This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 10/27/2022 at 00:36:01 (UTC).

MACGREGOR vs BOGAN

Case Summary

On 10/24/2022 MACGREGOR filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against BOGAN. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Riverside Historic Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The Judge overseeing this case is O.G. Magno. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4642

  • Filing Date:

    10/24/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

Judge Details

Judge

O.G. Magno

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GEORGE THOMAS MACGREGOR

Defendants

DAVID MONROE BOGAN

HP COMMUNICATIONS, INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JIMMY T. NGUYEN

 

Court Documents

Complaint for Auto (Over $25,000)

10/24/2022: Complaint for Auto (Over $25,000)

Certificate of Counsel.

10/24/2022: Certificate of Counsel.

Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/24/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons Issued and Filed

10/24/2022: Summons Issued and Filed

Notice of Case Management Conference Complaint for Auto (Over $25,000)

10/26/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference Complaint for Auto (Over $25,000)

Notice of Department Assignment

10/26/2022: Notice of Department Assignment

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/24/2023
  • HearingType: Case Management Conference; Judicial Officer: O.G. Magno; Location/Courtroom: Department 7

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2022
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Unlimited complaint or other first paper in unlimited civil case amount over $25,000 including UD over $25K, petition for writ of review, mandate, or prohibition; petition for a decree of change of name or gender (GC70611); Amount: $450.00; Paid: $450.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 10/26/2022; Fine Description: EFiling Payment Receipt No.: EFM20221026-01803.1; Paid: $450.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2022
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Fee for eFiling; Amount: $1.00; Paid: $1.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 10/26/2022; Fine Description: EFiling Payment Receipt No.: EFM20221026-01803.1; Paid: $1.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Department Assignment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Case Management Conference Complaint for Auto (Over $25,000)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/24/2022
  • DocketDEADLINES & REMINDERS; Timestandard: Non-Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint; Expiration Date: 12/23/2022; Status: Active

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Summons Issued and Filed; Filed By: GEORGE THOMAS MACGREGOR

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: GEORGE THOMAS MACGREGOR

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Certificate of Counsel.; Filed By: GEORGE THOMAS MACGREGOR

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Complaint for Auto (Over $25,000); Filed By: GEORGE THOMAS MACGREGOR

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/24/2022
  • DocketFilings: Complaint for Auto (Over $25,000) of GEORGE THOMAS MACGREGOR

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less