This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 10/29/2021 at 12:38:05 (UTC).

LOPEZ vs RODRIGUEZ

Case Summary

On 04/19/2021 LOPEZ filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against RODRIGUEZ. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Riverside Historic Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Irma Asberry. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1785

  • Filing Date:

    04/19/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

Judge Details

Judge

Irma Asberry

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ENRIQUE LOPEZ

Defendants

ROSALINDA OROSCO RODRIGUEZ

EDGAR RAMIREZ SALGADO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Asa Yashar

Defendant Attorney

Rose Kabir

 

Court Documents

Summons Issued and Filed

04/19/2021: Summons Issued and Filed

Certificate of Counsel.

04/19/2021: Certificate of Counsel.

Civil Case Cover Sheet

04/19/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint for Auto (Over $25,000)

04/19/2021: Complaint for Auto (Over $25,000)

Notice of Department Assignment

04/21/2021: Notice of Department Assignment

Notice of Case Management Conference

04/21/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Proof of Service on Complaint for Auto (Over $25,000) of ENRIQUE LOPEZ

06/24/2021: Proof of Service on Complaint for Auto (Over $25,000) of ENRIQUE LOPEZ

Answer of Rosalinda Orosco Rodriguez and Edgar Ramirez Salgado to Complaint and Demand for Jury Trial on Complaint for Auto (Over $25,000) of ENRIQUE LOPEZ

07/08/2021: Answer of Rosalinda Orosco Rodriguez and Edgar Ramirez Salgado to Complaint and Demand for Jury Trial on Complaint for Auto (Over $25,000) of ENRIQUE LOPEZ

Notice of Posting Jury Fees on Complaint for Auto (Over $25,000) of ENRIQUE LOPEZ

07/08/2021: Notice of Posting Jury Fees on Complaint for Auto (Over $25,000) of ENRIQUE LOPEZ

Notice of Document Return.

07/12/2021: Notice of Document Return.

Proof of Service of Summons on Complaint for Auto (Over $25,000) of ENRIQUE LOPEZ

07/15/2021: Proof of Service of Summons on Complaint for Auto (Over $25,000) of ENRIQUE LOPEZ

Certificate of Mailing

10/13/2021: Certificate of Mailing

Minute Order: Court on its Own Motion

10/13/2021: Minute Order: Court on its Own Motion

Notice of Telephonic Appearance for Hearing

10/05/2021: Notice of Telephonic Appearance for Hearing

Case Management Statement on Complaint for Auto (Over $25,000) of ENRIQUE LOPEZ

10/01/2021: Case Management Statement on Complaint for Auto (Over $25,000) of ENRIQUE LOPEZ

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/13/2022
  • HearingType: Trial Setting Conference; Judicial Officer: Irma Asberry; Location/Courtroom: Department 5

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • HearingType: Case Management Conference; Judicial Officer: Irma Asberry; Location/Courtroom: Department 5; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • HearingType: Court on its Own Motion; Judicial Officer: Irma Asberry; Location/Courtroom: Department 5; Disposition: Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Certificate of Mailing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Minute Order: Court on its Own Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Telephonic Appearance for Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Case Management Statement on Complaint for Auto (Over $25,000) of ENRIQUE LOPEZ; Filed By: ROSALINDA OROSCO RODRIGUEZ; EDGAR RAMIREZ SALGADO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Proof of Service of Summons on Complaint for Auto (Over $25,000) of ENRIQUE LOPEZ; Filed By: ENRIQUE LOPEZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Document Return.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Unlimited response: answer or other first paper filed by each party other than plaintiff amount over $25,000 including UD; includes response by party to petition for relief in discovery dispute related to out-of-state case (GC70612); Amount: $450.00; Paid: $450.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 07/09/2021; Fine Description: EFiling Payment Receipt No.: EFM20210709-00189.1; Paid: $450.00

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 07/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Answer of Rosalinda Orosco Rodriguez and Edgar Ramirez Salgado to Complaint and Demand for Jury Trial on Complaint for Auto (Over $25,000) of ENRIQUE LOPEZ; Filed By: ROSALINDA OROSCO RODRIGUEZ; EDGAR RAMIREZ SALGADO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Proof of Service on Complaint for Auto (Over $25,000) of ENRIQUE LOPEZ; Filed By: ENRIQUE LOPEZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Unlimited complaint or other first paper in unlimited civil case amount over $25,000 including UD over $25K, petition for writ of review, mandate, or prohibition; petition for a decree of change of name or gender (GC70611); Amount: $450.00; Paid: $450.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 04/21/2021; Fine Description: eSubmit *4190 Receipt No.: 20210421-00393.1; Paid: $450.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Department Assignment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Summons Issued and Filed; Filed By: ENRIQUE LOPEZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Certificate of Counsel.; Filed By: ENRIQUE LOPEZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: ENRIQUE LOPEZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Complaint for Auto (Over $25,000); Filed By: ENRIQUE LOPEZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • DocketFilings: Complaint for Auto (Over $25,000) of ENRIQUE LOPEZ

    Read MoreRead Less