This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 08/19/2023 at 12:01:52 (UTC).

MAHER vs FRONTIER COMMUNICATIONS OF AMERICA, INC.

Case Summary

On 12/28/2022 MAHER filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against FRONTIER COMMUNICATIONS OF AMERICA, INC. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Palm Springs Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Manuel Bustamante. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5002

  • Filing Date:

    12/28/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

Judge Details

Judge

Manuel Bustamante

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

PATRICK E. MAHER

KIMBERELY L. MAHER

KIMBERLY L. MAHER

Cross Plaintiff and Defendant

FRONTIER COMMUNICATIONS OF AMERICA, INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF ALAN M. HORWITZ

Cross Plaintiff and Defendant Attorney

FLOYD SKEREN MANUKIAN LANGEVIN, LLP

 

Court Documents

Case Management Statement on Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of PATRICK E. MAHER

08/15/2023: Case Management Statement on Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of PATRICK E. MAHER

Declaration of MICHAEL D. PETERSON IN SUPPORT OF SETTING ASIDE SANTIONS

07/26/2023: Declaration of MICHAEL D. PETERSON IN SUPPORT OF SETTING ASIDE SANTIONS

Declaration of Alan M. Horwitz Esq ISO Request to Remove Sanctions - HRG 9/18/23

07/18/2023: Declaration of Alan M. Horwitz Esq ISO Request to Remove Sanctions - HRG 9/18/23

Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to meet and confer and file complete case management statement as required by CRC 3.724 and CRC 3.725

07/07/2023: Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to meet and confer and file complete case management statement as required by CRC 3.724 and CRC 3.725

Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to file a request for entry of default on cross complaint pursuant to CCP 432.10 & CRC 3.110(g)

07/07/2023: Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to file a request for entry of default on cross complaint pursuant to CCP 432.10 & CRC 3.110(g)

Certificate of Mailing

07/07/2023: Certificate of Mailing

Minute Order: Court on its Own Motion

07/07/2023: Minute Order: Court on its Own Motion

Notice of Remote Appearance for Hearing on Throughout the case on Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of PATRICK E. MAHER

06/27/2023: Notice of Remote Appearance for Hearing on Throughout the case on Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of PATRICK E. MAHER

Case Management Statement untimely pursuant to CRC 3.725 on Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of PATRICK E. MAHER

06/26/2023: Case Management Statement untimely pursuant to CRC 3.725 on Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of PATRICK E. MAHER

Case Management Statement on Cross-Complaint of FRONTIER COMMUNICATIONS OF AMERICA, INC.

06/23/2023: Case Management Statement on Cross-Complaint of FRONTIER COMMUNICATIONS OF AMERICA, INC.

Defendant's Answer to Plaintiff's Unverified Complaint on Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of PATRICK E. MAHER

04/03/2023: Defendant's Answer to Plaintiff's Unverified Complaint on Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of PATRICK E. MAHER

Notice of Ruling on Defendant/Cross Complaints Motion to Strike Punitive Damages on Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of PATRICK E. MAHER

03/22/2023: Notice of Ruling on Defendant/Cross Complaints Motion to Strike Punitive Damages on Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of PATRICK E. MAHER

Clerk's Certificate of Mailing on Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of PATRICK E. MAHER

03/21/2023: Clerk's Certificate of Mailing on Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of PATRICK E. MAHER

Minute Order: Hearing re: Motion to Strike Complaint on Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of PATRICK E. MAHER by FRONTIER COMMUNICATIONS OF AMERICA, INC.

03/21/2023: Minute Order: Hearing re: Motion to Strike Complaint on Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of PATRICK E. MAHER by FRONTIER COMMUNICATIONS OF AMERICA, INC.

Frontier Communiciations of America, Inc's Reply to Plaintiff's Motion to Strike Punitive Damages Allegations from Plaintiff's Complaint on Cross-Complaint of FRONTIER COMMUNICATIONS OF AMERICA, INC.

