This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 11/21/2022 at 21:01:00 (UTC).

MARIN vs SUK YI DIANA KWAN

Case Summary

On 02/15/2022 MARIN filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against SUK YI DIANA KWAN. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Moreno Valley Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The Judge overseeing this case is David E. Gregory. The case status is Not Yet Classified.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0889

  • Filing Date:

    02/15/2022

  • Case Status:

    Not Yet Classified

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

Judge Details

Judge

David E. Gregory

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AARON T MARIN

Defendants

SUK YI DIANA KWAN

CARZONE

M&N FINANCING CORPORATION

WESTERN SURETY COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

THE SADR LAW FIRM, APLC

Attorney at THE SADR LAW FIRM, APLC

Defendant Attorneys

LAW OFFICE OF MICHAEL GELLER INC.

ANDERSON, MCPHARLIN & CONNERS LLP

Attorney at ANDERSON, MCPHARLIN & CONNERS LLP

 

Court Documents

Complaint for Other Contract (Over $10,000 does not exceed $25,000)

02/15/2022: Complaint for Other Contract (Over $10,000 does not exceed $25,000)

Certificate of Mailing

11/18/2022: Certificate of Mailing

Minute Order: Court on its Own Motion

11/18/2022: Minute Order: Court on its Own Motion

Notice of Court Ordered Mediation

11/17/2022: Notice of Court Ordered Mediation

Minute Order: Trial Setting Conference - Limited Civil

11/14/2022: Minute Order: Trial Setting Conference - Limited Civil

Substitution of Attorney

10/24/2022: Substitution of Attorney

Minute Order: Trial Setting Conference - Limited Civil

08/15/2022: Minute Order: Trial Setting Conference - Limited Civil

Request for Entry of Default (CIV-100) on Complaint for Other Contract (Over $10,000 does not exceed $25,000) of AARON T MARIN

06/28/2022: Request for Entry of Default (CIV-100) on Complaint for Other Contract (Over $10,000 does not exceed $25,000) of AARON T MARIN

Clerk's Certificate of Mailing Nunc Pro Tunc - Answer on Complaint for Other Contract (Over $10,000 does not exceed $25,000) of AARON T MARIN

07/26/2022: Clerk's Certificate of Mailing Nunc Pro Tunc - Answer on Complaint for Other Contract (Over $10,000 does not exceed $25,000) of AARON T MARIN

Corrected Nunc Pro Tunc Answer on Complaint for Other Contract (Over $10,000 does not exceed $25,000) of AARON T MARIN

07/26/2022: Corrected Nunc Pro Tunc Answer on Complaint for Other Contract (Over $10,000 does not exceed $25,000) of AARON T MARIN

Minute Order: Nunc Pro Tunc Hearing

07/26/2022: Minute Order: Nunc Pro Tunc Hearing

Clerk's Certificate of Mailing Nunc Pro Tunc - Answer to Complaint on Complaint for Other Contract (Over $10,000 does not exceed $25,000) of AARON T MARIN

07/26/2022: Clerk's Certificate of Mailing Nunc Pro Tunc - Answer to Complaint on Complaint for Other Contract (Over $10,000 does not exceed $25,000) of AARON T MARIN

Clerk's Certificate of Mailing Nunc Pro Tunc - Answer to Complaint on Complaint for Other Contract (Over $10,000 does not exceed $25,000) of AARON T MARIN

07/26/2022: Clerk's Certificate of Mailing Nunc Pro Tunc - Answer to Complaint on Complaint for Other Contract (Over $10,000 does not exceed $25,000) of AARON T MARIN

Corrected Nunc Pro Tunc Answer to Complaint on Complaint for Other Contract (Over $10,000 does not exceed $25,000) of AARON T MARIN

07/26/2022: Corrected Nunc Pro Tunc Answer to Complaint on Complaint for Other Contract (Over $10,000 does not exceed $25,000) of AARON T MARIN

Minute Order: Nunc Pro Tunc Hearing

07/26/2022: Minute Order: Nunc Pro Tunc Hearing

Proof of Service on Complaint for Other Contract (Over $10,000 does not exceed $25,000) of AARON T MARIN

05/03/2022: Proof of Service on Complaint for Other Contract (Over $10,000 does not exceed $25,000) of AARON T MARIN

Proof of Service on Complaint for Other Contract (Over $10,000 does not exceed $25,000) of AARON T MARIN

05/03/2022: Proof of Service on Complaint for Other Contract (Over $10,000 does not exceed $25,000) of AARON T MARIN

Notice of Document Return.

05/03/2022: Notice of Document Return.

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/24/2023
  • HearingType: Trial Setting Conference; Judicial Officer: David E. Gregory; Location/Courtroom: Department MV1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • HearingType: Court on its Own Motion; Judicial Officer: David E. Gregory; Location/Courtroom: Department MV1; Disposition: Completed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Certificate of Mailing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Minute Order: Court on its Own Motion

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Court Ordered Mediation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • HearingType: Trial Setting Conference - Limited Civil; Judicial Officer: David E. Gregory; Location/Courtroom: Department MV1; Disposition: Held - Other pre-disposition hearing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Minute Order: Trial Setting Conference - Limited Civil

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/2022
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Fee for eFiling; Amount: $1.00; Paid: $1.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 10/31/2022; Fine Description: EFiling Payment Receipt No.: EFM20221031-01462.1; Paid: $1.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Substitution of Attorney

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2022
  • HearingType: Trial Setting Conference - Limited Civil; Judicial Officer: David E. Gregory; Location/Courtroom: Department MV1; Disposition: Continued Not Held - Court's Motion - Hearing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
22 More Docket Entries
  • 05/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Proof of Service on Complaint for Other Contract (Over $10,000 does not exceed $25,000) of AARON T MARIN; Filed By: AARON T MARIN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/29/2022
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Fee for eFiling; Amount: $1.00; Paid: $1.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 03/29/2022; Fine Description: EFiling Payment Receipt No.: EFM20220329-00584.1; Paid: $1.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/29/2022
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Limited complaint or other first paper amount over $10,000 up to $25,000 (GC70613A); Amount: $395.00; Paid: $395.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 03/29/2022; Fine Description: EFiling Payment Receipt No.: EFM20220329-00584.1; Paid: $395.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Trial Setting Conference - Limited Civil Complaint for Other Contract (Over $10,000 does not exceed $25,000) on Complaint for Other Contract (Over $10,000 does not exceed $25,000) of AARON T MARIN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Department Assignment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Certificate of Counsel.; Filed By: AARON T MARIN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Summons Issued and Filed; Filed By: AARON T MARIN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: AARON T MARIN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Complaint for Other Contract (Over $10,000 does not exceed $25,000); Filed By: AARON T MARIN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2022
  • DocketFilings: Complaint for Other Contract (Over $10,000 does not exceed $25,000) of AARON T MARIN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where M&N FINANCING CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where Western Surety Company is a litigant