Reassignment for All Purposes (Department 10)

Notice of Reassignment of Department for All Purposes on Complaint for Auto (Over $25,000) of SANDRA MARROQUIN

07/27/2023: Notice of Reassignment of Department for All Purposes on Complaint for Auto (Over $25,000) of SANDRA MARROQUIN

 

Docket Entries

09/19/2023

HearingType: Case Management Conference; Judicial Officer: Christopher B. Harmon; Location/Courtroom: Department 10

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/27/2023
View Court Documents

DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Reassignment of Department for All Purposes on Complaint for Auto (Over $25,000) of SANDRA MARROQUIN

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/08/2023
View Court Documents

DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Amended Notice of Case Reassignment for All Purposes (Department 10)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/17/2023
View Court Documents

DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Reassignment of Department for All Purposes on Complaint for Auto (Over $25,000) of SANDRA MARROQUIN

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/23/2023

FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Unlimited complaint or other first paper in unlimited civil case amount over $25,000 including UD over $25K, petition for writ of review, mandate, or prohibition; petition for a decree of change of name or gender (GC70611); Amount: $450.00; Paid: $450.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 03/23/2023; Fine Description: EFiling Payment Receipt No.: EFM20230323-01197.1; Paid: $450.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/23/2023

FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Fee for eFiling; Amount: $1.00; Paid: $1.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 03/23/2023; Fine Description: EFiling Payment Receipt No.: EFM20230323-01197.1; Paid: $1.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/23/2023
View Court Documents

DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Department Assignment

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/23/2023
View Court Documents

DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Case Management Conference Complaint for Auto (Over $25,000)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/23/2023
View Court Documents

DocketStatus: Filed; Description: COMPLAINT - Personal Injury, Property Damage, Wrongful Death; Filed By: SANDRA MARROQUIN; PAOLA MARROQUIN

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/23/2023
View Court Documents

DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Summons Issued and Filed; Filed By: SANDRA MARROQUIN; PAOLA MARROQUIN

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/23/2023
View Court Documents

DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: SANDRA MARROQUIN; PAOLA MARROQUIN

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/23/2023
View Court Documents

DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Certificate of Counsel.; Filed By: SANDRA MARROQUIN; PAOLA MARROQUIN

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/23/2023

DocketFilings: Complaint for Auto (Over $25,000) of SANDRA MARROQUIN

[+] Read More [-] Read Less