Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 07/15/2021 at 08:24:26 (UTC).

MABRY vs BAKER

Case Summary

On 05/20/2021 MABRY filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against BAKER. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Blythe Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Russell L Moore. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0128

  • Filing Date:

    05/20/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Riverside County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Blythe Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

Judge Details

Judge

Russell L Moore

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Minors

KEVIN ALONZO MABRY, JR

TERRELL LOUIS ANDERSON

MARLIYAH GOODWIN

Defendants

MERCHANTS AUTOMOTIVE GROUP, INC

USA EXPRESS LEGAL & INVESTIGATIVE SERVICES

BRIAN ROSHAWN BAKER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Minor Attorney

Camm Sublette

 

Court Documents

Application and Order for Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem on Complaint for Auto (Over $25,000) of KEVIN ALONZO MABRY, JR

05/27/2021: Application and Order for Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem on Complaint for Auto (Over $25,000) of KEVIN ALONZO MABRY, JR

Summons Issued and Filed

05/20/2021: Summons Issued and Filed

Certificate of Counsel.

05/20/2021: Certificate of Counsel.

Civil Case Cover Sheet

05/20/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint for Auto (Over $25,000)

05/20/2021: Complaint for Auto (Over $25,000)

Notice of Case Management Conference

05/27/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Notice of Department Assignment

05/27/2021: Notice of Department Assignment

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/03/2021
  • HearingType: Case Management Conference; Judicial Officer: Russell L Moore; Location/Courtroom: Department 260

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Unlimited complaint or other first paper in unlimited civil case amount over $25,000 including UD over $25K, petition for writ of review, mandate, or prohibition; petition for a decree of change of name or gender (GC70611); Amount: $450.00; Paid: $450.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 05/27/2021; Fine Description: Check #401780 Receipt No.: 20210527-00536.1; Paid: $450.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Department Assignment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Application and Order for Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem on Complaint for Auto (Over $25,000) of KEVIN ALONZO MABRY, JR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • DocketStatus: Receive and Forward; Description: Application and Order for Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem-Civil; Filed By: KEVIN ALONZO MABRY, JR; TERRELL LOUIS ANDERSON; MARLIYAH GOODWIN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • DocketDEADLINES & REMINDERS; Timestandard: Non-Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint; Expiration Date: 07/19/2021; Status: Active

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Summons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Certificate of Counsel.; Filed By: KEVIN ALONZO MABRY, JR; TERRELL LOUIS ANDERSON; MARLIYAH GOODWIN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: KEVIN ALONZO MABRY, JR; TERRELL LOUIS ANDERSON; MARLIYAH GOODWIN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Complaint for Auto (Over $25,000); Filed By: KEVIN ALONZO MABRY, JR; TERRELL LOUIS ANDERSON; MARLIYAH GOODWIN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • DocketFilings: Complaint for Auto (Over $25,000) of KEVIN ALONZO MABRY, JR

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Merchants Automotive Group, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where USA EXPRESS LEGAL INVESTIGATIVE SERVICE INC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SUBLETTE CAMM