03/03/2023: Frontier Communiciations of America, Inc's Reply to Plaintiff's Motion to Strike Punitive Damages Allegations from Plaintiff's Complaint on Cross-Complaint of FRONTIER COMMUNICATIONS OF AMERICA, INC.

Opposition to Motion to Strike Punitive Damages - HRG 3/21/23 on Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of PATRICK E. MAHER

02/28/2023: Opposition to Motion to Strike Punitive Damages - HRG 3/21/23 on Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of PATRICK E. MAHER

Summons Issued and Filed

02/07/2023: Summons Issued and Filed

Frontier Communications of America, INC.'s Cross-Complaint

02/07/2023: Frontier Communications of America, INC.'s Cross-Complaint

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/18/2023
  • HearingType: Case Management Conference; Judicial Officer: Manuel Bustamante; Location/Courtroom: Department PS2

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/18/2023
  • HearingType: Order to Show Cause as to why sanctions not to exceed $1,500.00 or dismissal should not be imposed for Failure to meet and confer and file complete case management statement as required by CRC 3.724 and CRC 3.725 as to LAW OFFICES OF ALAN M. HORWITZ; Judicial Officer: Manuel Bustamante; Location/Courtroom: Department PS2

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/18/2023
  • HearingType: Order to Show Cause as to why sanctions not to exceed $1,500.00 or dismissal should not be imposed for Failure to file a request for entry of default on cross complaint pursuant to CCP 432.10 & CRC 3.110(g) as to FLOYD SKEREN MANUKIAN LANGEVIN, LLP; Judicial Officer: Manuel Bustamante; Location/Courtroom: Department PS2

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2023
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Fee for eFiling; Amount: $1.00; Paid: $1.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 08/15/2023; Fine Description: EFiling Payment Receipt No.: EFM20230815-02298.1; Paid: $1.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Case Management Statement on Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of PATRICK E. MAHER; Filed By: PATRICK E. MAHER; KIMBERELY L. MAHER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/26/2023
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Fee for eFiling; Amount: $1.00; Paid: $1.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 07/26/2023; Fine Description: Exempt Receipt No.: EFM20230726-01575.1; Paid: $1.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Declaration of MICHAEL D. PETERSON IN SUPPORT OF SETTING ASIDE SANTIONS; Filed By: FRONTIER COMMUNICATIONS OF AMERICA, INC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/18/2023
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Fee for eFiling; Amount: $1.00; Paid: $1.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 07/18/2023; Fine Description: EFiling Payment Receipt No.: EFM20230718-01140.1; Paid: $1.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/18/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Declaration of Alan M. Horwitz Esq ISO Request to Remove Sanctions - HRG 9/18/23; Filed By: PATRICK E. MAHER; KIMBERELY L. MAHER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/10/2023
  • HearingType: Case Management Conference; Judicial Officer: Manuel Bustamante; Location/Courtroom: Department PS2; Disposition: Continued Hearing Not Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
33 More Docket Entries
  • 01/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Proof of Service on Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of PATRICK E. MAHER; Filed By: PATRICK E. MAHER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Fee for eFiling; Amount: $1.00; Paid: $1.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 01/09/2023; Fine Description: EFiling Payment Receipt No.: EFM20230109-00467.1; Paid: $1.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Unlimited complaint or other first paper in unlimited civil case amount over $25,000 including UD over $25K, petition for writ of review, mandate, or prohibition; petition for a decree of change of name or gender (GC70611); Amount: $450.00; Paid: $450.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 01/09/2023; Fine Description: EFiling Payment Receipt No.: EFM20230109-00467.1; Paid: $450.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Department Assignment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Case Management Conference Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Complaint for Damages: General Negligence; Trespass to Chattels; Filed By: PATRICK E. MAHER; KIMBERELY L. MAHER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: PATRICK E. MAHER; KIMBERELY L. MAHER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Certificate of Counsel.; Filed By: PATRICK E. MAHER; KIMBERELY L. MAHER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Summons Issued and Filed; Filed By: PATRICK E. MAHER; KIMBERELY L. MAHER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2022
  • DocketFilings: Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of PATRICK E. MAHER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less