This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 10/30/2021 at 15:53:03 (UTC).

LUNA vs ALBERTSONS

Case Summary

On 02/23/2021 LUNA filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against ALBERTSONS. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Riverside Historic Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Craig Riemer. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0974

  • Filing Date:

    02/23/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

Judge Details

Judge

Craig Riemer

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ALEJANDRA LUNA

Defendants

ABS CA-O LLC

ALBERTSONS

ALBERTSONS COMPANIES INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Gerald Lee Marcus

 

Court Documents

Summons Issued and Filed

02/23/2021: Summons Issued and Filed

Certificate of Counsel.

02/23/2021: Certificate of Counsel.

Civil Case Cover Sheet

02/23/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES

02/23/2021: COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES

Notice of Department Assignment

03/02/2021: Notice of Department Assignment

Notice of Case Management Conference

03/02/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Proof of Service on Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of ALEJANDRA LUNA

04/28/2021: Proof of Service on Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of ALEJANDRA LUNA

Proof of Service of Summons on Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of ALEJANDRA LUNA

05/05/2021: Proof of Service of Summons on Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of ALEJANDRA LUNA

Minute Order: Court on its Own Motion

08/18/2021: Minute Order: Court on its Own Motion

Certificate of Mailing

08/18/2021: Certificate of Mailing

Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to timely request entry of default of all defendants who have been served but have not filed a response (CRC 3.110(g))

08/18/2021: Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to timely request entry of default of all defendants who have been served but have not filed a response (CRC 3.110(g))

Request for Dismissal

08/26/2021: Request for Dismissal

Minute Order: Case Management Conference

08/30/2021: Minute Order: Case Management Conference

Proof of Service on Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of ALEJANDRA LUNA

04/28/2021: Proof of Service on Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of ALEJANDRA LUNA

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/15/2021
  • HearingType: Order to Show Cause as to why sanctions not to exceed $1,500.00 or dismissal should not be imposed for Failure to timely request entry of default of all defendants who have been served but have not filed a response (CRC 3.110(g)) as to Gerald Lee Marcus, ALEJANDRA LUNA; Judicial Officer: Craig Riemer; Location/Courtroom: Department 1; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • HearingType: Case Management Conference; Judicial Officer: Craig Riemer; Location/Courtroom: Department 1; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • HearingType: Case Management Conference; Judicial Officer: Craig Riemer; Location/Courtroom: Department 1; Disposition: Continued Hearing Not Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Minute Order: Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Request for Dismissal; Filed By: ALEJANDRA LUNA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • HearingType: Court on its Own Motion; Judicial Officer: Craig Riemer; Location/Courtroom: Department 1; Disposition: Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to timely request entry of default of all defendants who have been served but have not filed a response (CRC 3.110(g))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Certificate of Mailing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Minute Order: Court on its Own Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Proof of Service of Summons on Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of ALEJANDRA LUNA; Filed By: ALEJANDRA LUNA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Proof of Service on Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of ALEJANDRA LUNA; Filed By: ALEJANDRA LUNA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Proof of Service on Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of ALEJANDRA LUNA; Filed By: ALEJANDRA LUNA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Unlimited complaint or other first paper in unlimited civil case amount over $25,000 including UD over $25K, petition for writ of review, mandate, or prohibition; petition for a decree of change of name or gender (GC70611); Amount: $450.00; Paid: $450.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 03/02/2021; Fine Description: Check #D3811525 Receipt No.: 20210302-00263.1; Paid: $450.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Department Assignment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Summons Issued and Filed; Filed By: ALEJANDRA LUNA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Certificate of Counsel.; Filed By: ALEJANDRA LUNA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: ALEJANDRA LUNA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES; Filed By: ALEJANDRA LUNA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • DocketFilings: Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of ALEJANDRA LUNA; Disposition: Dismissal No ADR 08/26/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ABS CA-O LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Albertsons Companies, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MARCUS GERALD LEE