This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 11/01/2021 at 16:59:33 (UTC).

MAGNUSON vs BRADLEY

Case Summary

On 01/11/2021 MAGNUSON filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against BRADLEY. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Murrieta Southwest Justice Center located in Riverside, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Angel M. Bermudez. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0094

  • Filing Date:

    01/11/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

Judge Details

Judge

Angel M. Bermudez

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

MAUREEN MAGNUSON

MEGAN MAGNUSON

Defendant

RONALD EDGAR BRADLEY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Joseph John Nazarian KEVIN RICHARD JOLLY

Defendant Attorney

LYNNE PEARSON HOURY

 

Court Documents

Notice of Change of Handling Attorney on 1st Amended Complaint for Auto (Over $25,000) of MEGAN MAGNUSON

10/21/2021: Notice of Change of Handling Attorney on 1st Amended Complaint for Auto (Over $25,000) of MEGAN MAGNUSON

Case Management Statement on 1st Amended Complaint for Auto (Over $25,000) of MEGAN MAGNUSON

10/18/2021: Case Management Statement on 1st Amended Complaint for Auto (Over $25,000) of MEGAN MAGNUSON

Notice of Demurrer and Demurrer to Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint on 1st Amended Complaint for Auto (Over $25,000) of MEGAN MAGNUSON

10/15/2021: Notice of Demurrer and Demurrer to Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint on 1st Amended Complaint for Auto (Over $25,000) of MEGAN MAGNUSON

Certificate of Mailing

07/12/2021: Certificate of Mailing

1st Amended Complaint for Auto (Over $25,000) of MEGAN MAGNUSON

09/15/2021: 1st Amended Complaint for Auto (Over $25,000) of MEGAN MAGNUSON

Minute Order: Hearing re: Demurrer on Complaint for Auto (Over $25,000) of MEGAN MAGNUSON by RONALD EDGAR BRADLEY

09/08/2021: Minute Order: Hearing re: Demurrer on Complaint for Auto (Over $25,000) of MEGAN MAGNUSON by RONALD EDGAR BRADLEY

Reply in Support of Demurrer by Defendant Ronald Edgar Bradley on Complaint for Auto (Over $25,000) of MEGAN MAGNUSON

08/31/2021: Reply in Support of Demurrer by Defendant Ronald Edgar Bradley on Complaint for Auto (Over $25,000) of MEGAN MAGNUSON

Notice of Telephonic Appearance for Hearing

08/25/2021: Notice of Telephonic Appearance for Hearing

Opposition to Defendant's Demurrer to the Complaint on Complaint for Auto (Over $25,000) of MEGAN MAGNUSON

08/19/2021: Opposition to Defendant's Demurrer to the Complaint on Complaint for Auto (Over $25,000) of MEGAN MAGNUSON

Certificate of Mailing

08/06/2021: Certificate of Mailing

Minute Order: Court on its Own Motion

08/06/2021: Minute Order: Court on its Own Motion

Demurrer on Complaint for Auto (Over $25,000) of MEGAN MAGNUSON

07/28/2021: Demurrer on Complaint for Auto (Over $25,000) of MEGAN MAGNUSON

Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to timely file proof of service on complaint pursuant to CRC 3.110(b & f)

07/14/2021: Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to timely file proof of service on complaint pursuant to CRC 3.110(b & f)

Certificate of Mailing

07/14/2021: Certificate of Mailing

Minute Order: Court on its Own Motion

07/14/2021: Minute Order: Court on its Own Motion

Association of Counsel on Complaint for Auto (Over $25,000) of MEGAN MAGNUSON

07/01/2021: Association of Counsel on Complaint for Auto (Over $25,000) of MEGAN MAGNUSON

