Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 07/05/2021 at 13:17:56 (UTC).

LOS ANGELES FEDERAL CREDIT UNION vs JACKSON

Case Summary

On 06/08/2021 LOS ANGELES FEDERAL CREDIT UNION filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against JACKSON. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Murrieta Southwest Justice Center located in Riverside, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4974

  • Filing Date:

    06/08/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Riverside County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Murrieta Southwest Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LOS ANGELES FEDERAL CREDIT UNION

Defendant

DAVON A JACKSON

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Alana Billa Anaya

 

Court Documents

Summons Issued and Filed

06/08/2021: Summons Issued and Filed

Certificate of Counsel.

06/08/2021: Certificate of Counsel.

Civil Case Cover Sheet

06/08/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint for Other Contract (Under $10,000)

06/08/2021: Complaint for Other Contract (Under $10,000)

Notice of Department Assignment

06/10/2021: Notice of Department Assignment

Notice of Trial Setting Conference - Limited Civil on Complaint for Other Contract (Under $10,000) of LOS ANGELES FEDERAL CREDIT UNION

06/10/2021: Notice of Trial Setting Conference - Limited Civil on Complaint for Other Contract (Under $10,000) of LOS ANGELES FEDERAL CREDIT UNION

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/07/2021
  • HearingType: Trial Setting Conference - Limited Civil; Judicial Officer: Assigned Judge; Location/Courtroom: Department S102

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Limited complaint or other first paper amount up to $10,000 (GC70613B); Amount: $255.00; Paid: $255.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 06/10/2021; Fine Description: Check #5403 Receipt No.: 20210610-00171.1; Paid: $255.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Department Assignment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Trial Setting Conference - Limited Civil on Complaint for Other Contract (Under $10,000) of LOS ANGELES FEDERAL CREDIT UNION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • DocketDEADLINES & REMINDERS; Timestandard: Non-Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint; Expiration Date: 08/07/2021; Status: Active

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Summons Issued and Filed; Filed By: LOS ANGELES FEDERAL CREDIT UNION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Certificate of Counsel.; Filed By: LOS ANGELES FEDERAL CREDIT UNION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: LOS ANGELES FEDERAL CREDIT UNION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Complaint for Other Contract (Under $10,000); Filed By: LOS ANGELES FEDERAL CREDIT UNION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • DocketFilings: Complaint for Other Contract (Under $10,000) of LOS ANGELES FEDERAL CREDIT UNION

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LOS ANGELES FEDERAL CREDIT UNION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ANAYA ALANA BILLA