Minute Order: Case Management Conference

07/12/2021: Minute Order: Case Management Conference

Notice of Case Management Conference

01/12/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

11/17/2021

HearingType: Hearing re: Demurrer on 1st Amended Complaint for Auto (Over $25,000) of MEGAN MAGNUSON by RONALD EDGAR BRADLEY; Judicial Officer: Angel M. Bermudez; Location/Courtroom: Department S302

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/16/2021

HearingType: Order to Show Cause as to why sanctions not to exceed $1,500.00 or dismissal should not be imposed for Failure to timely file proof of service on complaint pursuant to CRC 3.110(b & f) as to Joseph John Nazarian, MEGAN MAGNUSON, MAUREEN MAGNUSON; Judicial Officer: Angel M. Bermudez; Location/Courtroom: Department S302

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/16/2021

HearingType: Case Management Conference; Judicial Officer: Angel M. Bermudez; Location/Courtroom: Department S302

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/21/2021
View Court Documents

DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Notice of Change of Handling Attorney on 1st Amended Complaint for Auto (Over $25,000) of MEGAN MAGNUSON

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/19/2021

FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Motion, application (including ex parte) or any other paper requiring a hearing subsequent to the first paper filing (70617A); Amount: $60.00; Paid: $60.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 10/19/2021; Fine Description: EFiling Payment Receipt No.: EFM20211019-00485.1; Paid: $60.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/18/2021
View Court Documents

DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Case Management Statement on 1st Amended Complaint for Auto (Over $25,000) of MEGAN MAGNUSON; Filed By: MEGAN MAGNUSON; MAUREEN MAGNUSON

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/15/2021
View Court Documents

DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Notice of Demurrer and Demurrer to Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint on 1st Amended Complaint for Auto (Over $25,000) of MEGAN MAGNUSON; Filed By: RONALD EDGAR BRADLEY

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/23/2021

HearingType: Order to Show Cause as to why sanctions not to exceed $1,500.00 or dismissal should not be imposed for Failure to timely file proof of service on complaint pursuant to CRC 3.110(b & f) as to Joseph John Nazarian, MEGAN MAGNUSON, MAUREEN MAGNUSON; Judicial Officer: Angel M. Bermudez; Location/Courtroom: Department S302; Disposition: Continued Hearing Not Held

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/23/2021

HearingType: Case Management Conference; Judicial Officer: Angel M. Bermudez; Location/Courtroom: Department S302; Disposition: Continued Hearing Not Held

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/15/2021
View Court Documents

DocketStatus: Filed; Description: 1st Amended Complaint for Auto (Over $25,000) of MEGAN MAGNUSON; Filed By: MEGAN MAGNUSON; MAUREEN MAGNUSON

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
18 More Docket Entries
07/12/2021
View Court Documents

DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Minute Order: Case Management Conference

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/01/2021
View Court Documents

DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Association of Counsel on Complaint for Auto (Over $25,000) of MEGAN MAGNUSON

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/22/2021

DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Certificate of Mailing

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/12/2021

FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Unlimited complaint or other first paper in unlimited civil case amount over $25,000 including UD over $25K, petition for writ of review, mandate, or prohibition; petition for a decree of change of name or gender (GC70611); Amount: $450.00; Paid: $450.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 01/12/2021; Fine Description: eSubmit *6009 Receipt No.: 20210112-00026.1; Paid: $450.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/12/2021
View Court Documents

DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Case Management Conference

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/12/2021
View Court Documents

DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Department Assignment

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/11/2021
View Court Documents

DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Summons Issued and Filed; Filed By: MEGAN MAGNUSON; MAUREEN MAGNUSON

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/11/2021
View Court Documents

DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Certificate of Counsel.; Filed By: MEGAN MAGNUSON; MAUREEN MAGNUSON

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/11/2021
View Court Documents

DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: MEGAN MAGNUSON; MAUREEN MAGNUSON

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/11/2021
View Court Documents

DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Complaint for Auto (Over $25,000); Filed By: MEGAN MAGNUSON; MAUREEN MAGNUSON

[+] Read More [-] Read Less